This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 12/02/2016 at 13:45:42 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF ARLYCE CONSTANCE CONNOR

Case Summary

On 11/17/2016 THE ESTATE OF ARLYCE CONSTANCE CONNOR was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0362

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COLEMAN, STEVE

Decedent

CONNOR, ARLYCE CONSTANCE

Other

PACIFIC POSTAL CREDIT UNION

C/O Jennifer A. Smith

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LOFDAHL, NANCY E.

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

870 Market Street, Ste. 1112

San Francisco, CA 94102

 

Court Documents

CREDITORS CLAIM

CREDITOR'S CLAIM FOR $43,006.51 (TRANSACTION ID # 59893838) FILED BY CREDITOR PACIFIC POSTAL CREDIT UNION

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 59893289) FILED BY PETITIONER COLEMAN, STEVE

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE (TRANSACTION ID # 59893289) FILED BY PETITIONER COLEMAN, STEVE

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

PROOF OF PUBLICATION (SAN FRANCISCO DAILY JOURNAL) 11/22, 11/23, 11/29/16

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION FILED BY PETITIONER COLEMAN, STEVE AS TO DECEDENT CONNOR, ARLYCE CONSTANCE HEARING SET FOR DEC-12-2016 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:450.00)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CREDITOR'S CLAIM FOR $43,006.51 (TRANSACTION ID # 59893838) FILED BY CREDITOR PACIFIC POSTAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 59893289) FILED BY PETITIONER COLEMAN, STEVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE (TRANSACTION ID # 59893289) FILED BY PETITIONER COLEMAN, STEVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION (SAN FRANCISCO DAILY JOURNAL) 11/22, 11/23, 11/29/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION FILED BY PETITIONER COLEMAN, STEVE AS TO DECEDENT CONNOR, ARLYCE CONSTANCE HEARING SET FOR DEC-12-2016 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******0362
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF ARLYCE CONSTANCE CONNOR
Court Date:OCT-23-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:Petition To Dismiss Probate
Rulings:Appearance required. Issues to include:1) The absconding administrator distributed $72,408 to himself, without court order, and despite outstanding creditor's claims. 2) Administrator assigned $17,000 of his interest in this estate (as heir) in favor of Advance Inheritance LLC, which was paid off from escrow proceeds, without court order and despite there being outstanding creditors. It is unclear who authorized this payment. 3) The petition alleges that it is unknown whether all of Decedent's income taxes have been filed. Court to determine whether any additional action or notice should be required.4) Attorney for administrator assigned $6,000 of her interest in statutory fees to Advance Inheritance LLC. She alleges that she personally satisfied the assignment.


Case Number:*******0362
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF ARLYCE CONSTANCE CONNOR
Court Date:OCT-09-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:Petition To Dismiss Probate
Rulings:Administrative continuance to 10/23/19.


Case Number:*******0362
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF ARLYCE CONSTANCE CONNOR
Court Date:SEP-25-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:Petition To Dismiss Probate
Rulings:Continued to 10/9/19.


Case Number:*******0362
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF ARLYCE CONSTANCE CONNOR
Court Date:SEP-11-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:Petition To Dismiss Probate
Rulings:Continued to 9/25/19 at request of counsel.


Case Number:*******0362
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF ARLYCE CONSTANCE CONNOR
Court Date:AUG-14-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:Petition To Dismiss Probate
Rulings:Continued to 9/11/19.


Case Number:*******0362
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF ARLYCE CONSTANCE CONNOR
Court Date:JUN-19-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:Petition To Dismiss Probate
Rulings:off calendar (duplicate entry)


Case Number:*******0362
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF ARLYCE CONSTANCE CONNOR
Court Date:JUN-05-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:Petition To Dismiss Probate
Rulings:Continued to 6/19/19 for failure to address Examiner's Notes. Filed stamped copy of any pleadings needing to be reviewed should be provided in Room 202 by 6/12/19.


Case Number:*******0362
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF ARLYCE CONSTANCE CONNOR
Court Date:MAY-08-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:Petition To Dismiss Probate
Rulings:Continued to 6/5/19. Examiner's Notes emailed on 5/1/19.


Case Number:*******0362
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF ARLYCE CONSTANCE CONNOR
Court Date:APR-10-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:Petition To Dismiss Probate
Rulings:Continued to 5/8/19.


Case Number:*******0362
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF ARLYCE CONSTANCE CONNOR
Court Date:FEB-13-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:Petition To Dismiss Probate
Rulings:Continued to 4/10/19 at request of counsel.


Case Number:*******0362
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF ARLYCE CONSTANCE CONNOR
Court Date:JAN-16-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:Petition To Dismiss Probate
Rulings:Appearance required.


Case Number:*******0362
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF ARLYCE CONSTANCE CONNOR
Court Date:JAN-08-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:Petition To Dismiss Probate
Rulings:Administrative continuance to 1/16/19. Examiner unavailable to review.


Case Number:*******0362
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF ARLYCE CONSTANCE CONNOR
Court Date:DEC-11-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:Petition To Dismiss Probate
Rulings:Appearance required.


Case Number:*******0362
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF ARLYCE CONSTANCE CONNOR
Court Date:OCT-16-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Close Of Estate
Rulings:Off calendar


Case Number:*******0362
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF ARLYCE CONSTANCE CONNOR
Court Date:SEP-18-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Close Of Estate
Rulings:Appearance required


Case Number:*******0362
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF ARLYCE CONSTANCE CONNOR
Court Date:AUG-21-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Close Of Estate
Rulings:Appearance required


Case Number:*******0362
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF ARLYCE CONSTANCE CONNOR
Court Date:AUG-07-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Close Of Estate
Rulings:Continued to 8/21/18 - matter inadvertently continued to a hearing date when examiner not available for review


Case Number:*******0362
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF ARLYCE CONSTANCE CONNOR
Court Date:JUL-10-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Close Of Estate
Rulings:Appearance required


Case Number:*******0362
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF ARLYCE CONSTANCE CONNOR
Court Date:JUN-12-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Close Of Estate
Rulings:Appearance required


Case Number:*******0362
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF ARLYCE CONSTANCE CONNOR
Court Date:DEC-12-2016 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TIMOTHY KNEIS
Calendar Matter:PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION
Rulings: Grant without hearing; status on close of estate calendared for 6/12/18


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC POSTAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOFDAHL, NANCY E.