This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/10/2016 at 04:27:05 (UTC).

THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES VS. EARL CURRY WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against EARL CURRY WILLIAMS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2767

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

NORTHERN CALIFORNIA CARPENTERS REGIONAL COUNCIL

THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES IN THEIR CAPACITIES AS TRUSTEES OF THE CARPENTERS HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND FOR CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS VACATION-HOLIDAY TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS PENSION TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS AN

Respondents

WILLIAMS, EARL CURRY INDV AND DBA LUKATE COMPANY

LUKATE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HINKLE, BARRY EDWARD

Attorney at WEINBERG, ROGER & ROSENFELD; A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

1001 Marina Village Parkway, Suite 200

Alameda, CA 94501

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF (GENERIC)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF OF PETITION FILED BY PETITIONER THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES IN THEIR CAPACITIES AS TRUSTEES OF THE CARPENTERS HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND FOR CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS VACATION-HOLIDAY TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS PENSION TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS ANNUITY TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; AND CARPENTERS TRAINING TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA SERVED FEB-13-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON RESPONDENT WILLIAMS, EARL CURRY INDIVIDUALLY

PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD FILED BY PETITIONER THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES IN THEIR CAPACITIES AS TRUSTEES OF THE CARPENTERS HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND FOR CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS VACATION-HOLIDAY TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS PENSION TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS ANNUITY TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; AND CARPENTERS TRAINING TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA AS TO RESPONDENT WILLIAMS, EARL CURRY INDIVIDUALLY JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:450.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF (GENERIC)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF OF PETITION FILED BY PETITIONER THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES IN THEIR CAPACITIES AS TRUSTEES OF THE CARPENTERS HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND FOR CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS VACATION-HOLIDAY TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS PENSION TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS ANNUITY TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; AND CARPENTERS TRAINING TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA SERVED FEB-13-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON RESPONDENT WILLIAMS, EARL CURRY INDV AND DBA LUKATE COMPANY

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PETITINERS

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS, $731.26 TOTAL COSTS, MATURE DATE APR-03-2013, FILED BY PETITIONER THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES IN THEIR CAPACITIES AS TRUSTEES OF THE CARPENTERS HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND FOR CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS VACATION-HOLIDAY TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS PENSION TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS ANNUITY TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; AND CARPENTERS TRAINING TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA

COURT JUDGMENT - GENERAL

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PETITIONER THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES IN THEIR CAPACITIES AS TRUSTEES OF THE CARPENTERS HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND FOR CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS VACATION-HOLIDAY TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS PENSION TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS ANNUITY TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; AND CARPENTERS TRAINING TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA NORTHERN CALIFORNIA CARPENTERS REGIONAL COUNCIL RECOVER FROM RESPONDENT WILLIAMS, EARL CURRY INDIVIDUALLY LUKATE COMPANY WILLIAMS, EARL CURRY INDV AND DBA LUKATE COMPANY $6,305.92 PRINCIPAL, $618.75 ATTORNEY FEES, $510.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $7,434.67, SEE SCANNED DOC

ORDER

ORDER CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD

PROOF OF SERVICE OF (GENERIC)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF OF PETITION FILED BY PETITIONER THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES IN THEIR CAPACITIES AS TRUSTEES OF THE CARPENTERS HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND FOR CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS VACATION-HOLIDAY TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS PENSION TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS ANNUITY TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; AND CARPENTERS TRAINING TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA SERVED FEB-13-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON RESPONDENT LUKATE COMPANY

