This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/26/2020 at 12:45:56 (UTC).

TAUALAI FISAGA VS. KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 TAUALAI FISAGA filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CYNTHIA M. LEE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6810

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

CYNTHIA M. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FUIMAONO, CHARLOTTE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED

KUMASI-NAKURU, FUATINO AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED

FISAGA, TAUALAI AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED

FISAGA, TONY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION)

FISAGA, ROSE

TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP, INC., A CHAPTER 7 BANKRUPTCY DEBTOR

PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

FISAGA, NAZHNIBAA

FISAGA, SHUNDIINA

TRANE U.S. INC. (FKA AMERICAN STANDARD INC.)

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

3M COMPANY

TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP, INC.

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC.

FISAGA, TAVITA

CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 800, INCLUSIVE, AS REQUIRED BY CALIFORNIA LAW ON JOINT AND SEVERAL LIABILITY PURSUANT TO CALIFONRIA CIVIL CODE 1431.2 ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE SATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRAYTON, ALAN RICHARD

Attorney at BRAYTON PURCELL LLP

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O. Box 6169

Novato, CA 94948

Defendant Attorneys

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, PLLP

2185 N. California Boulevard, Suite 575

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

BASSI, MARTE JOSEPH

Attorney at BASSI, EDLIN, HUIE, & BLUM LLP

500 Washington St., Ste. 700

San Francisco, CA 94111

BARBER, STEVEN J.

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP

633 West Fifth Street, Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

BOONE, MORDECAI D.

Attorney at DENTONS US LLP

One Market Plaza, 24Th Floor, Spear Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service for DEF HEIR SHUNDIINA FISAGA

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64784118), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF FISAGA, TAUALAI AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED KUMASI-NAKURU, FUATINO AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FUIMAONO, CHARLOTTE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FISAGA, TONY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED SERVED FEB-10-2020, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE DEC-13-2019 AS TO DEFENDANT FISAGA, SHUNDIINA

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE FOR ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 64642430) FILED BY DEFENDANT PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION

Defendant Parker-Hannifin Corporations Demand for Jury Trial

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 64642430) FILED BY DEFENDANT PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION

Defendant Parker-Hannifin Corporations Answer to Unverified Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64642430) FILED BY DEFENDANT PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION

Proof of Service for DEF HEIR ROSE FISAGA

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64631469), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF FISAGA, TAUALAI AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED KUMASI-NAKURU, FUATINO AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FUIMAONO, CHARLOTTE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FISAGA, TONY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED SERVED DEC-19-2019, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE DEC-13-2019 AS TO DEFENDANT FISAGA, ROSE

Proof of Service for TRANE U.S. INC. (FKA AMERICAN STANDARD INC.)

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64631469), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF FISAGA, TAUALAI AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED KUMASI-NAKURU, FUATINO AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FUIMAONO, CHARLOTTE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FISAGA, TONY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED SERVED DEC-17-2019, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT TRANE U.S. INC. (FKA AMERICAN STANDARD INC.)

Proof of Service for TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP, INC.

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64631469), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF FISAGA, TAUALAI AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED KUMASI-NAKURU, FUATINO AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FUIMAONO, CHARLOTTE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FISAGA, TONY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED SERVED DEC-18-2019, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE DEC-13-2019 AS TO DEFENDANT TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP, INC.

Proof of Service for 3M COMPANY

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64631469), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF FISAGA, TAUALAI AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED KUMASI-NAKURU, FUATINO AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FUIMAONO, CHARLOTTE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FISAGA, TONY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED SERVED DEC-17-2019, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT 3M COMPANY

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT 3M COMPANY TO PLAINTIFF COMPLAINT FOR SURVIVAL, WR

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64631160) FILED BY DEFENDANT 3M COMPANY

Metropolitan Life Insurance Company Demand for Jury Trial

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 64627080) FILED BY DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Metropolitan Life Insurance Company Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint for

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64627080) FILED BY DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

DEFENDANT TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP, INC., A CHAPTER 7 BANKRUPTCY DEBTORS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64625563) FILED BY DEFENDANT TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP, INC., A CHAPTER 7 BANKRUPTCY DEBTOR

Proof of Service FOR PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64577687), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF FISAGA, TAUALAI AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED KUMASI-NAKURU, FUATINO AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FUIMAONO, CHARLOTTE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FISAGA, TONY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED SERVED DEC-19-2019, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION

Proof of Service FOR METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64577687), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF FISAGA, TAUALAI AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED KUMASI-NAKURU, FUATINO AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FUIMAONO, CHARLOTTE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FISAGA, TONY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED SERVED DEC-19-2019, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Proof of Service FOR FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATIO

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64577687), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF FISAGA, TAUALAI AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED KUMASI-NAKURU, FUATINO AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FUIMAONO, CHARLOTTE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FISAGA, TONY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED SERVED DEC-17-2019, CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED MAIL - OUT OF STATE AS TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION)

Proof of Service for DEF HEIR TAVITA FISAGA

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64577687), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF FISAGA, TAUALAI AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED KUMASI-NAKURU, FUATINO AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FUIMAONO, CHARLOTTE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FISAGA, TONY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED SERVED DEC-19-2019, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE DEC-13-2019 AS TO DEFENDANT FISAGA, TAVITA

Proof of Service for CROWN CORK and SEAL COMPANY, INC.

