This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/27/2016 at 06:02:59 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF SHIRLEY A. HENDERSON

Case Summary

On 02/04/2014 THE ESTATE OF SHIRLEY A HENDERSON was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7467

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Others and Assignees

INHERITANCE FUNDING COMPANY, INC

HINSHAW, CAROLINE K

San Francisco, CA 94104

RIDGE, JERONE TYRONE

BANK OF AMERICA

RIDGE, ANN YOLANDA

CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

P.O. Box 7027

San Francisco, CA 94120

WATSON, YATES F.

Decedent

HENDERSON, SHIRLEY A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Assignee Attorney

SCHROEDER, STEVEN D

275 Battery St., Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94111

Other Attorneys

BROWN, JENNIFER LYNNE

Attorney at BROWN * PENNINGTON

1750 Montgomery St., San Francisco

San Francisco, CA 94111

MELBOSTAD, PAUL HOWARD

Attorney at GOLDSTEIN, GELLMAN, MELBOSTAD AND GIBSON- HARRIS,LLP

1388 Sutter Street, Suite 1000

San Francisco, CA 94109

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION FILED BY PETITIONER RIDGE, ANN YOLANDA RIDGE, JERONE TYRONE AS TO DECEDENT HENDERSON, SHIRLEY A. HEARING SET FOR FEB-26-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:450.00)

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER RIDGE, ANN YOLANDA RIDGE, JERONE TYRONE

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

PROOF OF PUBLICATION (THE RECORDER)

DECLARATION

DECLARATION OF DELIGENT SEARCH FOR HEIRS OF THE ESTATE OF SHIRLEY HENDERSON, DECEDENT FILED BY PETITIONER RIDGE, ANN YOLANDA

NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER RIDGE, ANN YOLANDA RIDGE, JERONE TYRONE

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION, APPOINTMENT UNDER IAEA FILED BY PETITIONER WATSON, YATES F. HEARING SET FOR MAY-05-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:450.00)

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER WATSON, YATES F.

DECLARATION OF REAL PROPERTY

DECLARATION OF REAL PROPERTY FILED BY PETITIONER WATSON, YATES F.

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY PETITIONER WATSON, YATES F.

CREDITOR'S CLAIM

CREDITOR'S CLAIM FOR $2,385.56 FILED BY CREDITOR BANK OF AMERICA

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

PROOF OF PUBLICATION (SAN FRANCISCO DAILY JOURNAL)

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY PETITIONER WATSON, YATES F.

CREDITOR'S CLAIM

CREDITOR'S CLAIM FOR $366.44 FILED BY CREDITOR CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE

REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE FILED BY CREDITOR CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO (Fee:EXEMPT)

DECLARATION

DECLARATION REGARDING JUDITH KEMPER, JERON RIDGE,RUTH JACKSON LETTER REGARDING SHIRLEY HENDERSON, DECEDENT FILED BY PETITIONER RIDGE, ANN YOLANDA RIDGE, JERONE TYRONE

DECLARATION

DECLARATION REGARDING ELSA KIYOKO TSUTAOKA, MD LETTER REGARDING SHIRLEY HENDERSON, DECEDENT FILED BY PETITIONER RIDGE, ANN YOLANDA RIDGE, JERONE TYRONE

DECLARATION

DECLARATION REGARDING LILY DIEP, MSW LETTER REGARDING SHIRLEY HENDERSON, DECEDENT FILED BY PETITIONER RIDGE, ANN YOLANDA RIDGE, JERONE TYRONE

GENERIC PROBATE PLEADING

AMENDED PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION FILED BY PETITIONER RIDGE, ANN YOLANDA RIDGE, JERONE TYRONE

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION (TRANSACTION ID # 58773326) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE RIDGE, ANN YOLANDA RIDGE, JERONE TYRONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION (TRANSACTION ID # 58773326) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE RIDGE, ANN YOLANDA RIDGE, JERONE TYRONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • COPYING FEES (9 PAGE, 1 CERTIFIED COPY) PAID BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE RIDGE, ANN YOLANDA (Fee:29.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION FEES [WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION, CALENDAR OF MAR-07-2016, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER AS MODIFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION, CALENDAR OF MAR-07-2016, TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AS OF MAR-07-2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FOR MAR-07-2016 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SCHEDULE OF GAINS (TRANSACTION ID # 58673665) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE RIDGE, ANN YOLANDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION [SECOND AMENDED] BY JENNIFER L. BROWN, ESQ. REGARDING ATTORNEYS REQUEST FOR PAYMENT OF EXTRAORDINARY FEES AND COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 58672316) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE RIDGE, ANN YOLANDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF PAUL H. MELBOSTAD AUTHENTICATING ITEMIZED TIME SLIPS FOR ATTORNEYS ORDINARY SERVICES (TRANSACTION ID # 58665725) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE WATSON, YATES F.

    Read MoreRead Less
86 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2014
  • PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION CONTINUED FROM MAR-19-2014 TO APR-09-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF REAL PROPERTY FILED BY PETITIONER WATSON, YATES F.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER WATSON, YATES F.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION, APPOINTMENT UNDER IAEA FILED BY PETITIONER WATSON, YATES F. HEARING SET FOR MAY-05-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER RIDGE, ANN YOLANDA RIDGE, JERONE TYRONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF DELIGENT SEARCH FOR HEIRS OF THE ESTATE OF SHIRLEY HENDERSON, DECEDENT FILED BY PETITIONER RIDGE, ANN YOLANDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION CONTINUED FROM FEB-26-2014 TO MAR-19-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION (THE RECORDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER RIDGE, ANN YOLANDA RIDGE, JERONE TYRONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION FILED BY PETITIONER RIDGE, ANN YOLANDA RIDGE, JERONE TYRONE AS TO DECEDENT HENDERSON, SHIRLEY A. HEARING SET FOR FEB-26-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******7467
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF SHIRLEY A. HENDERSON
Court Date:FEB-26-2014 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION
Rulings: Continued to 3/19/14 at Counsel's request.


Case Number:*******7467
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF SHIRLEY A. HENDERSON
Court Date:APR-09-2014 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION
Rulings: Continued to 5/5/14 by Counsel and also to address to issues.


Case Number:*******7467
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF SHIRLEY A. HENDERSON
Court Date:MAY-05-2014 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION, APPOINTMENT UNDER IAEA
Rulings: Continued to 5/14/14, as stipulated by Counsel.


Case Number:*******7467
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF SHIRLEY A. HENDERSON
Court Date:JUL-15-2014 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION
Rulings: Hearing


Case Number:*******7467
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF SHIRLEY A. HENDERSON
Court Date:MAR-07-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SANDRA HILTON
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Rulings:hearing. appearance required.


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where City and County of San Francisco is a litigant

Latest cases where INHERITANCE FUNDING CO. INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROWN, JENNIFER L