This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 08/25/2023 at 06:17:02 (UTC).

TESSA LUU VS. CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/02/2020 TESSA LUU filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SAMUEL K. FENG and RICHARD B. ULMER. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6519

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

SAMUEL K. FENG

RICHARD B. ULMER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LUU, TESSA

MIER, RODRIGO FRIAS (CONSOL. CASE) (CONSOLIDATED CASE)

Claimants

AVRITCH, PETER

CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO (ZSFGH, SFFD) A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

Defendants and Cross Defendants

DOES 1 TO 50

PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY

CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO (CONSOL. CASE)

DOES 1 TO 50 (CONSOL. CASE)

PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY (CONSOL. CASE)

WEST VALLEY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

Cross Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Defendants

PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY

CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY (CONSOL. CASE0

ROES 1 - 50 (CONSOL. CASE)

ROES 1-50

ROES 1-50, INCLUSIVE

WEST VALLEY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

WEST VALLEY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC.

WEST VALLEY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC.(CONSOL. CASE)

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CLOYD, JEREMY

HAMILTON, ALEXANDRA

Cross Plaintiff, Cross Defendant, Defendant and Claimant Attorneys

SHEINFIELD, FREDERICK PAUL

ISOLA, PETER LINDSEY

FAMA, TIMOTHY J

LEW, DEBRA DEE

GOODMAN, JOSHUA SETH

YEH, PAIGE P.

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF HEARING: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67810067) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MIER, RODRIGO FRIAS (CONSOL. CASE) (CONSOLIDATED CASE)

RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF HEARING: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67810067) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MIER, RODRIGO FRIAS (CONSOL. CASE) (CONSOLIDATED CASE)

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY (TRANSACTION ID # 100127272)

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-07-2021 CONTINUED TO MAY-19-2021 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR CROSS COMPLAINANT(S) TO BRING CROSS COMPLAINT(S) AT ISSUE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANYS CROSS-COMPLAINT AGAINST WEST VALLEY CO

CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 200023692) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT WEST VALLEY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. ROES 1-50

Proof of Service of City and County of San Francisco

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100113594), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF LUU, TESSA SERVED OCT-01-2020, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE OCT-05-2020 AS TO DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

Notice of Time and Place of Trial AND Trial Order

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR APR-04-2022 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON MAY-19-2021 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO (TRANSACTION ID # 67271279)

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO (TRANSACTION ID # 67271279)

CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCOS CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNITY, CONTR

CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 66423625) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY WEST VALLEY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY ROES 1-50, INCLUSIVE

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY (TRANSACTION ID # 100126093)

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUL-26-2022 CONTINUED TO OCT-25-2022 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUL-26-2022 CONTINUED TO OCT-25-2022 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

DECLARATION OF JEREMY CLOYD IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID # 100169802) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LUU, TESSA

DECLARATION OF JEREMY CLOYD IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID # 100169802) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LUU, TESSA

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100158459) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LUU, TESSA

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100158459) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LUU, TESSA

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR MAR-29-2022 AT 8:30 AM WITH CONFERENCE OFFICER SANFORD KINGSLEY

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR MAR-29-2022 AT 8:30 AM WITH CONFERENCE OFFICER SANFORD KINGSLEY

NOTICE OF PENDING SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67347212) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

NOTICE OF PENDING SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67347212) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

MEDICAL REIMBURSEMENT LIEN SAN FRANCISCO HEALTH CODE SEC 124 (RODRIGO FRIAS) (TRANSACTION ID # 67342173) FILED BY CLAIMANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO (ZSFGH, SFFD) A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

MEDICAL REIMBURSEMENT LIEN SAN FRANCISCO HEALTH CODE SEC 124 (RODRIGO FRIAS) (TRANSACTION ID # 67342173) FILED BY CLAIMANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO (ZSFGH, SFFD) A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

MEDICAL REIMBURSEMENT LIEN SAN FRANCISCO HEALTH CODE SEC 124 (TESSA LUU) (TRANSACTION ID # 67342140) FILED BY CLAIMANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO (ZSFGH, SFFD) A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

MEDICAL REIMBURSEMENT LIEN SAN FRANCISCO HEALTH CODE SEC 124 (TESSA LUU) (TRANSACTION ID # 67342140) FILED BY CLAIMANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO (ZSFGH, SFFD) A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF TESSA LUU?S NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT PACIFIC BE

NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF TESSA LUU?S NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67203441) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LUU, TESSA

DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCOS NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY O

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF SHEINFIELD, FREDERICK PAUL ON DEC-16-2021 THROUGH DEC-28-2021 (TRANSACTION ID # 67158906) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar Oct-19-2022 Off Calendar; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF OCT-25-2022 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE - CONSOLIDATED CASE CGC-20-586884 (TRANSACTION ID # 68269806)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 68269806)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar Jul-20-2022 Continued To Oct-25-22 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUL-26-2022 CONTINUED TO OCT-25-2022 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF JEREMY CLOYD IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID # 100169802) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LUU, TESSA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO NOTICE OF HEARING: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67810067) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MIER, RODRIGO FRIAS (CONSOL. CASE) (CONSOLIDATED CASE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketREMOVED FROM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR MAR-29-2022 - NOT HELD AND REMOVED (0.5)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): MASTER CALENDAR JURY Off Calendar Mar-30-2022 Case Settled - Set For Crc 3.1385 Hrg On Jul-26-22 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2020
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Payment Type: EXEMPT; Receipt Number: W2220B03F026

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO'S OBJECTION TO COURT COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE AT TRIAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 3.3(A) (TRANSACTION ID # 66050666) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 66050666) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 66050666) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO; Fee: EXEMPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100113594), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF LUU, TESSA SERVED OCT-01-2020, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE OCT-05-2020 AS TO DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100112893) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LUU, TESSA SERVED SEP-30-2020, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF LUU, TESSA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $450; Payment Type: CHECK; Receipt Number: C1920914F005

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LUU, TESSA AS TO DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY DOES 1 TO 50 NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-03-2021 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-02-2020 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-11-2021; Fee: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:CGC20586519
Case Title:TESSA LUU VS. CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO ET AL
Court Date:JAN-18-2022 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT On Plaintiff Rodrigo Frias Miers Complaint
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Tuesday, January 18, 2022 Line 5, 1 - DEFENDANTS PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY, WEST VALLEY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT On Plaintiff Rodrigo Frias Miers Complaint; **Court Reporter Fees Paid**Pacific Bell Telephone Co. and West Valley Construction Co.'s unopposed summary judgment motion on plaintiff Rodrigo Frias Mier's complaint is granted.Counsel for the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order which states that the motion was not opposed and must email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing. =(302/RBU)