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64577687), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF FISAGA, TAUALAI AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED KUMASI-NAKURU, FUATINO AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FUIMAONO, CHARLOTTE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FISAGA, TONY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED SERVED DEC-16-2019, CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED MAIL - OUT OF STATE AS TO DEFENDANT CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC.

DECLARATION OF TAUALAI FISAGA UNDER C.C.P. SECTION 377.32

DECLARATION OF TAUALAI FISAGA UNDER C.C.P. SECTION 377.32 (TRANSACTION ID # 64546225) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FISAGA, TAUALAI AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2020
  • HearingMatter(s): ASBESTOS CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 503; Judge Name: CYNTHIA M. LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64784118), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF FISAGA, TAUALAI AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED KUMASI-NAKURU, FUATINO AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FUIMAONO, CHARLOTTE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FISAGA, TONY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED SERVED FEB-10-2020, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE DEC-13-2019 AS TO DEFENDANT FISAGA, SHUNDIINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $1450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B4920124F020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FOR ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 64642430) FILED BY DEFENDANT PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 64642430) FILED BY DEFENDANT PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64642430) FILED BY DEFENDANT PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION (Fee:$1450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $1450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B4920117F002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64631469), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF FISAGA, TAUALAI AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED KUMASI-NAKURU, FUATINO AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FUIMAONO, CHARLOTTE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FISAGA, TONY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED SERVED DEC-19-2019, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE DEC-13-2019 AS TO DEFENDANT FISAGA, ROSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64631469), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF FISAGA, TAUALAI AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED KUMASI-NAKURU, FUATINO AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FUIMAONO, CHARLOTTE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FISAGA, TONY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED SERVED DEC-17-2019, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT TRANE U.S. INC. (FKA AMERICAN STANDARD INC.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64631469), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF FISAGA, TAUALAI AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED KUMASI-NAKURU, FUATINO AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FUIMAONO, CHARLOTTE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FISAGA, TONY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED SERVED DEC-18-2019, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE DEC-13-2019 AS TO DEFENDANT TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64577687), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF FISAGA, TAUALAI AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED KUMASI-NAKURU, FUATINO AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FUIMAONO, CHARLOTTE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FISAGA, TONY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED SERVED DEC-19-2019, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64577687), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF FISAGA, TAUALAI AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED KUMASI-NAKURU, FUATINO AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FUIMAONO, CHARLOTTE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FISAGA, TONY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED SERVED DEC-19-2019, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64577687), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF FISAGA, TAUALAI AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED KUMASI-NAKURU, FUATINO AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FUIMAONO, CHARLOTTE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FISAGA, TONY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED SERVED DEC-17-2019, CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED MAIL - OUT OF STATE AS TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64577687), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF FISAGA, TAUALAI AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED KUMASI-NAKURU, FUATINO AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FUIMAONO, CHARLOTTE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FISAGA, TONY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED SERVED DEC-19-2019, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE DEC-13-2019 AS TO DEFENDANT FISAGA, TAVITA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64577687), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF FISAGA, TAUALAI AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED KUMASI-NAKURU, FUATINO AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FUIMAONO, CHARLOTTE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FISAGA, TONY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED SERVED DEC-16-2019, CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED MAIL - OUT OF STATE AS TO DEFENDANT CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF TAUALAI FISAGA UNDER C.C.P. SECTION 377.32 (TRANSACTION ID # 64546225) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FISAGA, TAUALAI AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY FACT SHEET/ NEW FILING/ ASBESTOS LITIGATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF FISAGA, TAUALAI AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED KUMASI-NAKURU, FUATINO AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FUIMAONO, CHARLOTTE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FISAGA, TONY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $1450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W0819C04F013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FISAGA, TAUALAI AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED KUMASI-NAKURU, FUATINO AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FUIMAONO, CHARLOTTE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED FISAGA, TONY AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF TAUMAOE FISAGA, DECEASED AS TO DEFENDANT KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC. TRANE U.S. INC. (FKA AMERICAN STANDARD INC.) CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC. FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION) METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP, INC. 3M COMPANY FISAGA, ROSE FISAGA, NAZHNIBAA FISAGA, TAVITA FISAGA, SHUNDIINA DOES 1 THROUGH 800, INCLUSIVE, AS REQUIRED BY CALIFORNIA LAW ON JOINT AND SEVERAL LIABILITY PURSUANT TO CALIFONRIA CIVIL CODE 1431.2 ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE SATE OF CALIFORNIA SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-17-2020 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:$1450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******6810
Case Title:TAUALAI FISAGA VS. KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC.
Court Date:OCT-01-2020 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Plaintiff'S Notice Of Motion And Motion For Order Granting Preference In Setting Case For Trial, And Extending Discovery Cutoff (Added To Calendar For Issuance Of Tentative Ruling Only)
Rulings:(PART 2 OF 2)(Tentative ruling continued from previous entry)No later than October 15, 2020 plaintiffs must provide a statement to each defendant stating the name and contact information of each lay person with knowledge of any facts supporting any of plaintiffs' claims as to each defendant. No later than October 15, 2020 defendants must provide a statement stating the name and contact information of each lay person with knowledge of any facts supporting any of defendant's affirmative defenses. Any person not identified on the statements may be barred from testifying at trial or presenting a declaration on a summary motion absent good cause shown. A case management conference is set for December 3, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. No need for any party to file any case management conference statement. Parties may appear at the conference by telephone. If the parties agree that no case management conference is necessary, they shall notify the Court at least two day prior to take the CMC off calendar. Plaintiffs to make a settlement demand on defendants no later than December 4, 2020. Responses to the demand are due no later than December 18, 2020. The parties are ordered to provide confidential settlement demands/offers stating their best and final settlement effort. This confidential value must be separately submitted to Commissioner Pang Ly via electronic mail by January 8, 2021 at 12:00 p.m. Mandatory settlement conference is set for Thursday, January 14, 2021 at 9 a.m. in 603. Personal appearance is required by all unless a party is granted excuse based on good cause. If a hearing is requested, it will be on October 1, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. In light of the current public health situation, all attorneys may only appear telephonically. Telephone appearances must be arranged through Court Call by calling 1-888-88-COURT. No prior notice or permission is required. A court reporter will not be provided by the court. If any party wishes to have the matter reported, the parties must meet and confer to agree on only one court reporter for any reported matter in this case. There will be only one official record in a case. The designated reporter must be licensed pursuant to Bus. & Prof. Code, Sec. 8016. If the parties are unable to agree on one reporter, the court will designate a qualified court reporter that will provide the official transcript for the matter. The party or parties shall pay for the cost of reporter. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestasbestostr@sftc.org by 4:30 p.m. stating their intention to contest. If a tentative ruling is contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing. If a tentative ruling is not contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must either bring the proposed order to the hearing or submit it after the hearing in compliance with CRC 3.1312.


