This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/07/2016 at 18:21:05 (UTC).

THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION VS. BNP PARIBAS SECURITIES CORP., ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/15/2010 THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against BNP PARIBAS SECURITIES CORP ,. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1610

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

WELLS FARGO ASSET SECURITIES CORPORATION

DEUTSCHE BANK SECURITIES, INC.

RBS SECURITIES, INC. F/K/A GREENWICH CAPITAL MARKETS, INC.

CREDIT SUISSE SECURITIES (USA) LLC

GOLDMAN, SACHS & CO.

CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS, INC.

CWALT, INC.

HSBC SECURITIES (USA) INC.

CREDIT SUISSE FIRST BOSTON MORTGAGE SECURITIES CORP.

CITIGROUP MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST, INC.

RESIDENTIAL ACCREDIT LOANS, INC.

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.

CWMBS, INC.

SEQUOIA RESIDENTIAL FUNDING, INC.

MORGAN STANLEY & CO. INC.

GS MORTGAGE SECURITIES CORP.

COUNTRY WIDE FINANCIAL CORPORATION

DOES 1-50

FIRST HORIZON ASSET SECURITIES INC.

Other

CHARLES SCHWAB INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, INC.

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

STUMPF, ROBERT JOHN

Attorney at SHEPPARD, MULLIN, RICHTER & HAMPTON LLP A LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP, INCLUDING PROFESSIONAL CORP

Four Embarcadero Center,, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-4109

CULLEN, BRENDAN P.

Attorney at SULLIVAN & CROMWELL LLP

1870 Embarcadero Road

Palo Alto, CA 94303

HIBBARD, STEPHEN D.

Attorney at SHEARMAN & STERLING LLP

Four Embarcadero Center #3800

San Francisco, CA 94111

KACPROWSKI, NICKOLAS A.

Attorney at KIRKLAND & ELLIS LLP

555 California Street, 27Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

BLANKENSTEIN, ERIC

Attorney at WILLIAMS & CONNELLY LLP

725 Twelfth Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

PATIL, CHETAN

Attorney at WILLIAMS & CONNOLLY LLP

725 Twelfth Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

CUNNINGHAM, THOMAS J

Attorney at LOCKE LORD BISSELL & LIDDELL LLP

300 South Grand Ave, Ste 2600

Los Angeles, CA 90071

SCHEINKMAN, MICHAEL

Attorney at DAVIS POLK & WARDWELL LLP

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

SCHWARTZ, DANIEL J

Attorney at DAVIS POLK & WARDELL, LLP

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Other Attorney

ELLSWORTH, KATHRYN C.

Attorney at GRAIS & ELLSWORTH LLP

1211 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Other Attorneys

TANGRI, RAGESH K

Attorney at DURIE TANGRI LLP

217 Leidesdorff St

San Francisco, CA 94111

56 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Exhibits A89 - A90 to the Declaration of Jared Gerber in Support of Mo

EXHIBITS A89 - A90 TO THE DECLARATION OF JARED GERBER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 58165263) FILED BY DEFENDANT BANC OF AMERICA SECURITIES LLC

Exhibits A76 - A88 to the Declaration of Jared Gerber in Support of Mo

EXHIBITS A76 - A88 TO THE DECLARATION OF JARED GERBER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 58165263) FILED BY DEFENDANT BANC OF AMERICA SECURITIES LLC

Exhibits E1 - E6 to the Declaration of Jared Gerber in support of Moti

EXHIBITS E1 - E6 TO THE DECLARATION OF JARED GERBER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 58165444) FILED BY DEFENDANT BANC OF AMERICA SECURITIES LLC

Exhibits A135 - A143 to the Declaration of Jared Gerber in Support of

EXHIBITS A135 - A143 TO THE DECLARATION OF JARED GERBER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 58165263) FILED BY DEFENDANT BANC OF AMERICA SECURITIES LLC

Exhibits A130 - A134 to the Declaration of Jared Gerber in Support of

EXHIBITS A130 - A134 TO THE DECLARATION OF JARED GERBER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 58165263) FILED BY DEFENDANT BANC OF AMERICA SECURITIES LLC

Exhibits A1 - A4 to the Declaration of Jared Gerber in Support of Moti

EXHIBITS A1 - A4 TO THE DECLARATION OF JARED GERBER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 58165263) FILED BY DEFENDANT BANC OF AMERICA SECURITIES LLC

Exhibits E38 - E43 to the Declaration of Jared Gerber in support of Mo

EXHIBITS E38 - E43 TO THE DECLARATION OF JARED GERBER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 58165444) FILED BY DEFENDANT BANC OF AMERICA SECURITIES LLC

Exhibits E7 - E12 to the Declaration of Jared Gerber in support of Mot

EXHIBITS E7 - E12 TO THE DECLARATION OF JARED GERBER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 58165444) FILED BY DEFENDANT BANC OF AMERICA SECURITIES LLC

Exhibits D1 - C2 to the Declaration of Jared Gerber in support of Moti

EXHIBITS D1 - C2 TO THE DECLARATION OF JARED GERBER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 58165444) FILED BY DEFENDANT BANC OF AMERICA SECURITIES LLC

COMPLAINT

SECURITIES/INVESTMENT, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT BNP PARIBAS SECURITIES CORP. CWMBS, INC. BANC OF AMERICA SECURITIES LLC BANC OF AMERICA MORTGAGE SECURITIES, INC. BANC OF AMERICA FUNDING CORPORATION CWALT, INC. COUNTRY WIDE FINANCIAL CORPORATION CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS, INC. CITIGROUP MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST, INC. RESIDENTIAL ACCREDIT LOANS, INC. FIRST HORIZON ASSET SECURITIES INC. CREDIT SUISSE SECURITIES (USA) LLC CREDIT SUISSE FIRST BOSTON MORTGAGE SECURITIES CORP. RESIDENTIAL ASSET MORTGAGE PRODUCTS, INC. DEUTSCHE BANK SECURITIES, INC. FIRST TENNESSEE BANK N.A. GOLDMAN, SACHS & CO. GS MORTGAGE SECURITIES CORP. RBS SECURITIES, INC. F/K/A GREENWICH CAPITAL MARKETS, INC. HSBC SECURITIES (USA) INC. WELLS FARGO ASSET SECURITIES CORPORATION WELLS FARGO BANK N.A. MORGAN STANLEY & CO. INC. MORGAN STANLEY CAPITAL I INC. SEQUOIA RESIDENTIAL FUNDING, INC. UBS SECURITIES, LLC MORTGAGE ASSET SECURITIZATION TRANSACTIONS INC. DOES 1-50 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-17-2010 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON SEP-13-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-02-2010 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:920.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT BNP PARIBAS SECURITIES CORP. CWMBS, INC. BANC OF AMERICA SECURITIES LLC BANC OF AMERICA MORTGAGE SECURITIES, INC. BANC OF AMERICA FUNDING CORPORATION CWALT, INC. COUNTRY WIDE FINANCIAL CORPORATION CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS, INC. CITIGROUP MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST, INC. RESIDENTIAL ACCREDIT LOANS, INC. FIRST HORIZON ASSET SECURITIES INC. CREDIT SUISSE SECURITIES (USA) LLC CREDIT SUISSE FIRST BOSTON MORTGAGE SECURITIES CORP. RESIDENTIAL ASSET MORTGAGE PRODUCTS, INC. DEUTSCHE BANK SECURITIES, INC. FIRST TENNESSEE BANK N.A. GOLDMAN, SACHS & CO. GS MORTGAGE SECURITIES CORP. RBS SECURITIES, INC. F/K/A GREENWICH CAPITAL MARKETS, INC. HSBC SECURITIES (USA) INC. WELLS FARGO ASSET SECURITIES CORPORATION WELLS FARGO BANK N.A. MORGAN STANLEY & CO. INC. MORGAN STANLEY CAPITAL I INC. SEQUOIA RESIDENTIAL FUNDING, INC. UBS SECURITIES, LLC MORTGAGE ASSET SECURITIZATION TRANSACTIONS INC. DOES 1-50

VOL 1 OF SCHEDULES OF AMENDED COMPLAINT (SCHEDULES 1-19) FILED BY

VOL 1 OF SCHEDULES OF AMENDED COMPLAINT (SCHEDULES 1-19) FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION

VOL 2 OF SCHEDULES OF AMENDED COMPLAINT (SCHEDULES 20-36) FILED BY

VOL 2 OF SCHEDULES OF AMENDED COMPLAINT (SCHEDULES 20-36) FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION SERVED AUG-09-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION SERVED AUG-09-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT RBS SECURITIES, INC. F/K/A GREENWICH CAPITAL MARKETS, INC.

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT ; PROPOSED ORDER; NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S);

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT ; PROPOSED ORDER; NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S); NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF; AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT; AMENDED GENERAL ORDER; APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF COMPLEX LIT.; ETC.;, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION SERVED AUG-12-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT CWALT, INC.

651 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES (TRANSACTION ID #58751250)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • DocketFEE PD FOR JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER SETTING PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES (TRANSACTION ID # 58740636) FILED BY DEFENDANT MORGAN STANLEY & CO. INC. (Fee:20.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY R. HACKNEY WIEGMANN TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY APR-27-2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY JONATHAN B. PITT TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY APR-27-2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY ANTONIO J PEREZ-MARQUES TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY APR-27-2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketATTORNEY JARED GERBER INACTIVATED FOR FAILURE TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketATTORNEY MEREDITH E. KOTLER INACTIVATED FOR FAILURE TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT 102 TO DECLARATION OF NATHANIEL L. GREEN IN SUPPORT OF GOLDMAN, SACHS AND CO.S MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 58633309) FILED BY DEFENDANT GOLDMAN, SACHS & CO.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF STANDING AND WAIVER OF RESCISSORY RELIEF (TRANSACTION ID # 58633334) FILED BY DEFENDANT GOLDMAN, SACHS & CO.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF STANDING AND WAIVER OF RESCISSORY RELIEF (TRANSACTION ID # 58633334) FILED BY DEFENDANT GOLDMAN, SACHS & CO.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1,080 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION SERVED AUG-09-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT RBS SECURITIES, INC. F/K/A GREENWICH CAPITAL MARKETS, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION SERVED AUG-09-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2010
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION (Fee:40.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOL 2 OF SCHEDULES OF AMENDED COMPLAINT (SCHEDULES 20-36) FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOL 1 OF SCHEDULES OF AMENDED COMPLAINT (SCHEDULES 1-19) FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT BNP PARIBAS SECURITIES CORP. CWMBS, INC. BANC OF AMERICA SECURITIES LLC BANC OF AMERICA MORTGAGE SECURITIES, INC. BANC OF AMERICA FUNDING CORPORATION CWALT, INC. COUNTRY WIDE FINANCIAL CORPORATION CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS, INC. CITIGROUP MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST, INC. RESIDENTIAL ACCREDIT LOANS, INC. FIRST HORIZON ASSET SECURITIES INC. CREDIT SUISSE SECURITIES (USA) LLC CREDIT SUISSE FIRST BOSTON MORTGAGE SECURITIES CORP. RESIDENTIAL ASSET MORTGAGE PRODUCTS, INC. DEUTSCHE BANK SECURITIES, INC. FIRST TENNESSEE BANK N.A. GOLDMAN, SACHS & CO. GS MORTGAGE SECURITIES CORP. RBS SECURITIES, INC. F/K/A GREENWICH CAPITAL MARKETS, INC. HSBC SECURITIES (USA) INC. WELLS FARGO ASSET SECURITIES CORPORATION WELLS FARGO BANK N.A. MORGAN STANLEY & CO. INC. MORGAN STANLEY CAPITAL I INC. SEQUOIA RESIDENTIAL FUNDING, INC. UBS SECURITIES, LLC MORTGAGE ASSET SECURITIZATION TRANSACTIONS INC. DOES 1-50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE: CGC-10-501151 FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSECURITIES/INVESTMENT, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT BNP PARIBAS SECURITIES CORP. CWMBS, INC. BANC OF AMERICA SECURITIES LLC BANC OF AMERICA MORTGAGE SECURITIES, INC. BANC OF AMERICA FUNDING CORPORATION CWALT, INC. COUNTRY WIDE FINANCIAL CORPORATION CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS, INC. CITIGROUP MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST, INC. RESIDENTIAL ACCREDIT LOANS, INC. FIRST HORIZON ASSET SECURITIES INC. CREDIT SUISSE SECURITIES (USA) LLC CREDIT SUISSE FIRST BOSTON MORTGAGE SECURITIES CORP. RESIDENTIAL ASSET MORTGAGE PRODUCTS, INC. DEUTSCHE BANK SECURITIES, INC. FIRST TENNESSEE BANK N.A. GOLDMAN, SACHS & CO. GS MORTGAGE SECURITIES CORP. RBS SECURITIES, INC. F/K/A GREENWICH CAPITAL MARKETS, INC. HSBC SECURITIES (USA) INC. WELLS FARGO ASSET SECURITIES CORPORATION WELLS FARGO BANK N.A. MORGAN STANLEY & CO. INC. MORGAN STANLEY CAPITAL I INC. SEQUOIA RESIDENTIAL FUNDING, INC. UBS SECURITIES, LLC MORTGAGE ASSET SECURITIZATION TRANSACTIONS INC. DOES 1-50 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-17-2010 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON SEP-13-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-02-2010 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:920.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHARLES SCHWAB INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where GS Mortgage Securities Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Asset Securities Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where CWMBS, INC. is a litigant