Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/26/2016 at 19:31:41 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF LORRAINE COLEMAN

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 THE ESTATE OF LORRAINE COLEMAN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6451

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Others

JEWISH FAMILY & CHILDREN'S SERVICES

KATO, FEDER & SUZUKI LLP

DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES

P.O. Box 997425

Sacramento, CA 95899

LOS ALTOS SUB-ACUTE AND REHABILITATION CENTER

JORDAN, DIMITRA

Decedent

COLEMAN, LORRAINE AKA TOOTIE COLEMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

KATO, BRENT RICHARD

Attorney at KATO, FEDER & SUZUKI

685 Market Street, Suite 540

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

GENERIC PROBATE PLEADING

WAIVER OF 15 DAYS NOTICE OF HEARING ON FIRST AMENDMENT TO PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE JEWISH FAMILY & CHILDREN'S SERVICES

WITHDRAWAL OF REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE

WITHDRAWAL OF REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE AND DISMISSAL OF CREDITOR'S CLAIM FILED BY REQUESTOR DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES

DECLARATION

DECLARATION OF ADMINISTRATOR WITH WILL ANNEXED IN SUPPORT OF EXTRAORDINARY FEES FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE JEWISH FAMILY & CHILDREN'S SERVICES

GENERIC PROBATE PLEADING

RECEIPTS RE: PRELIMINARY DISTRIBUTION FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE JEWISH FAMILY & CHILDREN'S SERVICES

LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL ANNEXED

LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL ANNEXED ISSUED AND FILED JEWISH FAMILY & CHILDREN'S SERVICES APPOINTED WITH AUTHORITY UNDER THE IAEA

DECLARATION

DECLARATION OF BRUCE A FEDER IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEYS EXTRAORDINARY FEES FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE JEWISH FAMILY & CHILDREN'S SERVICES

GENERIC PROBATE PLEADING

WILL ADMITTED INTO PROBATE

GENERIC PROBATE PLEADING

CERTIFIED LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION RE: ESTATE OF DOROTHY M. GRAY AKA DOROTHY MARIE GRAY FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE JEWISH FAMILY & CHILDREN'S SERVICES

NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE JEWISH FAMILY & CHILDREN'S SERVICES

Administrator Declaration in Support of Petition for Final Distributio

DECLARATION ADMINISTRATOR DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION UNDER WILL; FOR APPROVAL OF FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF ADMINISTRATOR WITH WILL ANNEXED, FOR APPROVAL OF STATUTORY FEES AND COSTS ADVANCED TO ADMINISTRATOR AND ATTORNEYS, FOR APPROVAL OF EXTRAORDINARY FEES AND COSTS ADVANCED TO ADMINISTRATOR AND ATTORNEYS, AND FOR A RESERVE (TRANSACTION ID # 58121452) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE JEWISH FAMILY & CHILDREN'S SERVICES

DECLARATION

DECLARATION (ATTORNEY'S) IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING AND DIRECTING REPLIMINARY DISTRIBUTION; AND FOR AN ALLOWANCE IN COMPENSATION OF FIFTY PERCENT OF ESTIMATED STATUTORY FEES TO ADMINISTRATOR AND ATTORNEYS FILED BY PETITIONER JEWISH FAMILY & CHILDREN'S SERVICES

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY PETITIONER JEWISH FAMILY & CHILDREN'S SERVICES

ACCOUNTING PETITION RE:

ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE JEWISH FAMILY & CHILDREN'S SERVICES HEARING SET FOR OCT-28-2015 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:435.00)

GENERIC PROBATE PLEADING

SUPPLEMENTAL TO PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL ANNEXXED AND ETC. FILED BY PETITIONER JEWISH FAMILY & CHILDREN'S SERVICES

GENERIC PROBATE PLEADING

NOTICE TO DIRECTOR OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES TO FILE CLAIM. FILED BY PETITIONER JEWISH FAMILY & CHILDREN'S SERVICES

