This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/24/2016 at 07:48:31 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF ERNELL A VELARDE

Case Summary

On 04/05/2010 THE ESTATE OF ERNELL A VELARDE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3375

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Others

VELARDE, ALFREDO

San Francisco, CA 94107

VELARDE, LAURA

Union City, CA 94587

Respondent, Petitioner and Other

VELARDE, LAURA

Union City, CA 94587

Others and Petitioners

INTERNATIONAL FIDELITY INSURANCE CO.

1575 Treat Blvd., Suite 208

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

VELARDE, ALFREDO

San Francisco, CA 94107

GONZALEZ, NANCY

VELARDE, LAURA

Union City, CA 94587

Decedent

VELARDE, ERNELL A

San Francisco, CA 94112

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner, Other and Respondent Attorneys

FRIEDENBERG, DAVID J.

2171 Junipero Serra Bl #620

Daly City, CA 94014

RODDICK, ROBERT THOMAS

1330 Castro Street

San Francisco, CA 94114

 

Court Documents

GENERIC PROBATE PLEADING

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT ON PETITION TO QUIET TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY AND FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

GENERIC PROBATE PLEADING

RESPONDENTS OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED STTEMENT OF DECISION, AND PROPOSED JUDGMENT ON PETITION TO QUIET TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY AND FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF FILED BY OBJECTOR VELARDE, LAURA

GENERIC PROBATE PLEADING

PROPOSED JUDGMENT OF DECISION AND PROPOSED JUDGMENT ON PETITION TO QUIET TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY AND FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION FILED BY PETITIONER GONZALEZ, NANCY AS TO DECEDENT VELARDE, ERNELL A HEARING SET FOR APR-26-2010 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:370.00)

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE AND PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER GONZALEZ, NANCY

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

PROOF OF PUBLICATION (SAN FRANCISCO DAILY JOURNAL)

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR/ADMINISTRATRIX

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR/ADMINISTRATRIX, LIMITED APPOINTMENT UNDER IAEA, $437,000.00 BOND REQUIRED FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE GONZALEZ, NANCY

BOND

BOND #17889 IN THE AMOUNT OF $437,000.00 FILED BY PETITIONER GONZALEZ, NANCY EXECUTED BY SURETY COMPANY INTERNATIONAL FIDELITY INSURANCE CO.

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER GONZALEZ, NANCY

LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION ISSUED AND FILED GONZALEZ, NANCY APPOINTED WITH LIMITED AUTHORITY UNDER THE IAEA

DECLARATION OF REAL PROPERTY

DECLARATION OF REAL PROPERTY FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE GONZALEZ, NANCY

ORDER APPOINTING REFEREE

ORDER APPOINTING REFEREE (ISIDOOR BORNSTEIN) FILED BY PETITIONER GONZALEZ, NANCY

SUBSEQUENT PROBATE PETITION

PETITION FOR DETERMINATION BY COURT QUIETING TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY AND FOR DECLATORY RELIEF FILED BY PETITIONER GONZALEZ, NANCY HEARING SET FOR JUL-28-2010 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:355.00)

NOTICE

NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION: LAURA VELARDE, AKA LAURA M. VELARDE, AKA LAURA VELARDE TORRES, AKA LAURA VELARDE SUPERVILLE CONCERNING REAL PROPERTY COMMONLY KNOWN AS 167 ROME STREET, CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, WHOSE LEGAL DESCRIPTION IS SET FORTH HEREIN. [2] FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE GONZALEZ, NANCY

NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING AND PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE GONZALEZ, NANCY

PROBATE OPPOSITION/OBJECTION

PROBATE OPPOSITION/OBJECTION TO PETITION FOR DETERMINATION BY COURT QUIETING TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY AND FOR DECLATORY RELIEF FILED BY OBJECTOR VELARDE, LAURA (Fee:355.00)