Case Number:*******6810
Case Title:TAUALAI FISAGA VS. KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC.
Court Date:SEP-29-2020 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR PREFERENCE / PREFERENTIAL SETTING
Rulings: On Asbestos Trial Motion Calendar for Tuesday, September 29, 2020 in Department 503, Line 1. Plaintiffs' Motion for Order Granting Preference in Setting Case for Trial, and Extending Discovery Cutoff is continued on the Court's own motion to October 1, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. in Department 503. = (503/CML)


Case Number:*******6810
Case Title:TAUALAI FISAGA VS. KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC.
Court Date:AUG-06-2020 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD
Rulings: On Asbestos Law and Motion Calendar for Thursday, August 6, 2020 in Department 503, Line 13. Douglas G. Wah and Arturo E. Sandoval on behalf of Foley & Mansfield, PLLP's motion to be relieved as counsel for defendant Triple A Machine Shop, Inc. is GRANTED. Notice of Association of Counsel adding Hawkins Parnell & Young, LLP filed on June 22, 2020. No opposition filed. If a hearing is requested, it will be on August 6, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. In light of the current public health situation, all attorneys may only appear telephonically. Telephone appearances must be arranged through Court Call by calling 1-888-88-COURT. No prior notice or permission is required. A court reporter will not be provided by the court. If any party wishes to have the matter reported, the parties must meet and confer to agree on only one court reporter for any reported matter in this case. There will be only one official record in a case. The designated reporter must be licensed pursuant to Bus. & Prof. Code, Sec. 8016. If the parties are unable to agree on one reporter, the court will designate a qualified court reporter that will provide the official transcript for the matter. The party or parties shall pay for the cost of reporter. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestasbestostr@sftc.org by 4:30 p.m. stating their intention to contest. If a tentative ruling is contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing. If a tentative ruling is not contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must either bring the proposed order to the hearing or submit it after the hearing in compliance with CRC 3.1312. = (503/CML)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TRANE US INC is a litigant

Latest cases where METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant