This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 01/24/2017 at 13:45:10 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF AIKO ONODERA

Case Summary

On 01/20/2017 THE ESTATE OF AIKO ONODERA was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0519

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

ONODERA, ELIZABETH H.

ONODERA, HIROKI R.

Decedent

ONODERA, AIKO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

COOPER, M ARMON

250 Montgomery St., Suite 1410

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF REAL PROPERTY

DECLARATION OF REAL PROPERTY FILED BY PETITIONER ONODERA, ELIZABETH H. ONODERA, HIROKI R.

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER ONODERA, ELIZABETH H.

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER ONODERA, HIROKI R.

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION FILED BY PETITIONER ONODERA, ELIZABETH H. ONODERA, HIROKI R. AS TO DECEDENT ONODERA, AIKO HEARING SET FOR FEB-14-2017 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:450.00)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF REAL PROPERTY FILED BY PETITIONER ONODERA, ELIZABETH H. ONODERA, HIROKI R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER ONODERA, ELIZABETH H.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER ONODERA, HIROKI R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION FILED BY PETITIONER ONODERA, ELIZABETH H. ONODERA, HIROKI R. AS TO DECEDENT ONODERA, AIKO HEARING SET FOR FEB-14-2017 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******0519
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF AIKO ONODERA
Court Date:MAY-04-2022 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:BRANDON SLYKHOUS
Calendar Matter:PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL ANNEXED, Appointment Under IAEA
Rulings: Continued to May 18, 2022 at request of counsel.


Case Number:*******0519
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF AIKO ONODERA
Court Date:APR-11-2022 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:BRANDON SLYKHOUS
Calendar Matter:PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL ANNEXED, Appointment Under IAEA
Rulings:Continued to 05/04/2022 to be heard by Judge Quinn. Examiner continuances are final, not subject to contest under LRSF 14.10 B.1) Confidential Statement of Birth Date and Driver's License Number (Judicial Council Form DE-147S) is also required, pursuant to Probate Code 8404(b). Form DE-147S must be filed separately and confidentially. Do not file form DE-147S as an attachment to the Duties and Liabilities form.[LRSF 14.18 E.]2) Petitioner needs to prove by admissible evidence that either the presumption in Probate Code 6124 doesn't apply or the presumption needs to be rebutted.3) Please give 15 days notice on the required judicial council form DE-121. Please include the required language found in the 10th amended general order of the probate and mental health division found on the court's website.An endorsed-filed single sided hard copy of all documents filed in response to these notes, as well as any other documents required must be received by this Examiner in room 202 no later than 4 pm on 4/18/2022 [LRSF 14.7 B.]


Case Number:*******0519
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF AIKO ONODERA
Court Date:MAR-29-2022 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:BRANDON SLYKHOUS
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status Of Inventory And Appraisal
Rulings:Hearing appearance required. Remote appearance by video or telephone should be made whenever possible. Please review the 10th amended general order for more information. To appear by Zoom, go to Zoom.com and click Join Meeting, and use the ID and password below.Meeting ID: 875 8017 7925Password: 722809To appear by telephone through Zoom, call 1-669-900-6833 and follow the prompts, using the meeting ID and password above.Parties appearing should check in for the hearing using their first and last name and case number.ISSUES (may be addressed at hearing):1) Court to determine how to proceed. There has been unauthorized distributions after co-administrators were suspended. There has not been compliance with the judicial officer's orders. There is a report is in the filing queue which includes an I&A which counsel was told at the 02/22/2022 hearing to file as a stand-alone document. Administrators were appointed in 2017. Counsel still has not filed a 2-year account alleging they are still missing information.


Case Number:*******0519
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF AIKO ONODERA
Court Date:FEB-22-2022 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:BRANDON SLYKHOUS
Calendar Matter:ORDER OF STATUS HEARING
Rulings:Hearing appearance required. Remote appearance by video or telephone should be made whenever possible. Please review the 10th amended general order for more information. To appear by Zoom, go to Zoom.com and click Join Meeting, and use the ID and password below.Meeting ID: 875 8017 7925Password: 722809To appear by telephone through Zoom, call 1-669-900-6833 and follow the prompts, using the meeting ID and password above.Parties appearing should check in for the hearing using their first and last name and case number.ISSUES (may be addressed at hearing):1) Court to determine how to proceed. There has been unauthorized distributions after co-administrators were suspended. Counsel has not complied with the judicial officers orders. There is a declaration is in the filing queue which includes a 9 year account which should have been filed as a 2 year account in a stand alone petition not as part of a declaration. Counsel has not filed the I&A as ordered at the prior hearings. Counsel has not filed a petition to admit the Will. Court to determine whether sanctions for the delay and failure to follow court orders is appropriate.


