This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/11/2016 at 18:25:48 (UTC).

TARA GANANCE VS. CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER et al

Case Summary

On 06/06/2012 TARA GANANCE filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1398

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DAVIS, JUSTIN

GANANCE, TARA

Defendants

CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER

DOES 1 TO 10

ST LUKE'S HOSPITAL

MANSFIELD, M.D., DR. STUART H.

DOES 1-9

MANSFIELD, M.D., STUART H.

ST. LUKE'S HOSPITAL

SUTTER WEST BAY HOSPITALS DBA CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CANTOR, ANDREW

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICES OF ANDREW S. CANTOR

673 Brannan Street, #509

San Francisco, CA 94107

Defendant Attorneys

OIUM, MARK EDWARD

Attorney at OIUM, REYEN & PRYOR

220 Montgomery St., Suite 910

San Francisco, CA 94104-0000

GOODMAN, JAMES MICHAEL

Attorney at HASSARD BONNINGTON LLP

Two Embarcadero Center, Ste 1800

San Francisco, CA 94111-3993

 

Court Documents

Order Setting Mandatory Settlement Conference

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR APR-30-2014 AT 01:00 PM IN DEPT. 212 WITH CONFERENCE OFFICER ARNOLD LEVINSON.

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT SUTTER WEST BAY HOSPITALS' MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

OPPOSITION

OPPOSITION TO STUART H MANSFIELD'S MTN TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLTF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GANANCE, TARA DAVIS, JUSTIN

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING DEFT. STUART H. MANSFIELD, M.D.'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT MANSFIELD, M.D., STUART H.

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONTINUE JURY TRIAL AND/OR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY DEFENDANT MANSFIELD, M.D., STUART H.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT SUTTER WEST BAY HOSPITALS DBA CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GANANCE, TARA DAVIS, JUSTIN SERVED JUN-12-2012, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT ST. LUKE'S HOSPITAL

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONTINUE JURY TRIAL AND/OR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY DEFENDANT MANSFIELD, M.D., STUART H.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GANANCE, TARA DAVIS, JUSTIN SERVED JUN-12-2012, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF AUG-19-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT SUTTER WEST BAY HOSPITALS DBA CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUL-01-2014 CONTINUED TO AUG-19-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR JUL-01-2014 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT MANSFIELD, M.D., STUART H.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT MANSFIELD, M.D., STUART H.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING THE EX PARTE APPLICATION REGARDING DEFENDANT STUART H. MANSFIELD, M.D.'S MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR MAY-05-2014 - CASE SETTLED PURSUANT TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL'S FAXED LETTER DATED 5/2/14. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON JUL-01-2014 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT, DECLARATION FILED BY DEFENDANT MANSFIELD, M.D., STUART H. (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
100 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY DEFENDANT SUTTER WEST BAY HOSPITALS DBA CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY DEFENDANT SUTTER WEST BAY HOSPITALS DBA CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SUTTER WEST BAY HOSPITALS DBA CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER HEARING SET FOR AUG-09-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:NO FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT SUTTER WEST BAY HOSPITALS DBA CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT SUTTER WEST BAY HOSPITALS DBA CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SUTTER WEST BAY HOSPITALS DBA CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER HEARING SET FOR AUG-09-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GANANCE, TARA DAVIS, JUSTIN SERVED JUN-12-2012, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT ST. LUKE'S HOSPITAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GANANCE, TARA DAVIS, JUSTIN SERVED JUN-12-2012, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMALPRACTICE - MEDICAL/DENTAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GANANCE, TARA DAVIS, JUSTIN AS TO DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER ST. LUKE'S HOSPITAL DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR NOV-07-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-06-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON OCT-23-2012 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

TVNI9IY0 —-—

NI\)I\)!\)MI\)I\)[\)[\)_A_\_;AA_\_\_A_\_\

CD\IO')U‘IAOON—\O(OCX)'\ICDCTI#OJN—\O HASSARD BONNINGTON LLP

JAMES M. GOODMAN, ESQ., State Bar No. 6584¢

J. JULIA HANSEN, ESQ., State Bar No. 225697 \ i Two Embarcadero Center, Suite 1800 San Francisco County. Suparior.Gourt San Francisco, California 94111-3941 - | Telephone: (415) 288-9800 JAN 097014 Fax: (415) 288-9801 | o

CLERK QEJHE SOURT

Attorneys for Defendant ay:

SUTTER WEST BAY HOSPITALS ‘

dba CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL

CENTER (erroneously sued herein as CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL and

ST. LUKE’S HOSPITAL)

IN THE SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA IN AND FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO UNLIMITED JURISDICTION

TARA GANANCE and JUSTIN DAVIS, No. CGC-12-521398 Plaintiffs, DEFENDANT SUTTER WEST BAY

