This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 08/11/2019 at 20:41:29 (UTC).

TENDERLOIN NEIGHBORHOOD DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION VS. JAMES E. ROBERTS-OBAYASHI CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/28/2018 TENDERLOIN NEIGHBORHOOD DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against JAMES E ROBERTS-OBAYASHI CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERI L. JACKSON and GARRETT L. WONG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2410

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

TERI L. JACKSON

GARRETT L. WONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TENDERLOIN NEIGHBORHOOD DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE

JAMES E. ROBERTS-OBAYASHI CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

JAMES E. ROBERTS-OBAYASHI CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTTINGHAUS, DANIEL LOUIS

Attorney at BERDING & WEIL LLP

2175 North California Blvd, Ste 500

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Defendant Attorney

LUCIA, CHRISTIAN P.

Attorney at SELLAR HAZARD & LUCIA A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

201 N. Civic Drive, Suite 145

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

CONSTRUCTION, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TENDERLOIN NEIGHBORHOOD DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT JAMES E. ROBERTS-OBAYASHI CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAY-29-2019 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON FEB-26-2019 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-06-2019

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Proof of Service of Summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 62963923), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF TENDERLOIN NEIGHBORHOOD DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION SERVED JAN-18-2019, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE FEB-07-2019 AS TO DEFENDANT JAMES E. ROBERTS-OBAYASHI CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

James E. Roberts-Obayashi Corporations Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63059580) FILED BY DEFENDANT JAMES E. ROBERTS-OBAYASHI CORPORATION

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100071814) FILED BY PLAINTIFF TENDERLOIN NEIGHBORHOOD DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 15.0 DAYS

Notice of Time and Place of Trial AND Trial Order

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, COURT TRIAL SET FOR DEC-02-2019 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON MAY-29-2019 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : X4319516J004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R4919313F002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1018C28F007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, COURT TRIAL SET FOR DEC-02-2019 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON MAY-29-2019 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100071814) FILED BY PLAINTIFF TENDERLOIN NEIGHBORHOOD DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 15.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • JURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 100071814) DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF TENDERLOIN NEIGHBORHOOD DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION (Fee:$150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63059580) FILED BY DEFENDANT JAMES E. ROBERTS-OBAYASHI CORPORATION (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 62963923), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF TENDERLOIN NEIGHBORHOOD DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION SERVED JAN-18-2019, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE FEB-07-2019 AS TO DEFENDANT JAMES E. ROBERTS-OBAYASHI CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CONSTRUCTION, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TENDERLOIN NEIGHBORHOOD DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT JAMES E. ROBERTS-OBAYASHI CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAY-29-2019 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON FEB-26-2019 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-06-2019 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JAMES E. ROBERTS-OBAYASHI CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where TENDERLOIN NEIGHBORHOOD DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUCIA, CHRISTIAN P.