This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/25/2016 at 01:34:13 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF JOSEPH FEDERICO

Case Summary

On 08/05/2010 THE ESTATE OF JOSEPH FEDERICO was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3769

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Others and Petitioners

INHERITANCE FUNDING COMPANY, INC.

RODGERS, BARBARA

KEY NATIONAL FUNDING, LLC.

ACCELERATED INHERITANCE, LLC

Assignee and Other

KEY NATIONAL FUNDING, LLC.

Decedent

FEDERICO, JOSEPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SCHROEDER, STEVEN D

275 Battery St., Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94111

Other Attorney

JACOBS, KENNETH S

117 N Main St

Sebastopol, CA 95472

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, WILL FILED, FILED BY PETITIONER RODGERS, BARBARA AS TO DECEDENT FEDERICO, JOSEPH HEARING SET FOR AUG-30-2010 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:370.00)

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY PETITIONER RODGERS, BARBARA

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER RODGERS, BARBARA

DECLARATION

DECLARATION OF BARBARA RODGERS. FILED BY PETITIONER RODGERS, BARBARA

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER RODGERS, BARBARA

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

PROOF OF PUBLICATION (THE RECORDER)

GENERIC PROBATE PLEADING

WILL ADMITTED TO PROBATE

ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR/EXECUTRIX

ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR/EXECUTRIX, APPOINTMENT UNDER IAEA, NO BOND REQUIRED FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE RODGERS, BARBARA

LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

LETTERS TESTAMENTARY ISSUED AND FILED RODGERS, BARBARA APPOINTED WITH AUTHORITY UNDER THE IAEA

REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE

REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE FILED BY REQUESTOR ACCELERATED INHERITANCE, LLC

GENERIC PROBATE PLEADING

PARTIAL ASSIGNMENT OF BENEFICIAL INTEREST OF JOSEPH JOHN FEDERICO, JR. FILED BY REQUESTOR ACCELERATED INHERITANCE, LLC

GENERIC PROBATE PLEADING

PARTIAL ASSIGNMENT OF BENEFICIAL INTEREST OF JOSEPH JOHN FEDERICO, JR. FILED BY REQUESTOR ACCELERATED INHERITANCE, LLC

ORDER APPOINTING REFEREE

ORDER APPOINTING REFEREE (SHIRLEY C. YAWITZ) FILED BY PETITIONER RODGERS, BARBARA

GENERIC PROBATE PLEADING

PARTIAL ASSIGNMENT OF BENEFICIAL INTEREST OF JOSEPH JOHN FEDERICO, JR. FILED BY REQUESTOR ACCELERATED INHERITANCE, LLC

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER RODGERS, BARBARA

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER RODGERS, BARBARA

REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE

REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE FILED BY REQUESTOR KEY NATIONAL FUNDING, LLC.

GENERIC PROBATE PLEADING

AGREEMENT FOR SALE AND TRANSFER OF BENEFICIAL INTEREST, ASSINGMENT AND WAIVER OF DISCLAIMER RIGHTS OF ANTHONY; ECT. FEDERICO FILED BY ASSIGNEE KEY NATIONAL FUNDING, LLC.

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE PETITION FOR FINAL DISCHARGE AND ORDER FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE RODGERS, BARBARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT [3] FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE RODGERS, BARBARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: RECORDATION OF EXECUTOR'S DEED FILED BY PETITIONER RODGERS, BARBARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION (SIX RECEIPTS) FILED BY PETITIONER RODGERS, BARBARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • WITHDRAWAL OF REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE FILED BY REQUESTOR INHERITANCE FUNDING COMPANY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF ASSIGNMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2012
  • ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION, CALENDAR OF DEC-24-2012, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER RODGERS, BARBARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2012
  • ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION CONTINUED FROM DEC-10-2012 TO DEC-24-2012 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR/EXECUTRIX, APPOINTMENT UNDER IAEA, NO BOND REQUIRED FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE RODGERS, BARBARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2010
  • COPYING FEES (4 PAGE, 4 CERTIFIED COPY) (Fee:102.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2010
  • PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, CALENDAR OF AUG-30-2010, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • WILL ADMITTED TO PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION (THE RECORDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER RODGERS, BARBARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF BARBARA RODGERS. FILED BY PETITIONER RODGERS, BARBARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER RODGERS, BARBARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY PETITIONER RODGERS, BARBARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, WILL FILED, FILED BY PETITIONER RODGERS, BARBARA AS TO DECEDENT FEDERICO, JOSEPH HEARING SET FOR AUG-30-2010 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******3769
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF JOSEPH FEDERICO
Court Date:DEC-24-2012 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:PAMELA MEYERS
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Rulings:petition approved; no appearance required.


Case Number:*******3769
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF JOSEPH FEDERICO
Court Date:DEC-10-2012 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:PAMELA MEYERS
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Rulings:continued to 12/24/12


Case Number:*******3769
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF JOSEPH FEDERICO
Court Date:OCT-24-2012 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Closing Of Estate
Rulings: OFF CALENDAR


Case Number:*******3769
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF JOSEPH FEDERICO
Court Date:OCT-03-2012 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Closing Of Estate
Rulings: Continued to 10/24/12.


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KEY NATIONAL FUNDING, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ACCELERATED INHERITANCE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where INHERITANCE FUNDING CO. INC is a litigant