This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/26/2016 at 19:31:13 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF THEODORE AUGUST BULOTTI

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 THE ESTATE OF THEODORE AUGUST BULOTTI was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6446

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BULOTTI, JOANN

Decedent

BULOTTI, THEODORE AUGUST

Others

WONG, DARCEY L.

San Mateo, CA 94403

COREY, JOSEPH P.

San Francisco, CA 94114

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

WONG, DARCEY R.

GAW, DAVID BURCHARD

Attorney at GAW, VAN MALE, SMITH & REYNOLDS APC

100 Main St., Third Floor

Napa, CA 94559

 

Court Documents

GENERIC PROBATE PLEADING

DISCLAIMER OF JOANN BULOTTI FILED BY PETITIONER BULOTTI, JOANN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER BULOTTI, JOANN

NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION

NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE BULOTTI, JOANN

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

PROOF OF PUBLICATION (THE S.F. DAILY JOURNAL)

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE AND PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (AMENDED) FILED BY PETITIONER BULOTTI, JOANN

PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, WILL FILED, FILED BY PETITIONER BULOTTI, JOANN AS TO DECEDENT BULOTTI, THEODORE AUGUST HEARING SET FOR FEB-27-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:450.00)

GENERIC PROBATE PLEADING

WILL ADMITTED INTO PROBATE

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER BULOTTI, JOANN

RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION

RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION (TWO) FILED BY PETITIONER BULOTTI, JOANN

NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER BULOTTI, JOANN

REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE

REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE FILED BY REQUESTOR WONG, DARCEY L.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY PETITIONER BULOTTI, JOANN

DECLARATION

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL A. MANFRED FILED BY PETITIONER BULOTTI, JOANN

ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR/EXECUTRIX

ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR/EXECUTRIX, APPOINTMENT UNDER IAEA, NO BOND REQUIRED FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE BULOTTI, JOANN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER BULOTTI, JOANN

REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE

REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE FILED BY REQUESTOR WONG, DARCEY L. COREY, JOSEPH P.

LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

LETTERS TESTAMENTARY ISSUED AND FILED BULOTTI, JOANN APPOINTED WITH AUTHORITY UNDER THE IAEA

ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION

ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ACCOUNTING, REPORT, FEES

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION (TWO) FILED BY PETITIONER BULOTTI, JOANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY PETITIONER BULOTTI, JOANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ACCOUNTING, REPORT, FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION, CALENDAR OF MAY-21-2014, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION CONTINUED FROM MAY-07-2014 TO MAY-21-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2014
  • ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION CONTINUED FROM APR-23-2014 TO MAY-07-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLEMENT TO FIRST, FINAL ACCOUNT & REPT. OF EXECUTOR IN RESPONSE TO PROBATE EXAMINERS NOTES FILED BY PETITIONER BULOTTI, JOANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2014
  • ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION CONTINUED FROM APR-09-2014 TO APR-23-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER BULOTTI, JOANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL FINAL FILED BY PETITIONER BULOTTI, JOANN

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PETITIONER BULOTTI, JOANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PETITIONER BULOTTI, JOANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE AND PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (AMENDED) FILED BY PETITIONER BULOTTI, JOANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: GAW, DAVID BURCHARD SUBSTITUTED FOR WONG, DARCEY R. AS ATTORNEY FOR BULOTTI, JOANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY CONTINUED FROM FEB-27-2013 TO MAR-20-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION (THE S.F. DAILY JOURNAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE AND PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER BULOTTI, JOANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF REAL PROPERTY FILED BY PETITIONER BULOTTI, JOANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER BULOTTI, JOANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, WILL FILED, FILED BY PETITIONER BULOTTI, JOANN AS TO DECEDENT BULOTTI, THEODORE AUGUST HEARING SET FOR FEB-27-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less