This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 02/05/2023 at 11:59:06 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF MARGARET MARY EIMIL

Case Summary

On 04/22/2021 THE ESTATE OF MARGARET MARY EIMIL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOSEPH M. QUINN and ROSS C. MOODY. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4417

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

JOSEPH M. QUINN

ROSS C. MOODY

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Others

GREENSIDE, DARRED

Seattle, WA 98122

GREENSIDE, DUSTIN

Yakima, CA 98908

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. PO BOX

982238

El Paso, TX 799982238

HARCO NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

818 West Seventh St, Ste 930

Los Angeles, CA 90017

INHERIT NOW, INC.

Assignee and Other

INHERIT NOW, INC.

Decedent

EIMIL, MARGARET MARY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Other Attorneys

BUTTON, ELIZABETH M

Attorney at BUTTON LAW INC.

1052 Filbert St

San Francisco, CA 94133

KERENDIAN, SHAWN S.

Attorney at KEYSTONE LAW GROUP P.C

11300 West Olimpic Blvd, Suite 910

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Other and Assignee Attorney

KERENDIAN, SHAWN S.

Attorney at KEYSTONE LAW GROUP P.C

11300 West Olimpic Blvd, Suite 910

Los Angeles, CA 90064

 

Court Documents

Darred Greenside Creditors Claim

CREDITOR'S CLAIM FOR $7,241.99 (TRANSACTION ID # 67767479) FILED BY CREDITOR GREENSIDE, DARRED

ADMITTED WILL

PROBATE WILL DATED DEC-04-1985 ADMITTED TO PROBATE ON APR-18-2022

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR/ADMINISTRATRIX W/WILL ANNEXED

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR/ADMINISTRATRIX WITH WILL ANNEXED, APPOINTMENT UNDER IAEA, $20,000.00 BOND REQUIRED GREENSIDE, DARRED APPOINTED

Declaration of Darred Greenside Re: Liabilities of the Estate

DECLARATION OF DARRED GREENSIDE RE: LIABILITIES OF THE ESTATE (TRANSACTION ID # 67473322) FILED BY PETITIONER GREENSIDE, DARRED

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

PROOF OF PUBLICATION (SAN FRANCISCO DAILY JOURNAL) (TRANSACTION ID # 67430599)

Proof of Service by Mail for Verified Declaration of Elizabeth Button

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (TRANSACTION ID # 67401324) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE GREENSIDE, DARRED

Notice of Hearing with Proof of Service

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE (TRANSACTION ID # 67385761) FILED BY PETITIONER GREENSIDE, DUSTIN

VERIFIED DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH BUTTON ADDRESSING LEGAL ISSUES IN PE

DECLARATION (VERIFIED) OF ELIZABETH BUTTON ADDRESSING LEGAL ISSUES IN PETITION TO APPOINT DARRED GREENSIDE ADMINISTRATOR WITH WILL ANNEXED (TRANSACTION ID # 67376860) FILED BY PETITIONER GREENSIDE, DARRED

Proof of Subscribing Witness, George Eimil

PROOF OF SUBSCRIBING WITNESS (TRANSACTION ID # 67376860) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE GREENSIDE, DARRED

Allowance of Creditors Claim for Bank of America

APPROVAL/REJECTION OF CREDITOR'S CLAIM (TRANSACTION ID # 67343860) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE GREENSIDE, DARRED $1,648.70 APPROVED, ON CLAIM OF CREDITOR BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Proof of Publication

PROOF OF PUBLICATION (SAN FRANCISCO DAILY JOURNAL) (TRANSACTION ID # 67321529)

Notice of Hearing with Completed Proof of Service

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE AND PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (TRANSACTION ID # 67292753) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE GREENSIDE, DARRED

PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION AND AUT

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL ANNEXED, APPOINTMENT UNDER IAEA (TRANSACTION ID # 67290394) (TRANSACTION ID # 67290394) (TRANSACTION ID # 67290394) FILED BY PETITIONER GREENSIDE, DARRED HEARING SET FOR MAR-07-2022 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204

Creditors claim Darred Greenside

CREDITOR'S CLAIM FOR $7,241.99 (TRANSACTION ID # 67263701) FILED BY CREDITOR GREENSIDE, DARRED

NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF INTEREST IN ESTATE AND WAIVER OF DISCLAIMER RI

NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF INTEREST IN ESTATE AND WAIVER OF DISCLAIMER RIGHTS; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO PROBATE CODE 11604.5(D)(4) (TRANSACTION ID # 67175968) FILED BY ASSIGNEE INHERIT NOW, INC.

Request for special note

REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67175968) FILED BY REQUESTOR INHERIT NOW, INC.