HOSPITALS’ ANSWER TO

VS. PLAINTIFFS’ AMENDED

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL [As limited by Court Orders of May 1, CENTER and ST. LUKE'S HOSPITAL, 2013]

and DOES 1-10,

Defendants. Complaint Filed: June 6, 2012 Trial Date: May 5, 2014

Defendant SUTTER WEST BAY HOSPITALS dba CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER (erroneously sued herein as CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER and ST. LUKE’S HOSPITAL), in answer to plaintiffs' Amended Complaint on file herein, and as limited by and subject to this Court’s Orders of May 1, 2013 (granting defendant’'s Motion to Strike as to plaintiffs’ first cause of action for general negligence and prayers for punitive damages, general damages, lost earnings, and attorney fees), and each and every cause of action allegedly set forth therein, admits, denies and alleges as follows:

Defendant SUTTER WEST BAY HOSPITALS dba CALIFORNIA

PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER admits that it is, and at all times mentioned in said

PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER admits that it is, and at all times mentioned in said O 0O ~N O o0 A WD -

O 0O ~N O o0 A WD -

@ @Q @@~N00O N O 0 PbShA W DDy - O

Complaint was, a corporation organized in accordance with the laws of the State of

California. Except as so admitted, this defendant denies each and every, all and

singular, generally and specifically, the allegations in said Complaint.

Further, in answering said complaint, and each and every cause of action allegedly set forth therein, this defendant denies that it was negligent and/or careless in any respect whatsoever, as alleged therein, or at all, and denies that by reason of these allegations, or otherwise, plaintiffs have been damaged in any sum or sums whatsoever, or at all.

AS AND FOR A FIRST, SEPARATE AND DISTINCT AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE to said complaint, and each and every cause of action allegedly set forth therein, this Defendant is entitled to the full benefits and protections provided under Section 1431.1, et seq., of the Civil Code, otherwise entitled The Fair Responsibility Act of 1986.

AS AND FOR A SECOND, SEPARATE AND DISTINCT AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE to said complaint, and each and every cause of action allegedly set forth therein, this defendant alleges that plaintiff was negligent in and about the facts and things set forth in said complaint and that said carelessness and negligence caused or contributed to the injuries, if any, of which plaintiff complains.

AS AND FOR A THIRD, SEPARATE AND DISTINCT AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE to said complaint, and each and every cause of action allegedly set forth therein, this defendant alleges that the allegations set forth therein do not state facts sufficient to constitute a cause of action against this defendant.

AS AND FOR A FOURTH, SEPARATE AND DISTINCT AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE to said complaint and each and every cause of action allegedly set forth therein, this defendant alleges that the allegations set forth therein are barred by the provisions of the applicable statutes of limitation, including but not limited to the provisions of Sections 335.1, 340(a)-(e), 340.5, 364(a)-(f) and 474, including all

subdivisions, of the Code of Civil Procedure.

subdivisions, of the Code of Civil Procedure. O ©W-

O ©W-

@ aQ Qa2 Q@ - - 0O ~N©O©W=

AS AND FOR A FIFTH, SEPARATE AND DISTINCT AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE to said complaint, and each and every cause of action allegedly set forth therein, this defendant alleges that the injuries and damages complained of by plaintiff, if any there were, were wholly or in part directly caused by the negligence and/or willful and intentional acts of persons or entities other than this defendant, and said negligence is either imputed to plaintiff by reason of the relationship between plaintiff and said person or entities, and/or comparatively reduces the proportion of alleged negligence and corresponding alleged liability of this defendant.

AS AND FOR A SIXTH, SEPARATE AND DISTINCT AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE to said complaint, and each and every cause of action allegedly set forth therein, this defendant states that in the event it is found to be negligent (which supposition is denied and merely stated for the purpose of this affirmative defense), this defendant may elect to introduce evidence of any amount paid or payable, if any, as a benefit to plaintiff pursuant to Civil Code §3333.1.

AS AND FOR A SEVENTH, SEPARATE AND DISTINCT AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE to said complaint, and each and every cause of action allegedly set forth therein, this defendant states that in the event it is found to be negligent (which supposition is denied and merely stated for the purpose of this affirmative defense), the damages for non-economic losses, if any, shall not exceed the amount specified in Civil Code §3333.2.

AS AND FOR A EIGHTH, SEPARATE AND DISTINCT AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE to said complaint, and each and every cause of action allegedly set forth therein, this defendant states that in the event it is found to be negligent (which supposition is denied and merely stated for the purpose of this affirmative defense), this defendant may elect to have future damages, if any, in excess of the amount specified in Code of Civil Procedure §667.7, paid in whole or in part, as specified in Code of Civil Procedure §667.7.

