This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 01/11/2018 at 10:55:36 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF JULITA R. VICTORIO

Case Summary

On 01/09/2018 THE ESTATE OF JULITA R VICTORIO was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PETER J. BUSCH. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1524

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

PETER J. BUSCH

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PONCIANO, LILLIAN DE ROSAS

Decedent

VICTORIO, JULITA R. AKA JULITA DE ROSAS VICTORIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MCDONAGH, STEPHEN BERNARD

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF STEPHEN B. MCDONAGH

1919 Lawton Street

San Francisco, CA 94122

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, WILL FILED, FILED BY PETITIONER PONCIANO, LILLIAN DE ROSAS AS TO DECEDENT VICTORIO, JULITA R. AKA JULITA DE ROSAS VICTORIO HEARING SET FOR FEB-06-2018 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204

PROOF OF HOLOGRAPHIC INSTRUMENT

PROOF OF HOLOGRAPHIC INSTRUMENT FILED BY PETITIONER PONCIANO, LILLIAN DE ROSAS

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2018
  • Payment : PROBATE FIRST PETITION FOR LETTERS/TRUST/OTHER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2418109P006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF HOLOGRAPHIC INSTRUMENT FILED BY PETITIONER PONCIANO, LILLIAN DE ROSAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, WILL FILED, FILED BY PETITIONER PONCIANO, LILLIAN DE ROSAS AS TO DECEDENT VICTORIO, JULITA R. AKA JULITA DE ROSAS VICTORIO HEARING SET FOR FEB-06-2018 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******1524
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF JULITA R. VICTORIO
Court Date:FEB-06-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SANDRA HILTON
Calendar Matter:PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY
Rulings:continued to february 20, 2018 for a response to the examiner's notes. notes were mailed to counsel on 1/31/18 as no fax or email address was provided on the pleadings. new deadline for filing a response in order to avoid an automatic continuance is tuesday, february 13, 2018.


Case Number:*******1524
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF JULITA R. VICTORIO
Court Date:FEB-20-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SANDRA HILTON
Calendar Matter:PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY
Rulings:grant without hearing. status hearing on close of estate set for 8/13/19


Case Number:*******1524
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF JULITA R. VICTORIO
Court Date:SEP-17-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SANDRA HILTON
Calendar Matter:Petition For Instructions Confirming Revocation Of Trust And To Confirm Assets To Probate Estate
Rulings:continued to october 1, 2018. no file stamped copy of the petition delivered to the examiner. new deadline in order to avoid an automatic continuance is wednesday, septemer 26, 2018. examiner received the proposed order.


Case Number:*******1524
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF JULITA R. VICTORIO
Court Date:OCT-01-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SANDRA HILTON
Calendar Matter:Petition For Instructions Confirming Revocation Of Trust And To Confirm Assets To Probate Estate
Rulings:hearing. appearance required.


Case Number:*******1524
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF JULITA R. VICTORIO
Court Date:APR-29-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SANDRA HILTON
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: REPORT, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Rulings:continued to may 13, 2019. the supplement to the petition was signed only by the attorney. it must be verified by the petitioner. the exception that allows an attorney to sign and verify on behalf of a client does not apply when the client is a fiduciary appointed in the proceeding (CRC 7.103(c)).


Case Number:*******1524
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF JULITA R. VICTORIO
Court Date:MAY-13-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SANDRA HILTON
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: REPORT, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Rulings:grant without hearing


Case Number:*******1524
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF JULITA R. VICTORIO
Court Date:AUG-13-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SANDRA HILTON
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status Hearing On Close Of Estate
Rulings:off calendar


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen Bernard McDonagh