This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/11/2016 at 22:36:59 (UTC).

TEMPOSITIONS, INC. VS. SIGNATURE HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/29/2009 TEMPOSITIONS, INC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against SIGNATURE HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9386

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TEMPOSITIONS, INC.

140 Geary St. 4Th Fl.

San Francisco, CA 94108

Defendant

SIGNATURE HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC

Pier 9

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM

THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF TEMPOSITIONS, INC. RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT SIGNATURE HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC $2,793.09 PRINCIPAL, $65.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $2,858.09, DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT. STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS NO EXHIBITS FILED

MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $2,793.09 FILED BY

MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $2,793.09 FILED BY TEMPOSITIONS, INC. AS TO DEFENDANT SIGNATURE HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR JUN-01-2009 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:50.00)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2009
  • WRIT RETURNED WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, FULLY SATISFIED IN THE SUM OF $2,940.49 AS TO DEFENDANT SIGNATURE HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2009
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY FILED BY PLAINTIFF TEMPOSITIONS, INC. AS TO DEFENDANT SIGNATURE HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC (Fee:15.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2009
  • STIPULATION FOR HEARING BEFORE JUDGE PRO TEM DAVID HUARD FILED BY TEMPOSITIONS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF TEMPOSITIONS, INC. RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT SIGNATURE HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC $2,793.09 PRINCIPAL, $65.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $2,858.09, DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT. STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS NO EXHIBITS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2009
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF JUN-01-2009 - JUDGMENT. APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF ONLY. COURT ACCEPTS PROOF OF SERVICE. JUDGE PRO TEM: DAVID HUARD. CLERK: S.VANTREE. NOT REPORTED. (506)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2009
  • DECLARATION OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF CORPORATION PURSUANT TO CCP 116.540 (B)-(H) FILED BY PLAINTIFF TEMPOSITIONS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF SERVED MAY-04-2009, COURT CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED SERVED ON DEFENDANT SIGNATURE HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2009
  • COPYING FEES PAID BY PLAINTIFF TEMPOSITIONS, INC. (Fee:5.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2009
  • SERVICE OF COMPLAINT BY CERTIFIED MAIL FILED BY PLAINTIFF TEMPOSITIONS, INC. AS TO DEFENDANT SIGNATURE HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC (Fee:10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $2,793.09 FILED BY TEMPOSITIONS, INC. AS TO DEFENDANT SIGNATURE HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR JUN-01-2009 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:50.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TEMPOSITIONS, INC. is a litigant