This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 05/28/2020 at 17:55:26 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF KEVIN JOHN O'DONNELL

Case Summary

On 05/27/2020 THE ESTATE OF KEVIN JOHN O'DONNELL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PETER J. BUSCH. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3645

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

PETER J. BUSCH

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HILL, PATRICIA A.

Decedent

O'DONNELL, KEVIN JOHN AKA JOHN JOSEPH O'DONNELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GREENE, RICHARD LAWRENCE

Attorney at GREENE RADOVSKY MALONEY SHARE & HENNIGH LLP

One Front Street, Ste 3200

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, WILL FILED, FILED BY PETITIONER HILL, PATRICIA A. AS TO DECEDENT O'DONNELL, KEVIN JOHN AKA JOHN JOSEPH O'DONNELL HEARING SET FOR JUN-23-2020 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER HILL, PATRICIA A.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2020
  • HearingMatter(s): PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 204; Judge Name: PETER J. BUSCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • HearingMatter(s): PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY Off Calendar May-27-2020 Continued To Sep-15-20 At 09:00 A.M. In Dept 204; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 204; Judge Name: PETER J. BUSCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER HILL, PATRICIA A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY CONTINUED FROM JUN-23-2020 TO SEP-15-2020 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketDEPOSITED WILL PDW-20-060445 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • FinancialPayment : PROBATE FIRST PETITION FOR LETTERS/TRUST/OTHER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W2420527P006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, WILL FILED, FILED BY PETITIONER HILL, PATRICIA A. AS TO DECEDENT O'DONNELL, KEVIN JOHN AKA JOHN JOSEPH O'DONNELL HEARING SET FOR JUN-23-2020 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******3645
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF KEVIN JOHN O'DONNELL
Court Date:FEB-08-2022 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SANDRA HILTON
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Close Of Estate
Rulings:continued to 3/8/22. either a petition for final distribution or a petition to approve status of administration must be filed by noon 2/28/22 or an appearance will be required.


Case Number:*******3645
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF KEVIN JOHN O'DONNELL
Court Date:OCT-27-2020 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:EDWARD MIYAUCHI
Calendar Matter:PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY
Rulings:Hearing solely to admit decedent's will dated 08/31/2013. No appearance required. No conformed copy of signed order will be returned (no self-addressed stamped envelope provided). Petition for final distribution or petition for approval of report of status of administration must be filed by 02/01/2022. Appearance required at status hearing on 02/08/2022 if not filed.


Case Number:*******3645
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF KEVIN JOHN O'DONNELL
Court Date:OCT-06-2020 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:EDWARD MIYAUCHI
Calendar Matter:PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY
Rulings:Continued to 10/27/2020. Notes were e-mailed to counsel on 09/29/2020.


Case Number:*******3645
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF KEVIN JOHN O'DONNELL
Court Date:SEP-15-2020 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:EDWARD MIYAUCHI
Calendar Matter:PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY
Rulings:Continued to 10/06/2020. Notes were e-mailed to counsel on 09/08/2020. Paper courtesy copies of all documents filed and proposed orders must be mailed to Room 202 or placed in a drop box outside Room 103.


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREENE, RICHARD LAWRENCE