This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 07/27/2018 at 16:20:07 (UTC).

The Estate Of Samuel Colla

Case Summary

On 02/13/2018 a Probate - Other Probate case was filed by The Estate Of Samuel Colla in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1613

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Undetermined

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

John K. Stewart

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Others

Montgomery, Deanna

Suretec Insurance Company 3033 5th Ave., Suite

Decedent

Colla, Samuel

 

Court Documents

BOND

BOND #3391237 IN THE AMOUNT OF $150,000.00 FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE MONTGOMERY, DEANNA EXECUTED BY SURETY COMPANY SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE (TRANSACTION ID # 61860966) FILED BY PETITIONER MONTGOMERY, DEANNA

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION FILED BY PETITIONER MONTGOMERY, DEANNA AS TO DECEDENT COLLA, SAMUEL HEARING SET FOR MAR-12-2018 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

PROOF OF PUBLICATION (SAN FRANCISCO DAILY JOURNAL)

LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION ISSUED AND FILED MONTGOMERY, DEANNA APPOINTED WITH AUTHORITY UNDER THE IAEA

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR/ADMINISTRATRIX

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR/ADMINISTRATRIX, APPOINTMENT UNDER IAEA, $150,000.00 BOND REQUIRED MONTGOMERY, DEANNA APPOINTED

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE (TRANSACTION ID # 61984827) FILED BY PETITIONER MONTGOMERY, DEANNA

Supplement to Petition for Probate

FIRST VERIFIED SUPPLEMENT TO PETITION FOR PROBATE (TRANSACTION ID # 61984827) FILED BY PETITIONER MONTGOMERY, DEANNA

Second Verified Supplement to Petition for Probate

SECOND VERIFIED SUPPLEMENT TO PETITION FOR PROBATE (TRANSACTION ID # 62051747) FILED BY PETITIONER MONTGOMERY, DEANNA

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER MONTGOMERY, DEANNA

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2018
  • Payment : PROBATE FIRST PETITION FOR LETTERS/TRUST/OTHER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2418213P015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION ISSUED AND FILED MONTGOMERY, DEANNA APPOINTED WITH AUTHORITY UNDER THE IAEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • BOND #3391237 IN THE AMOUNT OF $150,000.00 FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE MONTGOMERY, DEANNA EXECUTED BY SURETY COMPANY SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR/ADMINISTRATRIX, APPOINTMENT UNDER IAEA, $150,000.00 BOND REQUIRED MONTGOMERY, DEANNA APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION, CALENDAR OF JUN-04-2018, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER, BOND IN THE AMOUNT OF $150,000.00 REQUIRED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR STATUS OF CLOSING ESTATE HEARING SET FOR JUN-26-2019 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SECOND VERIFIED SUPPLEMENT TO PETITION FOR PROBATE (TRANSACTION ID # 62051747) FILED BY PETITIONER MONTGOMERY, DEANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION CONTINUED FROM MAY-16-2018 TO JUN-04-2018 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • FIRST VERIFIED SUPPLEMENT TO PETITION FOR PROBATE (TRANSACTION ID # 61984827) FILED BY PETITIONER MONTGOMERY, DEANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE (TRANSACTION ID # 61984827) FILED BY PETITIONER MONTGOMERY, DEANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION CONTINUED FROM APR-30-2018 TO MAY-16-2018 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION (SAN FRANCISCO DAILY JOURNAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE (TRANSACTION ID # 61860966) FILED BY PETITIONER MONTGOMERY, DEANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION CONTINUED FROM MAR-26-2018 TO APR-30-2018 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 - HEARING HELD - SEE MINI-MINUTES FOR THIS DATE - PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • MINI MINUTES FOR MAR-26-2018 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 204

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION CONTINUED FROM MAR-12-2018 TO MAR-26-2018 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER MONTGOMERY, DEANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION FILED BY PETITIONER MONTGOMERY, DEANNA AS TO DECEDENT COLLA, SAMUEL HEARING SET FOR MAR-12-2018 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less