Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/03/2016 at 09:28:42 (UTC).

TELE ATLAS B.V. et al VS. QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART OLIVER & HEDGES LLP et al

Case Summary

On 02/17/2009 TELE ATLAS B filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5025

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

TELE ATLAS NORTH AMERICA INC

TELE ATLAS B.V.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

EISEMAN, DAVID

Cross Defendants

ROES 1 THROUGH 50

TELE ATLAS NORTH AMERICA INC

TELE ATLAS B.V.

TOMTOM NV

TOMTOM, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

KIRBY, THOMAS W.

Attorney at WILEY REIN LLP

1776 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-2304

KING, EDWARD VINCENT

Attorney at KING & KELLEHER, LLP

Four Embarcadero Ctr., 17Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

CAROLINA, ROBERT ANTHONY

Attorney at ORIGIN LTD.TWISDEN WORKSTWISDEN ROADLONDON NW5 1DNUNITED KINGDOM

WALLACE, JR., JAMES H.

Attorney at WILEY REIN LLP

1776 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-2304

MACKERNAN, COLM P.

Attorney at ORIGIN LTD.TWISDEN WORKSTWISDEN ROADLONDON NW5 1DN,UK+44-20-7424-1950

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LAWSON, SCOTT G

WIT, TERRY L

Attorney at QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP

50 California St, 22Nd Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

BROWN, FREDERICK

Attorney at GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP

555 Mission Street,, Ste. 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105-2933

 

Court Documents

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING MOTION BY CROSS-DEFENDANTS TOMTOM N.V. AND TOMTOM, INC., FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND GRANTING MOTION BY CROSS-DEFENDANTS TELE ATLAS B.V. AND TELE ATLAS NORTH AMERICA, INC., FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT CROSS COMPLAINANT QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP TAKE NOTHING FROM CROSS DEFENDANT TOMTOM NV TOMTOM, INC. SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP

Notice of Continued Settlement Conference

SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR JUN-07-2010 CONTINUED TO JUN-07-2010 AT 2:30 PM IN 306; JUDGE: GAIL DEKREON; CLERK: M. SISON; NOT REPORTED (306)

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING QUINN EMANUEL'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS TELE ATLAS B.V. AND TELE ATLAS NORTH AMERICA, INC.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF TELE ATLAS B.V. TELE ATLAS NORTH AMERICA INC

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT TO CROSS COMPLAINANT QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED ON AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT TO CROSS COMPLAINANT QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED X-COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED X-COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP SERVED JAN-07-2010, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT ON CROSS DEFENDANT TOMTOM NV

ORDER

ORDER DENYING MOTION BY DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART OLIVER & HEDGES, LLP, FOR ORDER TO COMPEL AND FOR ORDER SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT

ORDER

ORDER - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE APRIL 29, 2010 AND APRIL 30, 2010, DISCOVERY MOTION HEARING DATES.

ANSWER

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT TOMTOM NV

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SEAL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF REPLIES FILED BY DEFENDANT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF REPLIES FILED BY DEFENDANT QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP EISEMAN, DAVID

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL

ORDER

ORDER (AMENDED) GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SEAL

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2010
  • JURY FEES OF 150.00 FOR TRANSACTION W2110527J043 FORFEITED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2010
  • JURY FEES OF 150.00 FOR TRANSACTION W2210525J028 FORFEITED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2010
  • SINGLE ASSIGNMENT TERMINATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2010
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF TELE ATLAS B.V. TELE ATLAS NORTH AMERICA INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP FILED BY QUINN EMMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN FILED ON DECEMBER 8, 2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2010
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND POS FILED BY DEFENDANT QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP EISEMAN, DAVID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2010
  • TRIAL MOTION CALENDAR ON AUG-10-2010 IN DEPT. 624, IS OFF CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2010
  • TRIAL MOTION CALENDAR ON AUG-10-2010 IN DEPT. 624, IS OFF CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2010
  • TRIAL MOTION CALENDAR ON AUG-10-2010 IN DEPT. 624, IS OFF CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
416 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF APPLICATION OF THOMAS W. KIRBY TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF TELE ATLAS B.V. TELE ATLAS NORTH AMERICA INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF APPLICATION OF JAMES H. WALLACE, JR TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF TELE ATLAS B.V. TELE ATLAS NORTH AMERICA INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2009
  • ISSUING COMMISSION TO TAKE DEPOSITION OUT OF STATE UNDER CCP 2026 FILED BY DEFENDANT QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP (Fee:20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2009
  • ISSUING COMMISSION TO TAKE DEPOSITION OUT OF STATE UNDER CCP 2026 FILED BY DEFENDANT QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP (Fee:20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2009
  • FIRST APPEARANCE FEES PAID FILED BY DEFENDANT QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP (Fee:365.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2009
  • MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE, PROOF OF SERVICE, DECLARATION OF THOMAS W. KIRBY FILED BY PLAINTIFF TELE ATLAS B.V. TELE ATLAS NORTH AMERICA INC HEARING SET FOR MAR-30-2009 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:250.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2009
  • MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE, PROOF OF SERVICE, DECLARATION OF JAMES H. WALLACE, JR. FILED BY PLAINTIFF TELE ATLAS B.V. TELE ATLAS NORTH AMERICA INC HEARING SET FOR MAR-30-2009 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:250.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF TELE ATLAS B.V. TELE ATLAS NORTH AMERICA INC SERVED FEB-19-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2009
  • BUSINESS TORT, COMPLAINT (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PLAINTIFF TELE ATLAS B.V. TELE ATLAS NORTH AMERICA INC AS TO DEFENDANT QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP DOES 1 THROUGH 50 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-17-2009 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-20-2009 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUL-02-2009 (Fee:365.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QUINN EMANUEL URGUHART & SULLIVAN LLP is a litigant