This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/26/2016 at 19:31:08 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF RUFINO DE LUNA

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 THE ESTATE OF RUFINO DE LUNA was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6445

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Decedent and Conservatee

DE LUNA, RUFINO AKA RUFINO B. DE LUNA

Others

INTERNATIONAL FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY

2999 Oak Road

Walnut Creek, CA 94597

WITHERSPOON & SIRACUSA

1550 Bryant Street Suite 725

San Francisco, CA 94103

HODGES, SCOTT R.

SIRACUSA, LAWRENCE S.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent and Conservatee Attorney

ALAVI, AVID ELI

Attorney at WITHERSPOON & SIRACUSA

1550 Bryant Street, Suite 875

San Francisco, CA 94103

Other Attorney

NG, LILLIAN ELIZABETH

4444 Geary Blvd., Ste. 205

San Francisco, CA 94118

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER HODGES, SCOTT R.

ORDER

ORDER EXTEDNING LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMININSTRATION.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER HODGES, SCOTT R.

ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION

ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES

GENERIC PROBATE PLEADING

AMENDMENT TO PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION, FOR SETTLEMENT OF FIRST, FINAL REPT. & ACCOUNT AND FOR APPROVAL OF FEES FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE HODGES, SCOTT R.

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE AND PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER HODGES, SCOTT R.

ORDER

ORDER EXTENDING LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

PROOF OF PUBLICATION (THE S.F. DAILY JOURNAL)

LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION

LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION ISSUED AND FILED HODGES, SCOTT R. APPOINTED, LETTERS EXPIRE ON FEB-26-2013

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION FILED BY PETITIONER HODGES, SCOTT R. HEARING SET FOR FEB-07-2013 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT 202 (Fee:200.00)

BOND

BOND #21104 IN THE AMOUNT OF $500,000.00 FILED BY PETITIONER HODGES, SCOTT R. EXECUTED BY SURETY COMPANY INTERNATIONAL FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY

DECLARATION

DECLARATION [SUPPLEMENTAL] TO PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION, FOR SETTLEMENT OF FIRST AND FINAL REPORT AND ACCOUNT OF ADMINISTRATOR AND FOR APPROVAL AND ALLOWANCE OF STATUTORY FEES,...ET AL FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE HODGES, SCOTT R.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION, APPROVING FIRST AND

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 58202167) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE HODGES, SCOTT R.

ORDER

ORDER VACATING ORDER DETERMINING ENTITLEMENT TO DISTRIBUTION OF DECEDENT'S ESTATE

GENERIC PROBATE PLEADING

FURTHER SUPPLEMENT TO PETITION FOR PROBATE AND APPOINTMENT OF ADMINISTRATOR FILED BY PETITIONER HODGES, SCOTT R.

REPORT OF SALE AND PETITION TO CONFIRM SALE OF REAL PROPERTY

REPORT OF SALE AND PETITION TO CONFIRM SALE OF REAL PROPERTY (115 LOWELL STREET, SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94112) FILED BY PETITIONER HODGES, SCOTT R. HEARING SET FOR MAR-19-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:435.00)

ACCOUNTING PETITION RE:

ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE HODGES, SCOTT R. HEARING SET FOR MAY-27-2015 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:435.00)

NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE HODGES, SCOTT R.

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 58202167) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE HODGES, SCOTT R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION, CALENDAR OF NOV-10-2015, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER AS MODIFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION CONTINUED FROM OCT-28-2015 TO NOV-10-2015 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE HODGES, SCOTT R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE HODGES, SCOTT R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SECOND AMENDED PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION, FOR SETTLEMENT OF FIRST AND FINAL REPORT AND ACCOUNT OF ADMINISTRATOR AND FOR APPROVAL ET., AL FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE HODGES, SCOTT R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION CONTINUED FROM SEP-23-2015 TO OCT-28-2015 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER VACATING ORDER DETERMINING ENTITLEMENT TO DISTRIBUTION OF DECEDENT'S ESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • PETITION TO VACATE ORDER DETERMINING ENTITLEMENT TO DISTRIBUTION OF DECEDENT'S ESTATE AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF SAME, CALENDAR OF SEP-08-2015, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
71 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR/ADMINISTRATRIX, $500,000.00 BOND REQUIRED FILED BY PETITIONER HODGES, SCOTT R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2013
  • COPYING FEES (6 PAGE, 3 CERTIFIED COPY) (Fee:78.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER HODGES, SCOTT R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE NOTICE TO PARTIES RE EX PARTE PROCEEDINGS FILED BY PETITIONER HODGES, SCOTT R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER HODGES, SCOTT R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER HODGES, SCOTT R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER HODGES, SCOTT R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER HODGES, SCOTT R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION FILED BY PETITIONER HODGES, SCOTT R. HEARING SET FOR FEB-07-2013 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT 202 (Fee:200.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION FILED BY PETITIONER HODGES, SCOTT R. AS TO DECEDENT DE LUNA, RUFINO AKA RUFINO B. DE LUNA HEARING SET FOR FEB-26-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less