This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/23/2016 at 11:52:48 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF LYDIA LOUISE IDA WHITCOMB

Case Summary

On 07/02/2007 THE ESTATE OF LYDIA LOUISE IDA WHITCOMB was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0185

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

O'KEEFEE, GREGORY

LEE, H ROBERT

DEROCHECHOUART, ANTOINE

Respondents

LEPIC, STANISLAS

LEPIC, PHILIPE

DE ROCHECHOUART, NATHALIE

LEPIC, ROLAND

LEPIC DE GOUMAY, CLAIRE

LEPIC, EMMANUEL

DE ROCHECHOUART, ALAIN

LEPIC, LOUIS-JEAN

DE ROCHECHOUART, CHARLES-LOUIS

DE ROCHECHOUART, AIMERY

LEPIC, LUDOVIC

Other

INTERNATIONAL FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY

One Newark Center, 20Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

Decedent

WHITCOMB, LYDIA LOUISE IDA AKA IDA WHITCOMB AKA LYDIA LOUISE DE RAVIGNAN, ALIAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

O'KEEFFE, GREGORY PRESTON

Attorney at O'KEEFFE & O'KEEFFE

1514 Taraval St.

San Francisco, CA 94116-2350

BRYAN, RICHARD MELONE

Attorney at BRYAN HINSHAW

425 California St Ste 900

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, WILL FILED, FILED BY PETITIONER DEROCHECHOUART, ANTOINE LEE, H ROBERT AS TO DECEDENT WHITCOMB, LYDIA LOUISE IDA AKA IDA WHITCOMB AKA LYDIA LOUISE DE RAVIGNAN, ALIAS HEARING SET FOR AUG-01-2007 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:IFP)

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY PETITIONER DEROCHECHOUART, ANTOINE LEE, H ROBERT

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER DEROCHECHOUART, ANTOINE LEE, H ROBERT

ORDER

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

PROOF OF PUBLICATION (THE RECORDER)

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER DEROCHECHOUART, ANTOINE LEE, H ROBERT

GENERIC PROBATE PLEADING

WAIVER OF NOTICE RE: PETN. FOR PROB. OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TEST.AUTH. TO INDEPENDENT ADMIN.

PROOF OF SUBSCRIBING WITNESS

PROOF OF SUBSCRIBING WITNESS FILED BY PETITIONER DEROCHECHOUART, ANTOINE

PROOF OF SUBSCRIBING WITNESS

PROOF OF SUBSCRIBING WITNESS FILED BY PETITIONER DEROCHECHOUART, ANTOINE

PROOF OF SUBSCRIBING WITNESS

PROOF OF SUBSCRIBING WITNESS (THREE PROOFS OF SUBSCRIBING WITNESS) FILED BY PETITIONER DEROCHECHOUART, ANTOINE LEE, H ROBERT

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER DEROCHECHOUART, ANTOINE LEE, H ROBERT

GENERIC PROBATE PLEADING

SUPPLEMENT TO PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY; FILED BY PETITIONER DEROCHECHOUART, ANTOINE LEE, H ROBERT

GENERIC PROBATE PLEADING

WILL ADMITTED AUGUST 15, 2007

ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR/EXECUTRIX

ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR/EXECUTRIX, APPOINTMENT UNDER IAEA, $10,000.00 BOND REQUIRED FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE DEROCHECHOUART, ANTOINE LEE, H ROBERT

BOND

BOND #NONE IN THE AMOUNT OF $10,000.00 FILED BY PETITIONER DEROCHECHOUART, ANTOINE LEE, H ROBERT EXECUTED BY SURETY COMPANY INTERNATIONAL FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY

LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

LETTERS TESTAMENTARY ISSUED AND FILED DEROCHECHOUART, ANTOINE LEE, H ROBERT APPOINTED WITH AUTHORITY UNDER THE IAEA

LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

LETTERS TESTAMENTARY AMENDED ISSUED AND FILED DEROCHECHOUART, ANTOINE LEE, H ROBERT APPOINTED WITH AUTHORITY UNDER THE IAEA

