Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/14/2016 at 08:52:17 (UTC).

THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO/TREASURER VS. JOEL NICK MENDOZA

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO/TREASURER filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOEL NICK MENDOZA. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3071

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO/TREASURER & TAX COLLECTOR

1 Dr. Carlton B. Goodlett Pl.

San Francisco, CA 94102

Defendant

MENDOZA, JOEL NICK

San Francisco, CA 94127

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF - FEE FOR SERVICE $ 45.96 - SERVED FEB-10-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT MENDOZA, JOEL NICK

Notice of Entry of Judgment

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Small Claims - Continue Order

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF APR-11-2013 - CONTINUED PER REQUEST OF PARTIES FOR PROGRESS REPORT TO JUL-25-2013 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 506. IF NO APPEARANCE CASE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. "PLAINTIFF DOES NOT WANT A JUDGMENT ENTERED; BUT PLAINTIFF WANTS A PROGRESS REPORT IN 90 DAYS DURING WHICH DEFENDANT WILL BE PLACED ON AN INSTALLMENT PAYMENT PLAN" PER JUDGE DONALD MITCHELL.APPEARANCES BY BOTH PARTIES. PLAINTIFF WAS REPRESENTED BY JO ANNE ADAMS--SR. COLLECTIONS OFFICER.NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: M. GOODMAN. NOT REPORTED. (506) PARTIES.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF

MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $2,462.00 FILED BY THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO/TREASURER & TAX COLLECTOR AS TO DEFENDANT MENDOZA, JOEL NICK ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR APR-11-2013 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:EXEMPT)

JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM

THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO/TREASURER & TAX COLLECTOR RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT MENDOZA, JOEL NICK $2,462.00 PRINCIPAL, $45.96 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $2,507.96 STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS NO EXHIBITS FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2013
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO/TREASURER & TAX COLLECTOR AS TO DEFENDANT MENDOZA, JOEL NICK (Fee:EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO/TREASURER & TAX COLLECTOR RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT MENDOZA, JOEL NICK $2,462.00 PRINCIPAL, $45.96 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $2,507.96 STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS NO EXHIBITS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF JUL-25-2013 - JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS CALENDAR OF JUL-25-2013 - TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AS OF JUL-25-2013 BY DONALD S. MITCHELL. APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF, ONLY. PLAINTIFF WAS REPRESENTED BY JO ANNE ADAMS--SR. COLLECTIONS OFFICER. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: P. NATT. NOT REPORTED. (506)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • DECLARATION OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF CORPORATION PURSUANT TO CCP 116.540 (B)-(H) FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO/TREASURER & TAX COLLECTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF APR-11-2013 - CONTINUED PER REQUEST OF PARTIES FOR PROGRESS REPORT TO JUL-25-2013 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 506. IF NO APPEARANCE CASE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. "PLAINTIFF DOES NOT WANT A JUDGMENT ENTERED; BUT PLAINTIFF WANTS A PROGRESS REPORT IN 90 DAYS DURING WHICH DEFENDANT WILL BE PLACED ON AN INSTALLMENT PAYMENT PLAN" PER JUDGE DONALD MITCHELL.APPEARANCES BY BOTH PARTIES. PLAINTIFF WAS REPRESENTED BY JO ANNE ADAMS--SR. COLLECTIONS OFFICER.NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: M. GOODMAN. NOT REPORTED. (506) PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS CALENDAR OF APR-11-2013 - TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AS OF APR-11-2013 BY DONALD S. MITCHELL.APPEARANCES BY BOTH PARTIES. PLAINTIFF WAS REPRESENTED BY JO ANNE ADAMS. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: M. GOODMAN. NOT REPORTED. (506)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • DECLARATION OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF CORPORATION PURSUANT TO CCP 116.540 (B)-(H) FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO/TREASURER & TAX COLLECTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF - FEE FOR SERVICE $ 45.96 - SERVED FEB-10-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT MENDOZA, JOEL NICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $2,462.00 FILED BY THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO/TREASURER & TAX COLLECTOR AS TO DEFENDANT MENDOZA, JOEL NICK ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR APR-11-2013 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less