This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/28/2016 at 05:07:12 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF EMMET JOHN PURCELL

Case Summary

On 06/25/2015 THE ESTATE OF EMMET JOHN PURCELL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8911

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Other

PURCELL, WILLIAM

Decedent

PURCELL, EMMET JOHN AKA EMMET PURCELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorney

LAMAR, HILARY LOUISE

Attorney at WEINTRAUB GENSHLEA CHEDIAK TOBIN & TOBIN

475 Sansome St., Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

WAIVER OF NOTICE OF THE SUPPLEMENT AMENDING THE AMOUNT OF FEES IN THE

WAIVER OF NOTICE OF THE SUPPLEMENT AMENDING THE AMOUNT OF FEES IN THE PRAYER(4) (TRANSACTION ID # 58767339) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE PURCELL, WILLIAM

SUPPLEMENT TO REPORT OF EXECUTOR PETITION FOR APPROVAL FOR ALLOWANCE O

SUPPLEMENT TO REPORT OF EXECUTOR PETITION FOR APPROVAL FOR ALLOWANCE OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT (TRANSACTION ID # 58686058) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE PURCELL, WILLIAM

NOTICE OF HEARING DECEDENTS ESTATE OR TRUST

NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 58625828) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE PURCELL, WILLIAM

Waiver on Account 4

WAIVER ON ACCOUNT 4 (TRANSACTION ID # 58622925) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE PURCELL, WILLIAM

REPORT OF EXECUTOR PETITION FOR APPROVAL FOR ALLOWANCE OF ATTORNEYS FE

ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION (TRANSACTION ID # 58619742) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE PURCELL, WILLIAM HEARING SET FOR MAR-28-2016 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:435.00)

GENERIC PROBATE PLEADING

NOTICE TO DIRECTOR OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE PURCELL, WILLIAM

NOTICE TO CREDITORS

NOTICE TO CREDITORS (AMENDED) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE PURCELL, WILLIAM

NOTICE TO CREDITORS

NOTICE TO CREDITORS FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE PURCELL, WILLIAM

LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

LETTERS TESTAMENTARY ISSUED AND FILED PURCELL, WILLIAM APPOINTED WITH AUTHORITY UNDER THE IAEA

ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR/EXECUTRIX

ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR/EXECUTRIX, APPOINTMENT UNDER IAEA, NO BOND REQUIRED FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE PURCELL, WILLIAM

GENERIC PROBATE PLEADING

PROBATE WILL DATED MARCH 21, 1988 ADMITTED TO PROBATE ON JULY 22, 2015 FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE PURCELL, WILLIAM

GENERIC PROBATE PLEADING

SUPPLEMENT TO PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED BY PETITIONER PURCELL, WILLIAM

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

PROOF OF PUBLICATION (CALIFORNIA NEWSPAPER SERVICE BUREAU)

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY PETITIONER PURCELL, WILLIAM

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER PURCELL, WILLIAM

PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, WILL FILED, FILED BY PETITIONER PURCELL, WILLIAM AS TO DECEDENT PURCELL, EMMET JOHN AKA EMMET PURCELL HEARING SET FOR JUL-22-2015 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:450.00)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER OF NOTICE OF THE SUPPLEMENT AMENDING THE AMOUNT OF FEES IN THE PRAYER(4) (TRANSACTION ID # 58767339) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE PURCELL, WILLIAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPLEMENT TO REPORT OF EXECUTOR PETITION FOR APPROVAL FOR ALLOWANCE OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT (TRANSACTION ID # 58686058) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE PURCELL, WILLIAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 58625828) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE PURCELL, WILLIAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER ON ACCOUNT 4 (TRANSACTION ID # 58622925) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE PURCELL, WILLIAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACCOUNTING PETITION RE: REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION (TRANSACTION ID # 58619742) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE PURCELL, WILLIAM HEARING SET FOR MAR-28-2016 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:435.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • DocketINVENTORY AND APPRAISAL FINAL FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE PURCELL, WILLIAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • DocketCOPYING FEES (1 PAGE, 1 CERTIFIED COPY) PAID BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE PURCELL, WILLIAM (Fee:25.50)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO DIRECTOR OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE PURCELL, WILLIAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS (AMENDED) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE PURCELL, WILLIAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE PURCELL, WILLIAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTERS TESTAMENTARY ISSUED AND FILED PURCELL, WILLIAM APPOINTED WITH AUTHORITY UNDER THE IAEA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR/EXECUTRIX, APPOINTMENT UNDER IAEA, NO BOND REQUIRED FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE PURCELL, WILLIAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBATE WILL DATED MARCH 21, 1988 ADMITTED TO PROBATE ON JULY 22, 2015 FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE PURCELL, WILLIAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • DocketPETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, CALENDAR OF JUL-22-2015, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • DocketADDED TO CALENDAR FOR STATUS ON CLOSE OF ESTATE HEARING SET FOR JAN-23-2017 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPLEMENT TO PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED BY PETITIONER PURCELL, WILLIAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION (CALIFORNIA NEWSPAPER SERVICE BUREAU)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY PETITIONER PURCELL, WILLIAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER PURCELL, WILLIAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, WILL FILED, FILED BY PETITIONER PURCELL, WILLIAM AS TO DECEDENT PURCELL, EMMET JOHN AKA EMMET PURCELL HEARING SET FOR JUL-22-2015 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******8911
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF EMMET JOHN PURCELL
Court Date:JAN-23-2017 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Close Of Estate
Rulings: OFF CALENDAR


Case Number:*******8911
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF EMMET JOHN PURCELL
Court Date:MAR-28-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Rulings: Grant without hearing


Case Number:*******8911
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF EMMET JOHN PURCELL
Court Date:JUL-22-2015 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TIMOTHY KNEIS
Calendar Matter:PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY
Rulings: Grant without hearing; status on close of estate calendared for 1/23/17


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAMAR, HILARY LOUISE