DECLARATION

DECLARATION OF VIRGINIA POTTS FILED BY OBJECTOR VELARDE, LAURA

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (AMENDED) FILED BY PETITIONER GONZALEZ, NANCY

99 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE PETITION FOR FINAL DISCHARGE AND ORDER FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE GONZALEZ, NANCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE GONZALEZ, NANCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION THREE RECEIPTS FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE GONZALEZ, NANCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION (THREE) FILED BY PETITIONER GONZALEZ, NANCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2014
  • ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION, CALENDAR OF AUG-20-2014, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2014
  • ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION, CALENDAR OF AUG-20-2014, TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AS OF AUG-20-2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2014
  • MINI MINUTES FOR AUG-20-2014 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 204

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION ROBERT T. RODDICK'S RESPONSE ALFREDO VELARDE'S DECLARATION IN OPPOSITION TO THE FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING AND REPORT FILED BY PETITIONER GONZALEZ, NANCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARARIONOF A. VELARDE IN OPPOSITION TO FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING & REPORT FILED BY OTHER VELARDE, ALFREDO

    Read MoreRead Less
160 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2010
  • PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION, CALENDAR OF MAY-12-2010, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER, BOND IN THE AMOUNT OF $437,000.00 REQUIRED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2010
  • COPYING FEES (1 PAGE, 1 CERTIFIED COPY) (Fee:25.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION ISSUED AND FILED GONZALEZ, NANCY APPOINTED WITH LIMITED AUTHORITY UNDER THE IAEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER GONZALEZ, NANCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • BOND #17889 IN THE AMOUNT OF $437,000.00 FILED BY PETITIONER GONZALEZ, NANCY EXECUTED BY SURETY COMPANY INTERNATIONAL FIDELITY INSURANCE CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR/ADMINISTRATRIX, LIMITED APPOINTMENT UNDER IAEA, $437,000.00 BOND REQUIRED FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE GONZALEZ, NANCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION (SAN FRANCISCO DAILY JOURNAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2010
  • PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION CONTINUED FROM APR-26-2010 TO MAY-12-2010 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE AND PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER GONZALEZ, NANCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION FILED BY PETITIONER GONZALEZ, NANCY AS TO DECEDENT VELARDE, ERNELL A HEARING SET FOR APR-26-2010 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******3375
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF ERNELL A VELARDE
Court Date:JUL-13-2011 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SANDRA HILTON
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status Of The Accountings And Receipt By The Estate Of The Patelco Credit Union Funds
Rulings:Continued to September 7, 2011 due to reconsideration of the order.


Case Number:*******3375
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF ERNELL A VELARDE
Court Date:JUL-29-2011 09:30 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SANDRA HILTON
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Further Evidentiary Hearing On Issue Of "Joint Owner" Of Bank Account
Rulings:


Case Number:*******3375
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF ERNELL A VELARDE
Court Date:SEP-07-2011 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:PAMELA MEYERS
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status Of The Accountings And Receipt By The Estate Of The Patelco Credit Union Funds
Rulings:status continued to 10/4/11 per Judge Wiss


Case Number:*******3375
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF ERNELL A VELARDE
Court Date:OCT-04-2011 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:PAMELA MEYERS
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status Of The Accountings And Receipt By The Estate Of The Patelco Credit Union Funds
Rulings:status is now taken off calendar; no appearance is required.


Case Number:*******3375
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF ERNELL A VELARDE
Court Date:JUN-17-2013 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SANDRA HILTON
Calendar Matter:Petition For Authority To Administer Decedent'S Estate Under The Independent Administyration Of Estates Act And For Waiver Of Bond
Rulings:Grant without hearing.


Case Number:*******3375
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF ERNELL A VELARDE
Court Date:MAY-27-2014 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:PAMELA MEYERS
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Rulings:appearance is required


Case Number:*******3375
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF ERNELL A VELARDE
Court Date:AUG-20-2014 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:PAMELA MEYERS
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Rulings:appearance is required


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where International Fidelity Ins Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRIEDENBERG, DAVID J.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RODDICK, ROBERT THOMAS