This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/27/2016 at 07:34:54 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF THOMAS D. WICKENS

Case Summary

On 05/28/2014 THE ESTATE OF THOMAS D WICKENS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7783

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BOGATAY, LUCIA

Decedent

WICKENS, THOMAS D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BERGER, INGRID

870 Market Street, St. 652

San Francisco, CA 94102

 

Court Documents

GENERIC PROBATE PLEADING

SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION TO SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION, DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY INGRID BERGER TO SUPPLEMENT AND CORRECT SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION FILED BY PETITIONER BOGATAY, LUCIA

GENERIC PROBATE PLEADING

SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION TO SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION-DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY INGRID BERGER TO CORRECT ATTACHMENT 7(B)(2) FILED BY PETITIONER BOGATAY, LUCIA

NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER BOGATAY, LUCIA

PETITION FOR SPOUSAL PROPERTY

PETITION FOR SPOUSAL PROPERTY, NO WILL FILED, FILED BY PETITIONER BOGATAY, LUCIA AS TO DECEDENT WICKENS, THOMAS D. HEARING SET FOR JUL-09-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:450.00)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2014
  • PETITION FOR SPOUSAL PROPERTY, CALENDAR OF JUL-23-2014, OFF CALENDAR PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION TO SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION, DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY INGRID BERGER TO SUPPLEMENT AND CORRECT SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION FILED BY PETITIONER BOGATAY, LUCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • PETITION FOR SPOUSAL PROPERTY CONTINUED FROM JUL-09-2014 TO JUL-23-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION TO SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION-DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY INGRID BERGER TO CORRECT ATTACHMENT 7(B)(2) FILED BY PETITIONER BOGATAY, LUCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER BOGATAY, LUCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR SPOUSAL PROPERTY, NO WILL FILED, FILED BY PETITIONER BOGATAY, LUCIA AS TO DECEDENT WICKENS, THOMAS D. HEARING SET FOR JUL-09-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******7783
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF THOMAS D. WICKENS
Court Date:JUL-09-2014 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:PAMELA MEYERS
Calendar Matter:PETITION FOR SPOUSAL PROPERTY
Rulings:petition continued to 7/23/14


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERGER, INGRID