This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/25/2016 at 06:01:24 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF OLGA I. CODY

Case Summary

On 03/23/2011 THE ESTATE OF OLGA I CODY was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4437

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Others

RUSSIAN AMERICAN COMMUNITY SERVICES ASSOCIATION

BARRESE, IRENE

MARTINI, NINA M.

San Francisco, CA 94121

BLIZENKO, VALENTINA

RUSSIAN HOME FOR ST. VLADIMIR

U.S. SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO.

601 S. Figueroa St., Ste. 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90017

MILLERHAUSE LAW GROUP

4 Embarcadero Center

San Francisco, CA 94111

WESTERN SURETY COMPANY

101 South Philips Avenue

Sioux Falls, SD 57104-6703

O'KEEFFE, MARY GEMA

San Francisco, CA 94116

FIELD, NANCY C.

Larkspur, CA 94939

Petitioner and Respondent

MARTINI, NINA M.

San Francisco, CA 94121

Other and Conservatee

O'KEEFFE, MARY GEMA

San Francisco, CA 94116

Decedent

CODY, OLGA I.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Other Attorneys

LVOVICH, MILLA L.

Attorney at LVOVICH, VOLCHEGURSKY & SZUCSKO, LLP

425 California St, Ste 550

San Francisco, CA 94104

HAUSER, JERRY RAY

Attorney at MILLERHAUSER LAW GROUP, LLP

4 Embarcadero Ctr, 39Th Flr

San Francisco, CA 94111

BARRESE, IRENE

VINSKY, MARINA M

Attorney at VINSKY LAW GROUP

2055 Junction Ave Ste 118

San Jose, CA 95131

JONAS, CHARLES ALFRED

351 California St.#550

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, WILL FILED, FILED BY PETITIONER MARTINI, NINA M. AS TO DECEDENT CODY, OLGA I. HEARING SET FOR APR-20-2011 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:410.00)

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY PETITIONER MARTINI, NINA M.

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER MARTINI, NINA M.

DECLARATION OF REAL PROPERTY

DECLARATION OF REAL PROPERTY FILED BY PETITIONER MARTINI, NINA M.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER MARTINI, NINA M.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

PROOF OF PUBLICATION (THE RECORDER)

WILL CONTEST

WILL CONTEST FILED BY OBJECTOR RUSSIAN AMERICAN COMMUNITY SERVICES ASSOCIATION RUSSIAN HOME FOR ST. VLADIMIR (Fee:410.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER MARTINI, NINA M.

FIRST AMENDED WILL CONTEST AND GROUNDS OF OPPOSITION TO PROBATE OF

FIRST AMENDED WILL CONTEST AND GROUNDS OF OPPOSITION TO PROBATE OF PURPORTED WILL FILED BY OBJECTOR RUSSIAN AMERICAN COMMUNITY SERVICES ASSOCIATION RUSSIAN HOME FOR ST. VLADIMIR

GENERIC PROBATE PLEADING

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS.(4) FILED BY OBJECTOR RUSSIAN AMERICAN COMMUNITY SERVICES ASSOCIATION

GENERIC PROBATE PLEADING

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS [2] FILED BY PETITIONER RUSSIAN AMERICAN COMMUNITY SERVICES ASSOCIATION RUSSIAN HOME FOR ST. VLADIMIR

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT (6) FILED BY OBJECTOR RUSSIAN AMERICAN COMMUNITY SERVICES ASSOCIATION RUSSIAN HOME FOR ST. VLADIMIR

DECLARATION

DECLARATION (SUPPLEMENTAL) TO THE PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED BY PETITIONER MARTINI, NINA M.

NOTICE

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY PETITIONER RUSSIAN AMERICAN COMMUNITY SERVICES ASSOCIATION

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY OBJECTOR RUSSIAN AMERICAN COMMUNITY SERVICES ASSOCIATION RUSSIAN HOME FOR ST. VLADIMIR

GENERIC PROBATE PLEADING

PROOF OF SERVICE (2) FILED BY OBJECTOR RUSSIAN AMERICAN COMMUNITY SERVICES ASSOCIATION RUSSIAN HOME FOR ST. VLADIMIR

FIRST APPEARANCE FEE FILED BY PETITIONER

FIRST APPEARANCE FEE FILED BY PETITIONER BLIZENKO, VALENTINA (Fee:410.00)

PROBATE MOTION

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT FILED BY PETITIONER BARRESE, IRENE HEARING SET FOR OCT-06-2011 AT 02:30 PM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:40.00)

91 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION (EIGHT RECEIPTS) 10/10/14 RETRURNED EX PARTE PETITION FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FOR FAILURE TO RESPOND. PAM FILED BY PETITIONER MARTINI, NINA M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY PETITIONER MARTINI, NINA M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • COPYING FEES (16 PAGE, 2 CERTIFIED COPY) (Fee:58.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION, CALENDAR OF FEB-11-2013, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER AS MODIFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2013
  • MINI MINUTES FOR FEB-11-2013 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 204

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2013
  • ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION, CALENDAR OF FEB-11-2013, GRANTED SUBJECT TO WRITTEN ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF I.V. BARRESE REGARDING STATUTORY COMPENSATION. FILED BY PETITIONER MARTINI, NINA M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION (SUPPLEMENTAL) PF M.M. VINSKY IN RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES FOR EXTRAODINARY SERVICES. FILED BY PETITIONER MARTINI, NINA M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION (SUPPLEMENTAL) OF M.M. VINSKY IN RESPONSE TO PROBATE EXAMINERS'S NOTES. FILED BY PETITIONER MARTINI, NINA M.

