This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/27/2016 at 09:17:58 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF PASQUALE PATRICK MANISCALCO

Case Summary

On 10/01/2014 THE ESTATE OF PASQUALE PATRICK MANISCALCO was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8133

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ORRICK, LINDA

Decedent

MANISCALCO, PASQUALE PATRICK ALSO KNOWN AS, PATRICK MANISCALCO

Other

GERALDI, MICHAEL A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other and Petitioner Attorney

LAMAR, HILARY LOUISE

 

Court Documents

ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION

ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION REPORT, FEES WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING.

DECLARATION

DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL TO REPORT OF EXECUTOR, PETITION FOR APPROVAL FOR ALLOWANCE OF SATUTORY FEES AND COMMISSIONS AND FOR FINAL DISTRIBTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE GERALDI, MICHAEL A.

NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE GERALDI, MICHAEL A.

ACCOUNTING PETITION RE:

ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE GERALDI, MICHAEL A. HEARING SET FOR AUG-18-2015 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:435.00)

NOTICE

NOTICE TO DIRECTOR OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES

NOTICE TO CREDITORS

NOTICE TO CREDITORS FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE GERALDI, MICHAEL A.

LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

LETTERS TESTAMENTARY ISSUED AND FILED GERALDI, MICHAEL A. APPOINTED

ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR/EXECUTRIX

ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR/EXECUTRIX, NO BOND REQUIRED FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE GERALDI, MICHAEL A.

GENERIC PROBATE PLEADING

PROBATE WILL DATED NOVEMBER 5, 2010 ADMITTED TO PROBATE ON NOVEMBER 24, 2014 FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE GERALDI, MICHAEL A.

GENERIC PROBATE PLEADING

SECOND SUPPLEMENT TO PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS OF TESTAMENTARY FILED BY PETITIONER GERALDI, MICHAEL A.

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY PETITIONER GERALDI, MICHAEL A.

GENERIC PROBATE PLEADING

SUPPLEMENT TO PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS OF TESTAMENTARY FILED BY PETITIONER ORRICK, LINDA

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

PROOF OF PUBLICATION (SAN FRANCISCO DAILY JOURNAL)

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

PROOF OF PUBLICATION (S.F. DAILY JOURNAL)

NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER GERALDI, MICHAEL A.

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER GERALDI, MICHAEL A.

PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, WILL FILED, FILED BY PETITIONER GERALDI, MICHAEL A. AS TO DECEDENT MANISCALCO, PASQUALE PATRICK ALSO KNOWN AS, PATRICK MANISCALCO HEARING SET FOR OCT-27-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:450.00)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION REPORT, FEES WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • DocketACCOUNTING PETITION RE: REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION, CALENDAR OF SEP-01-2015, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL TO REPORT OF EXECUTOR, PETITION FOR APPROVAL FOR ALLOWANCE OF SATUTORY FEES AND COMMISSIONS AND FOR FINAL DISTRIBTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE GERALDI, MICHAEL A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • DocketACCOUNTING PETITION RE: REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION CONTINUED FROM AUG-18-2015 TO SEP-01-2015 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE GERALDI, MICHAEL A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACCOUNTING PETITION RE: REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE GERALDI, MICHAEL A. HEARING SET FOR AUG-18-2015 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:435.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • DocketINVENTORY AND APPRAISAL FINAL FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE GERALDI, MICHAEL A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO DIRECTOR OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • DocketINVENTORY AND APPRAISAL PARTIAL #1 FILED BY PETITIONER GERALDI, MICHAEL A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE GERALDI, MICHAEL A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSECOND SUPPLEMENT TO PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS OF TESTAMENTARY FILED BY PETITIONER GERALDI, MICHAEL A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • DocketPETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY CONTINUED FROM NOV-10-2014 TO NOV-24-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY PETITIONER GERALDI, MICHAEL A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPLEMENT TO PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS OF TESTAMENTARY FILED BY PETITIONER ORRICK, LINDA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2014
  • DocketPETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY CONTINUED FROM OCT-27-2014 TO NOV-10-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION (SAN FRANCISCO DAILY JOURNAL)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION (S.F. DAILY JOURNAL)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER GERALDI, MICHAEL A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER GERALDI, MICHAEL A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, WILL FILED, FILED BY PETITIONER GERALDI, MICHAEL A. AS TO DECEDENT MANISCALCO, PASQUALE PATRICK ALSO KNOWN AS, PATRICK MANISCALCO HEARING SET FOR OCT-27-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:PES14298133
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF PASQUALE PATRICK MANISCALCO
Court Date:SEP-01-2015 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SANDRA HILTON
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Rulings:grant without hearing


Case Number:PES14298133
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF PASQUALE PATRICK MANISCALCO
Court Date:AUG-18-2015 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SANDRA HILTON
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Rulings:continued to september 1, 2015 for a response to the examiner's notes.


Case Number:PES14298133
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF PASQUALE PATRICK MANISCALCO
Court Date:OCT-27-2014 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY
Rulings: Continued to 11/10/14. Notes sent.