This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 08/08/2018 at 19:15:40 (UTC).

THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION et al VS. BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 04/29/2013 THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CYNTHIA M. LEE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1016

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

CYNTHIA M. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC.

CHARLES SCHWAB BANK, N.A.

SCHWAB ADVISOR CASH RESERVES

SCHWAB CASH RESERVES

SCHWAB INVESTOR MONEY FUND

SCHWAB MONEY MARKET FUND

SCHWAB RETIREMENT ADVANTAGE MONEY FUND

SCHWAB SHORT-TERM BOND MARKET FUND

SCHWAB TOTAL BOND MARKET FUND

SCHWAB U.S. DOLLAR LIQUID ASSETS FUND

SCHWAB VALUE ADVANTAGE MONEY FUND

SCHWAB YIELDPLUS FUND

SCHWAB YIELDPLUS FUND LIQUIDATION TRUST

THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION

Defendants

BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

BANK OF TOKYO-MITSUBISHI UFJ LTD.

BARCLAYS BANK PLC

CITIBANK, N.A.

CITIGROUP, INC.

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HEIMANN RICHARD M

HEIMANN, RICHARD MARTIN

Attorney at LIEFF, CABRASER, HEIMANN & BERNSTEIN, LLP

275 Battery Street, 30Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-3339

Defendant Attorney

ALBARRAN, TAMMY

Attorney at COVINGTON & BURLING LLP

One Front Street, 35Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

SECURITIES/INVESTMENT, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION CHARLES SCHWAB BANK, N.A. CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC. SCHWAB SHORT-TERM BOND MARKET FUND SCHWAB TOTAL BOND MARKET FUND SCHWAB U.S. DOLLAR LIQUID ASSETS FUND SCHWAB MONEY MARKET FUND SCHWAB VALUE ADVANTAGE MONEY FUND SCHWAB RETIREMENT ADVANTAGE MONEY FUND SCHWAB INVESTOR MONEY FUND SCHWAB CASH RESERVES SCHWAB ADVISOR CASH RESERVES SCHWAB YIELDPLUS FUND SCHWAB YIELDPLUS FUND LIQUIDATION TRUST AS TO DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. BANK OF TOKYO-MITSUBISHI UFJ LTD. BARCLAYS BANK PLC CITIGROUP, INC. CITIBANK, N.A. COOPERATIEVE CENTRALE RAIFFEISEN-BOERENLEENBANK B.A. CREDIT SUISSE GROUP AG DEUTSCHE BANK AG HSBC HOLDINGS PLC HSBC BANK PLC JPMORGAN CHASE & CO. JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION LLOYDS BANKING GROUP PLC HBOS PLC ROYAL BANK OF CANADA THE NORINCHUKIN BANK THE ROYAL BANK OF SCOTLAND GROUP PLC UBS AG PORTIGON AG (F/K/A WESTLB AG) WESTDEUTSCHE IMMOBILIENBANK AG SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-02-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-28-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-17-2013 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF REMOVAL

NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED BY DEFENDANT CITIGROUP, INC. CITIBANK, N.A.

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

POS OF NOTICE OF ADVERSE PARTIES OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY DEFENDANT CITIGROUP, INC. CITIBANK, N.A.

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-02-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2013
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $1000; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W1513517F007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2013
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $1000; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W1513517F006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2013
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $900; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W1513517F008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2113506M038

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2013
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $1450; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W0813429F029

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-02-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • POS OF NOTICE OF ADVERSE PARTIES OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY DEFENDANT CITIGROUP, INC. CITIBANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED BY DEFENDANT CITIGROUP, INC. CITIBANK, N.A. (Fee:$2900.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHARLES SCHWAB BANK, N.A. CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC. (Fee:$60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SECURITIES/INVESTMENT, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION CHARLES SCHWAB BANK, N.A. CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC. SCHWAB SHORT-TERM BOND MARKET FUND SCHWAB TOTAL BOND MARKET FUND SCHWAB U.S. DOLLAR LIQUID ASSETS FUND SCHWAB MONEY MARKET FUND SCHWAB VALUE ADVANTAGE MONEY FUND SCHWAB RETIREMENT ADVANTAGE MONEY FUND SCHWAB INVESTOR MONEY FUND SCHWAB CASH RESERVES SCHWAB ADVISOR CASH RESERVES SCHWAB YIELDPLUS FUND SCHWAB YIELDPLUS FUND LIQUIDATION TRUST AS TO DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. BANK OF TOKYO-MITSUBISHI UFJ LTD. BARCLAYS BANK PLC CITIGROUP, INC. CITIBANK, N.A. COOPERATIEVE CENTRALE RAIFFEISEN-BOERENLEENBANK B.A. CREDIT SUISSE GROUP AG DEUTSCHE BANK AG HSBC HOLDINGS PLC HSBC BANK PLC JPMORGAN CHASE & CO. JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION LLOYDS BANKING GROUP PLC HBOS PLC ROYAL BANK OF CANADA THE NORINCHUKIN BANK THE ROYAL BANK OF SCOTLAND GROUP PLC UBS AG PORTIGON AG (F/K/A WESTLB AG) WESTDEUTSCHE IMMOBILIENBANK AG SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-02-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-28-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-17-2013 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:$1450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where BARCLAYS BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where CHARLES SCHWAB & CO. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Citigroup Inc. is a litigant