Case Number:*******0519
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF AIKO ONODERA
Court Date:JAN-25-2022 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:BRANDON SLYKHOUS
Calendar Matter:ORDER OF STATUS HEARING
Rulings:Continued to 02/22/20222 to be heard by Judge Quinn. Examiner continuances are final, not subject to contest under LRSF 14.10 B.ISSUES (may be addressed at hearing):1) Court to determine how to proceed. There has been unauthorized distributions after co-administrators were suspended. Counsel has not complied with the judicial officers orders. A report on status is in the filing queue which will be rejected for not being filed as a petition and counsel should not have included a hearing date. Unclear why counsel hasn't followed the court orders and filed the I&A separately or filed a 2 year-account separately.


Case Number:*******0519
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF AIKO ONODERA
Court Date:NOV-16-2021 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:BRANDON SLYKHOUS
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status Of Accounting
Rulings:Hearing appearance required. Remote appearance by video or telephone should be made whenever possible. Please review the 10th amended general order for more information. To appear by Zoom, go to Zoom.com and click Join Meeting, and use the ID and password below.Meeting ID: 875 8017 7925Password: 722809To appear by telephone through Zoom, call 1-669-900-6833 and follow the prompts, using the meeting ID and password above.Parties appearing should check in for the hearing using their first and last name and case number.ISSUES (may be addressed at hearing):1) Court to determine how to proceed. An I&A and 2 year account were ordered at the last hearing. No I&A or 2 year account have been filed.


Case Number:*******0519
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF AIKO ONODERA
Court Date:OCT-05-2021 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:BRANDON SLYKHOUS
Calendar Matter:Petition For Termination Of Further Estate Proceedings And For Discharge Of Personal Representatives
Rulings:Hearing appearance required. Remote appearance by video or telephone should be made whenever possible. Please review the 10th amended general order for more information. To appear by Zoom, go to Zoom.com and click Join Meeting, and use the ID and password below.Meeting ID: 875 8017 7925Password: 722809To appear by telephone through Zoom, call 1-669-900-6833 and follow the prompts, using the meeting ID and password above.Parties appearing should check in for the hearing using their first and last name and case number.ISSUES (may be addressed at hearing):1) Court to determine how to proceed.2) Whether to order a 2 year account under Probate Code 10950.


Case Number:*******0519
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF AIKO ONODERA
Court Date:JUL-27-2021 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:BRANDON SLYKHOUS
Calendar Matter:Petition For Termination Of Further Estate Proceedings And For Discharge Of Personal Representatives
Rulings: Continued to 9/8/2021 at request of attorney in declaration filed 6/17/2021.An endorsed-filed single sided hard copy of all documents filed in response to these notes, as well as any other documents required must be received by this Examiner in room 202 no later than 4 pm on 8/23/2021 [LRSF 14.7 B.] Examiner continuances are final, not subject to contest under LRSF 14.10 B.


Case Number:*******0519
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF AIKO ONODERA
Court Date:MAY-19-2021 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:BRANDON SLYKHOUS
Calendar Matter:Petition For Termination Of Further Estate Proceedings And For Discharge Of Personal Representatives
Rulings: Continued to 6/22/2021 to be heard after related trust matter.


Case Number:*******0519
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF AIKO ONODERA
Court Date:APR-21-2021 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:BRANDON SLYKHOUS
Calendar Matter:Petition For Termination Of Further Estate Proceedings And For Discharge Of Personal Representatives
Rulings: Continued to 5/19/2021 to be determined after related trust matter.


Case Number:*******0519
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF AIKO ONODERA
Court Date:MAR-24-2021 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:BRANDON SLYKHOUS
Calendar Matter:Petition For Termination Of Further Estate Proceedings And For Discharge Of Personal Representatives
Rulings: Continued to 4/21/2021 to be heard after related trust matter.


Case Number:*******0519
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF AIKO ONODERA
Court Date:FEB-09-2021 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:BRANDON SLYKHOUS
Calendar Matter:Petition For Termination Of Further Estate Proceedings And For Discharge Of Personal Representatives
Rulings: Continued to 3/24/2021 to be heard after related trust matter.


Case Number:*******0519
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF AIKO ONODERA
Court Date:JAN-13-2021 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:BRANDON SLYKHOUS
Calendar Matter:Petition For Termination Of Further Estate Proceedings And For Discharge Of Personal Representatives
Rulings: Continued to 02/09/2021 to be heard after the related trust #303150.


Case Number:*******0519
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF AIKO ONODERA
Court Date:DEC-16-2020 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:BRANDON SLYKHOUS
Calendar Matter:Petition For Termination Of Further Estate Proceedings And For Discharge Of Personal Representatives
Rulings: Continued to 1/13/2021 to be heard after the related trust matter.


Case Number:*******0519
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF AIKO ONODERA
Court Date:OCT-28-2020 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:BRANDON SLYKHOUS
Calendar Matter:Petition For Termination Of Further Estate Proceedings And For Discharge Of Personal Representatives
Rulings: Continued to 12/16/2020 to be heard after related trust petition.