    Read MoreRead Less
134 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2011
  • PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY CONTINUED FROM MAY-04-2011 TO JUN-22-2011 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER MARTINI, NINA M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2011
  • PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY CONTINUED FROM APR-20-2011 TO MAY-04-2011 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • WILL CONTEST FILED BY OBJECTOR RUSSIAN AMERICAN COMMUNITY SERVICES ASSOCIATION RUSSIAN HOME FOR ST. VLADIMIR (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION (THE RECORDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER MARTINI, NINA M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF REAL PROPERTY FILED BY PETITIONER MARTINI, NINA M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER MARTINI, NINA M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY PETITIONER MARTINI, NINA M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, WILL FILED, FILED BY PETITIONER MARTINI, NINA M. AS TO DECEDENT CODY, OLGA I. HEARING SET FOR APR-20-2011 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******4437
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF OLGA I. CODY
Court Date:FEB-11-2013 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:PAMELA MEYERS
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Rulings:appearance required


Case Number:*******4437
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF OLGA I. CODY
Court Date:JAN-14-2013 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:PAMELA MEYERS
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Rulings:petition continued to 2/11/13


Case Number:*******4437
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF OLGA I. CODY
Court Date:AUG-15-2012 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:PAMELA MEYERS
Calendar Matter:Petition For Approval Of Will Contest Settlment Agreement
Rulings:petition continued to 9/19/12


Case Number:*******4437
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF OLGA I. CODY
Court Date:JUL-16-2012 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:PAMELA MEYERS
Calendar Matter:Petition For Approval Of Will Contest Settlment Agreement
Rulings:petition continued to 8/15/12


Case Number:*******4437
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF OLGA I. CODY
Court Date:JUN-18-2012 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:PAMELA MEYERS
Calendar Matter:PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY
Rulings:off calendar; amended petition filed.


Case Number:*******4437
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF OLGA I. CODY
Court Date:MAY-21-2012 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:PAMELA MEYERS
Calendar Matter:PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY
Rulings:petition requires an appearance


Case Number:*******4437
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF OLGA I. CODY
Court Date:APR-17-2012 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:PAMELA MEYERS
Calendar Matter:PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY
Rulings:petition continued to 5/7/12 at request of counsel


Case Number:*******4437
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF OLGA I. CODY
Court Date:FEB-29-2012 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:PAMELA MEYERS
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Filing Of Receipt For Blocked Account
Rulings:off calendar


Case Number:*******4437
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF OLGA I. CODY
Court Date:FEB-15-2012 14:30 PM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:MARY E. WISS
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion
Rulings:Motion to Compel Responses to Discovery is denied. Barrese lacks standing to propound discovery. Both partiesu00BF requests for sanctions are denied. Any party who wishes to contest the tentative and argue the motion must contact the Court (415-551-3702) and opposing counsel no later than 5:00 p.m. on 2/14/12.


Case Number:*******4437
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF OLGA I. CODY
Court Date:JAN-30-2012 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:REPORT OF SALE AND PETITION TO CONFIRM SALE OF REAL PROPERTY (607 23rd Ave. S.F.)
Rulings:Hearing


Case Number:*******4437
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF OLGA I. CODY
Court Date:NOV-30-2011 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:PAMELA MEYERS
Calendar Matter:PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY
Rulings:petition requires an appearance


Case Number:*******4437
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF OLGA I. CODY
Court Date:OCT-06-2011 14:30 PM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TIMOTHY KNEIS
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Strike; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support
Rulings:Irene Barrese's Demurrer to the "Third Ground" alleged in the First Amended Will Contest is sustained with 30 days leave to amend. The Motion to Strike is off calendar. Any party who wishes to argue the tentative ruling must notify opposing counsel and the court (415-551-3702) no later than 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday 10/5/11.


Case Number:*******4437
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF OLGA I. CODY
Court Date:JUL-27-2011 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SANDRA HILTON
Calendar Matter:PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY
Rulings:Hearing. Appearance required.


Case Number:*******4437
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF OLGA I. CODY
Court Date:JUL-06-2011 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SANDRA HILTON
Calendar Matter:PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY
Rulings:Continued by the court to July 27, 2011 as proof of service of summons on all parties is not yet complete. If this date does not work for Counsel, they should confer and contact this Examiner with a later date. Ms. Barrese to file a declaration identifying all of the heirs of the decedent no later than Wednesday, July 13, 2011.


Case Number:*******4437
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF OLGA I. CODY
Court Date:JUN-22-2011 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SANDRA HILTON
Calendar Matter:PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY
Rulings:Continued to July 6, 2011. Proof of Service of Summons filed June 20, 2011 but no courtesy copy delivered and document was not filed in time for it to be scanned and reviewed in time to set the matter for hearing (see Local Rule 14.6.B. - all documents must be filed and a courtesy copy delivered to the Examiner 3 court days prior to the hearing).


Case Number:*******4437
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF OLGA I. CODY
Court Date:MAY-04-2011 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SANDRA HILTON
Calendar Matter:PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY
Rulings:Continued to June 22, 2011 for service of summons and 30 day response time.


Case Number:*******4437
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF OLGA I. CODY
Court Date:APR-20-2011 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SANDRA HILTON
Calendar Matter:PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY
Rulings:Continued to May 4, 2011 at Counsel's request.


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U S Specialty Ins Co is a litigant

Latest cases where Western Surety Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LVOVICH, MILLA L.