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2013
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PETITIONER THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES IN THEIR CAPACITIES AS TRUSTEES OF THE CARPENTERS HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND FOR CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS VACATION-HOLIDAY TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS PENSION TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS ANNUITY TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; AND CARPENTERS TRAINING TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA NORTHERN CALIFORNIA CARPENTERS REGIONAL COUNCIL (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2013
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PETITIONER THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES IN THEIR CAPACITIES AS TRUSTEES OF THE CARPENTERS HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND FOR CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS VACATION-HOLIDAY TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS PENSION TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS ANNUITY TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; AND CARPENTERS TRAINING TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA NORTHERN CALIFORNIA CARPENTERS REGIONAL COUNCIL (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PETITINERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PETITIONER THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES IN THEIR CAPACITIES AS TRUSTEES OF THE CARPENTERS HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND FOR CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS VACATION-HOLIDAY TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS PENSION TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS ANNUITY TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; AND CARPENTERS TRAINING TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA NORTHERN CALIFORNIA CARPENTERS REGIONAL COUNCIL RECOVER FROM RESPONDENT WILLIAMS, EARL CURRY INDIVIDUALLY LUKATE COMPANY WILLIAMS, EARL CURRY INDV AND DBA LUKATE COMPANY $6,305.92 PRINCIPAL, $618.75 ATTORNEY FEES, $510.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $7,434.67, SEE SCANNED DOC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, NO APPEARANCE ON THIS MATTER. THE COURT ADOPTED ITS TENTATIVE RULING WHICH WAS NOT CONTESTED. PETITIONER THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES' PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD IS GRANTED. NO OPPOSITION FILED. THE COURT WILL SIGN THE PROPOSED ORDER SUBMITTED WITH THE MOVING PAPERS, AWARDING $618.75 IN REASONABLE ATTORNEYS FEES AND $510 COSTS IN CONNECTION WITH THIS MOTION, FOR A TOTAL OF $7434.67. THE COURT NEEDS A CLEAN COPY PAGE 1 OF THE PROPOSED ORDER, WHICH MAY BE EMAILED TO THIS DEPARTMENT AT CONTESTDEPT302TR@SFTC.ORG. JUDGE: MARLA J. MILLER; CLERK: GINA GONZALES; COURT REPORTER: ANTHONY C. VAUGHN, CSR # 6185

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • MINI MINUTES FOR MAR-20-2013 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS, $731.26 TOTAL COSTS, MATURE DATE APR-03-2013, FILED BY PETITIONER THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES IN THEIR CAPACITIES AS TRUSTEES OF THE CARPENTERS HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND FOR CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS VACATION-HOLIDAY TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS PENSION TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS ANNUITY TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; AND CARPENTERS TRAINING TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF OF PETITION FILED BY PETITIONER THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES IN THEIR CAPACITIES AS TRUSTEES OF THE CARPENTERS HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND FOR CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS VACATION-HOLIDAY TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS PENSION TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS ANNUITY TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; AND CARPENTERS TRAINING TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA SERVED FEB-13-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON RESPONDENT WILLIAMS, EARL CURRY INDV AND DBA LUKATE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF OF PETITION FILED BY PETITIONER THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES IN THEIR CAPACITIES AS TRUSTEES OF THE CARPENTERS HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND FOR CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS VACATION-HOLIDAY TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS PENSION TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS ANNUITY TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; AND CARPENTERS TRAINING TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA SERVED FEB-13-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON RESPONDENT LUKATE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF OF PETITION FILED BY PETITIONER THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES IN THEIR CAPACITIES AS TRUSTEES OF THE CARPENTERS HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND FOR CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS VACATION-HOLIDAY TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS PENSION TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS ANNUITY TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; AND CARPENTERS TRAINING TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA SERVED FEB-13-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON RESPONDENT WILLIAMS, EARL CURRY INDIVIDUALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • INDEX OF FED AUTHORITIES IN SUPP OF PETITION TO CONFIRM ARB FILED BY PETITIONER THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES IN THEIR CAPACITIES AS TRUSTEES OF THE CARPENTERS HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND FOR CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS VACATION-HOLIDAY TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS PENSION TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS ANNUITY TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; AND CARPENTERS TRAINING TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY PETITIONER THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES IN THEIR CAPACITIES AS TRUSTEES OF THE CARPENTERS HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND FOR CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS VACATION-HOLIDAY TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS PENSION TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS ANNUITY TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; AND CARPENTERS TRAINING TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PETITIONER THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES IN THEIR CAPACITIES AS TRUSTEES OF THE CARPENTERS HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND FOR CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS VACATION-HOLIDAY TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS PENSION TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS ANNUITY TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; AND CARPENTERS TRAINING TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PETITIONER THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES IN THEIR CAPACITIES AS TRUSTEES OF THE CARPENTERS HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND FOR CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS VACATION-HOLIDAY TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS PENSION TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS ANNUITY TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; AND CARPENTERS TRAINING TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD FILED BY PETITIONER THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES IN THEIR CAPACITIES AS TRUSTEES OF THE CARPENTERS HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND FOR CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS VACATION-HOLIDAY TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS PENSION TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS ANNUITY TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; AND CARPENTERS TRAINING TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA HEARING SET FOR MAR-20-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD FILED BY PETITIONER THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES IN THEIR CAPACITIES AS TRUSTEES OF THE CARPENTERS HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND FOR CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS VACATION-HOLIDAY TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS PENSION TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; CARPENTERS ANNUITY TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA; AND CARPENTERS TRAINING TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA AS TO RESPONDENT WILLIAMS, EARL CURRY INDIVIDUALLY JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less