Case Number:*******0519
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF AIKO ONODERA
Court Date:SEP-21-2020 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:BRANDON SLYKHOUS
Calendar Matter:Petition For Termination Of Further Estate Proceedings And For Discharge Of Personal Representatives
Rulings: Continued to 10/28/2020 to be heard after related trust petition.


Case Number:*******0519
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF AIKO ONODERA
Court Date:AUG-31-2020 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:BRANDON SLYKHOUS
Calendar Matter:Petition For Termination Of Further Estate Proceedings And For Discharge Of Personal Representatives
Rulings: Continued to 9/21/2020 to be heard after the related trust matter.


Case Number:*******0519
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF AIKO ONODERA
Court Date:AUG-03-2020 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:BRANDON SLYKHOUS
Calendar Matter:Petition For Termination Of Further Estate Proceedings And For Discharge Of Personal Representatives
Rulings: Continued to 08/31/2020 to be heard after trust matter.


Case Number:*******0519
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF AIKO ONODERA
Court Date:FEB-24-2020 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:BRANDON SLYKHOUS
Calendar Matter:Petition For Termination Of Further Estate Proceedings And For Discharge Of Personal Representatives
Rulings: Continued to 3/23/2020. To be heard after the related trust petition.


Case Number:*******0519
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF AIKO ONODERA
Court Date:JAN-27-2020 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:BRANDON SLYKHOUS
Calendar Matter:Petition For Termination Of Further Estate Proceedings And For Discharge Of Personal Representatives
Rulings: Continued to 02/24/20. To be heard after Trust petition.


Case Number:*******0519
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF AIKO ONODERA
Court Date:DEC-23-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:BRANDON SLYKHOUS
Calendar Matter:Petition For Termination Of Further Estate Proceedings And For Discharge Of Personal Representatives
Rulings: Continued to 01/27/20. This matter cannot be adjudicated until there has been a determination that the assets are trust property.


Case Number:*******0519
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF AIKO ONODERA
Court Date:DEC-02-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:BRANDON SLYKHOUS
Calendar Matter:Petition For Termination Of Further Estate Proceedings And For Discharge Of Personal Representatives
Rulings: Continued to 12/23/19.


Case Number:*******0519
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF AIKO ONODERA
Court Date:SEP-03-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:BRANDON SLYKHOUS
Calendar Matter:Petition For Termination Of Further Estate Proceedings And For Discharge Of Personal Representatives
Rulings: Hearing. appearance required.


Case Number:*******0519
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF AIKO ONODERA
Court Date:JUN-04-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:BRANDON SLYKHOUS
Calendar Matter:Petition For Termination Of Further Estate Proceedings And For Discharge Of Personal Representatives
Rulings: Continued to 9/3/19.


Case Number:*******0519
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF AIKO ONODERA
Court Date:APR-10-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:TRUDY J. VERZOSA
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Close Of Estate
Rulings:Off calendar


Case Number:*******0519
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF AIKO ONODERA
Court Date:MAR-13-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:PROBATE ACCOUNTING STATUS PETITION
Rulings:Appearance required.


Case Number:*******0519
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF AIKO ONODERA
Court Date:FEB-13-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:PROBATE ACCOUNTING STATUS PETITION
Rulings:Continued to 3/13/19. File stamped courtesy copy of pleadings filed on 2/7/19 and after must be provided to Room 202 by 3/1/19.


Case Number:*******0519
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF AIKO ONODERA
Court Date:JAN-02-2019 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:PROBATE ACCOUNTING STATUS PETITION
Rulings:Continued to 2/13/19. Notice of Hearing has not been given to Hiroki Onodera, who did not sign or verify the petition. Proposed order has not been submitted.


Case Number:*******0519
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF AIKO ONODERA
Court Date:DEC-19-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:PROBATE ACCOUNTING STATUS PETITION
Rulings:Continued to 1/2/19. Courtesy copy of filed documents were not received by the Examiner at least 3 court days prior to the hearing. Also, proposed order has not been submitted and Notice of Hearing has not been filed.


Case Number:*******0519
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF AIKO ONODERA
Court Date:OCT-09-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Close Of Estate
Rulings:off calendar


Case Number:*******0519
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF AIKO ONODERA
Court Date:SEP-11-2018 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:HELEN TROWBRIDGE
Calendar Matter:ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status On Close Of Estate
Rulings: Hearing. Appearance required. (No Notes sent, as Counsel was already advised that an appearance would be required, as no I&A has been filed yet.)


Case Number:*******0519
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF AIKO ONODERA
Court Date:MAR-07-2017 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION
Rulings:Grant without hearing. Status hearing on closing estate set for 9/11/18.


Case Number:*******0519
Case Title:THE ESTATE OF AIKO ONODERA
Court Date:FEB-14-2017 09:00 AM
Court/Room:204
Examiner:SEAN BANG
Calendar Matter:PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION
Rulings:Continued to 3/7/17 for filing of amended petition on current Judicial Council Form.


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COOPER, M ARMON