Attorney Declaration in Support of Petition for Final Distribution und

DECLARATION ATTORNEY DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION UNDER WILL; FOR APPROVAL OF FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF ADMINISTRATOR WITH WILL ANNEXED, FOR APPROVAL OF STATUTORY FEES AND COSTS ADVANCED TO ADMINISTRATOR AND ATTORNEYS, FOR APPROVAL OF EXTRAORDINARY FEES AND COSTS ADVANCED TO ADMINISTRATOR AND ATTORNEYS, AND FOR A RESERVE (TRANSACTION ID # 58121452) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE JEWISH FAMILY & CHILDREN'S SERVICES

ORDER APPOINTING REFEREE

ORDER APPOINTING REFEREE (WARREN WONG) FILED BY PETITIONER JEWISH FAMILY & CHILDREN'S SERVICES

ORDER APPROVING PRELIMINARY DISTRIBUTION

ORDER APPROVING PRELIMINARY DISTRIBUTION FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE JEWISH FAMILY & CHILDREN'S SERVICES

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION, CALENDAR OF NOV-10-2015, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION ADMINISTRATOR DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION UNDER WILL; FOR APPROVAL OF FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF ADMINISTRATOR WITH WILL ANNEXED, FOR APPROVAL OF STATUTORY FEES AND COSTS ADVANCED TO ADMINISTRATOR AND ATTORNEYS, FOR APPROVAL OF EXTRAORDINARY FEES AND COSTS ADVANCED TO ADMINISTRATOR AND ATTORNEYS, AND FOR A RESERVE (TRANSACTION ID # 58121452) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE JEWISH FAMILY & CHILDREN'S SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION ATTORNEY DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION UNDER WILL; FOR APPROVAL OF FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF ADMINISTRATOR WITH WILL ANNEXED, FOR APPROVAL OF STATUTORY FEES AND COSTS ADVANCED TO ADMINISTRATOR AND ATTORNEYS, FOR APPROVAL OF EXTRAORDINARY FEES AND COSTS ADVANCED TO ADMINISTRATOR AND ATTORNEYS, AND FOR A RESERVE (TRANSACTION ID # 58121452) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE JEWISH FAMILY & CHILDREN'S SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT OF LIFE INSURANCE BENEFIT (TRANSACTION ID # 58121452) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE JEWISH FAMILY & CHILDREN'S SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION CONTINUED FROM OCT-28-2015 TO NOV-10-2015 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • WAIVER OF 15 DAYS NOTICE OF HEARING ON FIRST AMENDMENT TO PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE JEWISH FAMILY & CHILDREN'S SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE JEWISH FAMILY & CHILDREN'S SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • WAIVER OF 15 DAYS NOTICE OF HEARING ON FIRST AMENDMENT TO PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE JEWISH FAMILY & CHILDREN'S SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • WAIVER OF 15 DAYS NOTICE OF HEARING ON FIRST AMENDMENT TO PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE JEWISH FAMILY & CHILDREN'S SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR/ADMINISTRATRIX, APPOINTMENT UNDER IAEA, NO BOND REQUIRED FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE JEWISH FAMILY & CHILDREN'S SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER JEWISH FAMILY & CHILDREN'S SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • COPYING FEES (2 PAGE, 2 CERTIFIED COPY) (Fee:51.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • MINI MINUTES FOR APR-10-2013 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 204

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER JEWISH FAMILY & CHILDREN'S SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL ANNEXED CONTINUED FROM MAR-20-2013 TO APR-10-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL ANNEXED CONTINUED FROM MAR-06-2013 TO MAR-20-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION (THE RECORDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER JEWISH FAMILY & CHILDREN'S SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL ANNEXED, WILL FILED, FILED BY PETITIONER JEWISH FAMILY & CHILDREN'S SERVICES AS TO DECEDENT COLEMAN, LORRAINE AKA TOOTIE COLEMAN HEARING SET FOR MAR-06-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less