ORDER APPOINTING REFEREE

ORDER APPOINTING REFEREE (SHIRLEY C. YAWITZ) FILED BY PETITIONER DEROCHECHOUART, ANTOINE LEE, H ROBERT

83 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2013
  • ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #3, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION, CALENDAR OF APR-29-2013, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2013
  • COPYING FEES (18 PAGE, 1 CERTIFIED COPY) (Fee:34.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ACCOUNTING #3, REPORT, FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PARTIAL ASSIGNMENT OF ALL BENEFICIARIES OF DISTRIBUTION OF ESTATE FILED BY PETITIONER DEROCHECHOUART, ANTOINE LEE, H ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION TO SUPPLEMENT PETITION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF ESTATE; THIRD AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF CO-EXECUTORS AND PETITION FOR ITS SETTLEMENT, ETC. FILED BY PETITIONER DEROCHECHOUART, ANTOINE LEE, H ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PARTIAL ASSIGNMENT OF DISTRIBUTION OF ESTATE [2] FILED BY PETITIONER DEROCHECHOUART, ANTOINE LEE, H ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #3, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION CONTINUED FROM APR-08-2013 TO APR-29-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROBATE SUMMONS FILED BY PETITIONER DEROCHECHOUART, ANTOINE LEE, H ROBERT AS TO RESPONDENT DE ROCHECHOUART, AIMERY DE ROCHECHOUART, NATHALIE DE ROCHECHOUART, ALAIN DE ROCHECHOUART, CHARLES-LOUIS LEPIC, LOUIS-JEAN LEPIC DE GOUMAY, CLAIRE LEPIC, EMMANUEL LEPIC, LUDOVIC LEPIC, STANISLAS LEPIC, PHILIPE LEPIC, ROLAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER DEROCHECHOUART, ANTOINE LEE, H ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CONSENTS OF ALL BENEFICIARIES OF WILL ADMINISTERED IN FRANCE TO DISTRIBUTION OF ESTATE FILED BY PETITIONER DEROCHECHOUART, ANTOINE LEE, H ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
126 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSCRIBING WITNESS FILED BY PETITIONER DEROCHECHOUART, ANTOINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSCRIBING WITNESS FILED BY PETITIONER DEROCHECHOUART, ANTOINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • WAIVER OF NOTICE RE: PETN. FOR PROB. OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TEST.AUTH. TO INDEPENDENT ADMIN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER DEROCHECHOUART, ANTOINE LEE, H ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION (THE RECORDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER DEROCHECHOUART, ANTOINE LEE, H ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY PETITIONER DEROCHECHOUART, ANTOINE LEE, H ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2007
  • APPLICATION PENDING FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68511.3 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PETITIONER DEROCHECHOUART, ANTOINE LEE, H ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, WILL FILED, FILED BY PETITIONER DEROCHECHOUART, ANTOINE LEE, H ROBERT AS TO DECEDENT WHITCOMB, LYDIA LOUISE IDA AKA IDA WHITCOMB AKA LYDIA LOUISE DE RAVIGNAN, ALIAS HEARING SET FOR AUG-01-2007 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******0185
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF LYDIA LOUISE IDA WHITCOMB
Court Date:APR-29-2013 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:PAMELA MEYERS
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #3, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Rulings:petition approved; no appearance is required.


Case Number:*******0185
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF LYDIA LOUISE IDA WHITCOMB
Court Date:APR-08-2013 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:PAMELA MEYERS
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #3, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Rulings:petition continued to 4/29/13


Case Number:*******0185
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF LYDIA LOUISE IDA WHITCOMB
Court Date:JUN-04-2012 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:PAMELA MEYERS
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Filing Of Petition For Preliminary Distribution Of The Chestnut Street Property
Rulings:status off calendar


Case Number:*******0185
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF LYDIA LOUISE IDA WHITCOMB
Court Date:APR-30-2012 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:PAMELA MEYERS
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #2, REPORT, FEES
Rulings:petition approved; no appearance required.


Case Number:*******0185
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF LYDIA LOUISE IDA WHITCOMB
Court Date:APR-23-2012 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:PAMELA MEYERS
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #2, REPORT, FEES
Rulings:petition continued one week to 4/30/12


Case Number:*******0185
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF LYDIA LOUISE IDA WHITCOMB
Court Date:APR-09-2012 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:PAMELA MEYERS
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #2, REPORT, FEES
Rulings:petition continued to 4/23/12


Case Number:*******0185
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF LYDIA LOUISE IDA WHITCOMB
Court Date:MAR-19-2012 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:PAMELA MEYERS
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #2, REPORT, FEES
Rulings:petition continued to 4/9/12


Case Number:*******0185
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF LYDIA LOUISE IDA WHITCOMB
Court Date:JAN-25-2011 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES
Rulings:Grant without hearing


Case Number:*******0185
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF LYDIA LOUISE IDA WHITCOMB
Court Date:JAN-11-2011 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES
Rulings:Continued to 1/25/11 - Notes faxed 1/10/11


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where International Fidelity Ins Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRYAN, RICHARD MELONE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'KEEFFE, GREGORY PRESTON