This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/11/2016 at 20:22:57 (UTC).

TEMPOSITIONS,INC. VS. GARRETT O'DOHERTY

Case Summary

On 02/20/2009 TEMPOSITIONS,INC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against GARRETT O'DOHERTY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8510

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TEMPOSITIONS,INC.

140 Geary Street

San Francisco, CA 94108

Defendant

O'DOHERTY, GARRETT DBA SIGNATURE HOSPITALITY GROUP

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM

THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF TEMPOSITIONS,INC. IS NOT OWED ANY MONEY BY DEFENDANT O'DOHERTY, GARRETT DBA SIGNATURE HOSPITALITY GROUP PLAINTIFF ENTERED INTO A CONTRACT WITH SIGNATURE HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC, AN ACTIVE CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. PLAINTIFF'S ACTION AGAINST SIGNATURE HOSPITALITY'S CORPORATE OFFICER IN HIS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY FOR AN OBLIGATION OF THE COMPANY WAS IMPROPER. STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBITS RECEIVED

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF

MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $2,793.09 FILED BY TEMPOSITIONS,INC. AS TO DEFENDANT O'DOHERTY, GARRETT DBA SIGNATURE HOSPITALITY GROUP ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR APR-07-2009 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:50.00)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2009
  • EXHIBITS ORDERED DESTROYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF TEMPOSITIONS,INC. IS NOT OWED ANY MONEY BY DEFENDANT O'DOHERTY, GARRETT DBA SIGNATURE HOSPITALITY GROUP PLAINTIFF ENTERED INTO A CONTRACT WITH SIGNATURE HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC, AN ACTIVE CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. PLAINTIFF'S ACTION AGAINST SIGNATURE HOSPITALITY'S CORPORATE OFFICER IN HIS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY FOR AN OBLIGATION OF THE COMPANY WAS IMPROPER. STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBITS RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2009
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF APR-07-2009 - JUDGMENT. (CLERK-BETH WILBER, 506)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2009
  • DECLARATION OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF CORPORATION PURSUANT TO CCP 116.540 (B)-(H) FILED BY PLAINTIFF TEMPOSITIONS,INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2009
  • SMALL CLAIMS CALENDAR OF APR-07-2009 - TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AS OF APR-07-2009 BY JUDGE PRO TEM: BRAD KAPLAN. APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF ONLY. PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBITS RETAINED. CLERK: S. VANTREE. NOT REPORTED. (506).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF SERVED FEB-26-2009, COURT CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED SERVED ON DEFENDANT O'DOHERTY, GARRETT DBA SIGNATURE HOSPITALITY GROUP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2009
  • SERVICE OF COMPLAINT BY CERTIFIED MAIL FILED BY PLAINTIFF TEMPOSITIONS,INC. AS TO DEFENDANT O'DOHERTY, GARRETT DBA SIGNATURE HOSPITALITY GROUP (Fee:10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2009
  • COPYING FEES PAID BY PLAINTIFF TEMPOSITIONS,INC. (Fee:5.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $2,793.09 FILED BY TEMPOSITIONS,INC. AS TO DEFENDANT O'DOHERTY, GARRETT DBA SIGNATURE HOSPITALITY GROUP ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR APR-07-2009 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:50.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TEMPOSITIONS, INC. is a litigant