This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/25/2016 at 19:33:30 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF THOMAS CARROL MOORE JR

Case Summary

On 12/15/2011 THE ESTATE OF THOMAS CARROL MOORE JR was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5266

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LEARY, PEARLENE

Decedent

MOORE JR, THOMAS CARROL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ENGEL, AUTUMN

Attorney at ENGEL LAW

100 Spear Street, Suite 1430

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

EX PARTE PETITION FOR FINAL DISCHARGE AND ORDER

EX PARTE PETITION FOR FINAL DISCHARGE AND ORDER FILED BY PETITIONER LEARY, PEARLENE

ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION

ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION

GENERIC PROBATE PLEADING

SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT AND FOR ALLOW. OF FEES TO ATTORNEY FILED BY PETITIONER LEARY, PEARLENE

NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER LEARY, PEARLENE

GENERIC PROBATE PLEADING

SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT AND FOR ALLOW. OF FEES TO ATTORNEY FILED BY PETITIONER LEARY, PEARLENE

NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER LEARY, PEARLENE

GENERIC PROBATE PLEADING

SUPPLEMENT TO PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT AND FOR ALLOW. OF FEES

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER LEARY, PEARLENE

ACCOUNTING PETITION RE:

ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION FILED BY PETITIONER LEARY, PEARLENE HEARING SET FOR MAY-01-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:435.00)

NOTICE

NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION TO CREDITORS FILED BY PETITIONER LEARY, PEARLENE

LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

LETTERS TESTAMENTARY ISSUED AND FILED LEARY, PEARLENE APPOINTED WITH AUTHORITY UNDER THE IAEA

ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR/EXECUTRIX

ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR/EXECUTRIX, APPOINTMENT UNDER IAEA, NO BOND REQUIRED FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE LEARY, PEARLENE

GENERIC PROBATE PLEADING

WILL ADMITTED TO PROBATE

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

PROOF OF PUBLICATION (THE RECORDER)

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE AND PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER LEARY, PEARLENE

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER LEARY, PEARLENE

PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, WILL FILED, FILED BY PETITIONER LEARY, PEARLENE AS TO DECEDENT MOORE JR, THOMAS CARROL HEARING SET FOR JAN-11-2012 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:410.00)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE PETITION FOR FINAL DISCHARGE AND ORDER FILED BY PETITIONER LEARY, PEARLENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2013
  • ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION, CALENDAR OF MAY-29-2013, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT AND FOR ALLOW. OF FEES TO ATTORNEY FILED BY PETITIONER LEARY, PEARLENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2013
  • ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION CONTINUED FROM MAY-15-2013 TO MAY-29-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER LEARY, PEARLENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT AND FOR ALLOW. OF FEES TO ATTORNEY FILED BY PETITIONER LEARY, PEARLENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2013
  • ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION CONTINUED FROM MAY-01-2013 TO MAY-15-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER LEARY, PEARLENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLEMENT TO PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT AND FOR ALLOW. OF FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION TO CREDITORS FILED BY PETITIONER LEARY, PEARLENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTERS TESTAMENTARY ISSUED AND FILED LEARY, PEARLENE APPOINTED WITH AUTHORITY UNDER THE IAEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2012
  • COPYING FEES (3 PAGE, 3 CERTIFIED COPY) (Fee:76.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR/EXECUTRIX, APPOINTMENT UNDER IAEA, NO BOND REQUIRED FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE LEARY, PEARLENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • WILL ADMITTED TO PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2012
  • PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, CALENDAR OF JAN-11-2012, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION (THE RECORDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE AND PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER LEARY, PEARLENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER LEARY, PEARLENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, WILL FILED, FILED BY PETITIONER LEARY, PEARLENE AS TO DECEDENT MOORE JR, THOMAS CARROL HEARING SET FOR JAN-11-2012 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******5266
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF THOMAS CARROL MOORE JR
Court Date:MAY-29-2013 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:PAMELA MEYERS
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Rulings:petition approved; no appearance required


Case Number:*******5266
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF THOMAS CARROL MOORE JR
Court Date:MAY-15-2013 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:PAMELA MEYERS
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Rulings:petition continued to 5/29/13


Case Number:*******5266
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF THOMAS CARROL MOORE JR
Court Date:MAY-01-2013 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:PAMELA MEYERS
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Rulings:petition continued to 5/15/13


Case Number:*******5266
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF THOMAS CARROL MOORE JR
Court Date:JAN-11-2012 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TIMOTHY KNEIS
Calendar Matter:PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY
Rulings:Grant without hearing


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ENGEL AUTUMN ELIZABETH