Notice of Administration of Estate of Margaret Mary Eimil Notice to Cr

NOTICE TO CREDITORS (TRANSACTION ID # 67071776) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE GREENSIDE, DARRED

LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION ISSUED AND FILED GREENSIDE, DARRED APPOINTED WITH AUTHORITY UNDER THE IAEA

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Close Of Estate; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 204; Judge Name: ROSS C. MOODY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketADDED TO CALENDAR FOR STATUS ON CLOSE OF ESTATE HEARING SET FOR MAY-08-2023 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketADDED TO CALENDAR FOR STATUS ON CLOSE OF ESTATE, CALENDAR OF JUN-29-2022, OFF CALENDAR PER COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Close Of Estate Off Calendar Jun-29-2022 Off Calendar; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 204; Judge Name: JOSEPH M. QUINN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCREDITOR'S CLAIM FOR $7,241.99 (TRANSACTION ID # 67767479) FILED BY CREDITOR GREENSIDE, DARRED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBATE WILL DATED DEC-04-1985 ADMITTED TO PROBATE ON APR-18-2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR/ADMINISTRATRIX WITH WILL ANNEXED, APPOINTMENT UNDER IAEA, $20,000.00 BOND REQUIRED GREENSIDE, DARRED APPOINTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL ANNEXED, APPOINTMENT UNDER IAEA, CALENDAR OF APR-18-2022, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER, BOND IN THE AMOUNT OF $20,000.00 REQUIRED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL ANNEXED, Appointment Under IAEA Off Calendar Apr-18-2022 Granted Per Written Order MINI MINUTES: Appearances: Elizabeth Button, via Zoom, for Darred Greenside, via Zoom, Petitioner; Dustin Greenside, via Zoom, in propria persona, Petitioner. This matter was set for hearing with no appearance required for the purpose of admitting the will. No one appeared to object. There being no objections, the Court granted the Petition for Letters of Administration With Will Annexed. The will dated Dec-04-1985 is admitted to probate. Darred Greenside is appointed Administrator of the estate with full authority. Bond is set at $20,000. Shirley Yawitz remains probate referee. Order for the same signed in open Court. Status on close of estate is set for May-08-2023 at 9:00 a.m., in Dept. 204. Judge: Hon. Ross Moody. Clerk: Robert Woods. Deputy: Gomez. Not reported.; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 204; Judge Name: ROSS C. MOODY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR APR-18-2022 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 204

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION / VERIFIED DECLARATION OF DARRED GREENSIDE CLARIFYING INFORMATION ON THE PETITION TO PROBATE (TRANSACTION ID # 66622218) FILED BY PETITIONER GREENSIDE, DARRED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE (TRANSACTION ID # 66616975) FILED BY PETITIONER GREENSIDE, DARRED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION CONTINUED FROM MAY-19-2021 TO JUN-16-2021 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION Off Calendar May-19-2021 Continued To Jun-16-21 At 09:00 A.M. In Dept 204; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 204; Judge Name: JOSEPH M. QUINN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENCE NUMBER (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PETITIONER GREENSIDE, DARRED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION (SAN FRANCISCO DAILY JOURNAL) (TRANSACTION ID # 66573288)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE (TRANSACTION ID # 66545579) FILED BY PETITIONER GREENSIDE, DARRED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER GREENSIDE, DARRED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • FinancialPayment: PROBATE FIRST PETITION FOR LETTERS/TRUST/OTHER; Amount: $450; Payment Type: CREDIT CARD; Receipt Number: W2221422P001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION FILED BY PETITIONER GREENSIDE, DARRED AS TO DECEDENT EIMIL, MARGARET MARY HEARING SET FOR MAY-19-2021 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204; Fee: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******4417
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF MARGARET MARY EIMIL
Court Date:JUN-29-2022 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:EDWARD MIYAUCHI
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Close Of Estate
Rulings:OFF CALENDAR


Case Number:*******4417
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF MARGARET MARY EIMIL
Court Date:MAR-28-2022 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:EDWARD MIYAUCHI
Calendar Matter:PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL ANNEXED, Appointment Under IAEA
Rulings:Continued to 04/18/2022 per counsel's request (via e-mail on 03/04/2022).


Case Number:*******4417
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF MARGARET MARY EIMIL
Court Date:MAR-07-2022 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:EDWARD MIYAUCHI
Calendar Matter:PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL ANNEXED, Appointment Under IAEA
Rulings:Continued to 03/28/2022. Notes were e-mailed to petitioner (in pro per) and counsel for current administrator on 02/28/2022.


Case Number:*******4417
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF MARGARET MARY EIMIL
Court Date:MAY-19-2021 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:EDWARD MIYAUCHI
Calendar Matter:PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION
Rulings:Continued to 06/16/2021 per counsel's request (via e-mail on 05/12/2021). Notes were e-mailed to counsel on 05/12/2021.


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARCO NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KERENDIAN SHAWN S.