This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 08/12/2021 at 17:55:31 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF EDDA CABRERA

Case Summary

On 08/05/2021 THE ESTATE OF EDDA CABRERA was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOSEPH M. QUINN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4691

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOSEPH M. QUINN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CABRERA, NEWTON

Decedent

CABRERA, EDDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

COWAN, JOHN E

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JOHN E. COWAN

100 Pine Street Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION AND AUTHORIZATION TO ADMINISTER

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION (TRANSACTION ID # 66825633) FILED BY PETITIONER CABRERA, NEWTON AS TO DECEDENT CABRERA, EDDA HEARING SET FOR SEP-07-2021 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 204; Judge Name: JOSEPH M. QUINN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • FinancialPayment : PROBATE FIRST PETITION FOR LETTERS/TRUST/OTHER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W3621811P003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION (TRANSACTION ID # 66825633) FILED BY PETITIONER CABRERA, NEWTON AS TO DECEDENT CABRERA, EDDA HEARING SET FOR SEP-07-2021 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******4691
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF EDDA CABRERA
Court Date:SEP-07-2021 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:BRANDON SLYKHOUS
Calendar Matter:PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION
Rulings:Continued to 10/12/2021Endorsed-filed single sided courtesy copies are required for any papers filed with the court and must be received by Examiner in room 202 at the Superior Court. Examiners will not review any document until after it has been filed and a courtesy copy has been received. [LRSF 2.7, 14.7]. Courtesy copies dropped off without a hearing date or examiner name on the top cover page or on the envelope, will be processed by the clerks as time allows and may cause delays.Petitioner must submit a hard copy of the proposed order to the Examiner in room 202 at least five (5) court days in advance of the scheduled hearing date, with the scheduled hearing date noted on the face sheet. [LRSF 14.7]. Proposed orders dropped off without a hearing date or examiner name on the top cover page or on the envelope, will be processed by the clerks as time allows and may cause delays.An endorsed-filed single sided hard copy of all documents filed in response to these notes, as well as any other documents required must be received by this Examiner in room 202 no later than 4 pm on 9/27/2021 [LRSF 14.7 B.] Examiner continuances are final, not subject to contest under LRSF 14.10 B.


Case Number:*******4691
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF EDDA CABRERA
Court Date:NOV-03-2021 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:BRANDON SLYKHOUS
Calendar Matter:PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION
Rulings:Continued to 12/14/20211) There is no publication on file for the amended petition. (See CRC 7.53 and Probate Code 8121.)2) Petitioner has not filed or given notice on DE-121. (Probate Code 8100)3) Petitioner did not check required boxes on the petition page 3 #5a. (7) or (8).4) Confidential Statement of Birth Date and Driver's License Number (Judicial Council Form DE-147S) is also required, pursuant to Probate Code 8404(b). Form DE-147S must be filed separately and confidentially. Do not file form DE-147S as an attachment to the Duties and Liabilities form.[LRSF 14.18 E.]5) Examiner received unfiled courtesy copies that have been recycled. Endorsed-filed single sided courtesy copies are required for any papers filed with the court and must be received by Examiner in room 202 at the Superior Court. Examiners will not review any document until after it has been filed and a courtesy copy has been received. [LRSF 2.7, 14.7]. Courtesy copies dropped off without a hearing date or examiner name on the envelope or a cover page, will be processed by the clerks as time allows and may cause delays.6) Petitioner must submit a hard copy of the proposed order to the Examiner in room 202 at least five (5) court days in advance of the scheduled hearing date, with the scheduled hearing date noted on the face sheet. [LRSF 14.7]. Proposed orders dropped off without a hearing date or examiner name on the envelope or a cover page, will be processed by the clerks as time allows and may cause delays.An endorsed-filed single sided hard copy of all documents filed in response to these notes, as well as any other documents required must be received by this Examiner in room 202 no later than 4 pm on 11/29/2021 [LRSF 14.7 B.] Examiner continuances are final, not subject to contest under LRSF 14.10 B.


Case Number:*******4691
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF EDDA CABRERA
Court Date:JAN-24-2022 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:BRANDON SLYKHOUS
Calendar Matter:PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION
Rulings:Hearing appearance required. Remote appearance by video or telephone should be made whenever possible. Please review the 10th amended general order for more information. To appear by Zoom, go to Zoom.com and click Join Meeting, and use the ID and password below.Meeting ID: 875 8017 7925Password: 722809To appear by telephone through Zoom, call 1-669-900-6833 and follow the prompts, using the meeting ID and password above.Parties appearing should check in for the hearing using their first and last name and case number.ISSUES (may be addressed at hearing):1) Court to determine whether to take the petition off calendar for failure to respond to the Examiner notes.2) Examiner Notes:a. There is no publication on file for the amended petition. (See CRC 7.53 and Probate Code 8121.)b. Petitioner did not check a required box on the petition page 3 #5a. (7) or (8).c. Confidential Statement of Birth Date and Driver's License Number (Judicial Council Form DE-147S) is also required, pursuant to Probate Code 8404(b). Form DE-147S must be filed separately and confidentially. Do not file form DE-147S as an attachment to the Duties and Liabilities form.[LRSF 14.18 E.]d. Petitioner must submit a hard copy of the proposed order to the Examiner in room 202 at least five (5) court days in advance of the scheduled hearing date, with the scheduled hearing date noted on the face sheet. [LRSF 14.7]. Proposed orders dropped off without a hearing date or examiner name on the envelope or a cover page, will be processed by the clerks as time allows and may cause delays.


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COWAN, JOHN E.