AS AND FOR A EIGHTH, SEPARATE AND DISTINCT AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE to said complaint, and each and every cause of action allegedly set forth therein, this defendant states that in the event it is found to be negligent (which supposition is denied and merely stated for the purpose of this affirmative defense), this defendant may elect to have future damages, if any, in excess of the amount specified in Code of Civil Procedure §667.7, paid in whole or in part, as specified in Code of Civil Procedure §667.7. AS AND FOR A NINTH, SEPARATE AND DISTINCT AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE to said complaint, and each and every cause of action allegedly set forth therein, this defendant alleges that it is entitled to the benefits, defenses, rights, immunities and provisions set forth and contained in Business & Professions Code §6146 and Code of Civil Procedure §§364 and 365.

AS AND FOR A NINTH, SEPARATE AND DISTINCT AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE to said complaint, and each and every cause of action allegedly set forth therein, this defendant alleges that it is entitled to the benefits, defenses, rights, immunities and provisions set forth and contained in Business & Professions Code §6146 and Code of Civil Procedure §§364 and 365.

AS AND FOR A TENTH, SEPARATE AND DISTINCT AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE to said complaint, and each and every cause of action allegedly set forth therein, this defendant alleges that it, acting in good faith at the times mentioned in said complaint, rendered emergency care to the plaintiff, at the scene of the emergency within the meaning of Business & Professions Code §2395.

AS AND FOR A ELEVENTH, SEPARATE AND DISTINCT AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE to said complaint, and each and every cause of action allegedly set forth therein, this defendant alleges that plaintiff's injuries were the result of plaintiff's employer and that said negligencerecovery by plaintiff's employer of any of the sums which it has been obligated to pay or will be obligated to pay in workmen's compensation benefits, maintenance, cure, or similar benefits to plaintiff and that defendants are entitled to a credit against any judgment that may be rendered against him in favor of the plaintiff in said amount.

AS AND FOR A TWELFTH, SEPARATE AND DISTINCT AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE to said complaint, and each and every cause of action allegedly set forth therein, this defendant alleges that plaintiff was informed and otherwise had reason to know of the risks and hazards in connection with the matters referred to in the complaint and that plaintiff assumed the risk of said risks and hazards at the time and place referred to therein.

AS AND FOR A THIRTEENTH, SEPARATE AND DISTINCT AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE to said complaint, and each and every cause of action allegedly set forth therein, this defendant alleges that upon information and belief it is

of the opinion that a certain sum has been or will be paid to plaintiff as compensation

of the opinion that a certain sum has been or will be paid to plaintiff as compensation for the same damages for which he seeks against this defendant and, therefore, said defendant is entitled to a set-off in said amount against any judgment or recovery plaintiff may recover against defendants.

for the same damages for which he seeks against this defendant and, therefore, said defendant is entitled to a set-off in said amount against any judgment or recovery plaintiff may recover against defendants.

AS AND FOR A FOURTEENTH, SEPARATE AND DISTINCT AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE to said complaint, and each and every cause of action allegedly set forth therein, this defendant alleges on information and belief that plaintiff has failed to minimize or mitigate damages, if any.

AS AND FOR A FIFTEENTH, SEPARATE AND DISTINCT AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE to said complaint, and each and every cause of action allegedly set forth therein, this defendant alleges that plaintiff has not complied with the joinder of parties requirements of Code of Civil Procedure §§377.60, 378 and 389.

AS AND FOR A SIXTEENTH, SEPARATE, DISTINCT AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE, defendant alleges that the injuries complained of herein were caused by the natural course of plaintiff's disease or condition, or were the natural or expected results of reasonable treatment rendered for this disease or condition, and plaintiff's claim herein is barred by California Civil Code §1714.8.

AS AND FOR A SEVENTEENTH SEPARATE AND DISTINCT

AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE to said complaint and each and every cause of action allegedly set forth therein, this defendant alleges that the allegations set forth therein are barred by the provisions of the applicable statutes, including but not limited to, the provisions of Section 1317 of the Health and Safety Code.

N =~ O

WHEREFORE, this answering defendant prays that plaintiffs take nothing by reason of the complaint on file herein, that this defendant be hence dismissed and have judgment for costs of suit incurred herein; and for such other and further relief as to the Court seems just and proper.

Dated: January ?L 2014

SUTTER WEST BAY

HOSPITALS dba CALIFORNIA

PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******1398
Case Title:TARA GANANCE VS. CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER et al
Court Date:APR-01-2014 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Rulings:Set for hearing on Tuesday, April 1, 2014, line 6. DEFENDANT STUART MANSFIELD, M.D.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. The motion for summary judgment is denied. Defendant maintained its initial burden of production by demonstrating that defendant did not breach the standard of case. (Declaration of Dr. Roy Filly). In opposition, the declaration of Dr. Susan Gootnick creates a triable issue of material fact regarding whether defendant breached the appropriate standard of care. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order with the name and address of the prevailing party's counsel or the prevailing party if pro per in the top left of the first page of proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and in compliance with Code of Civil Procedure 437c(g) and must bring the proposed order to the hearing or email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/EHG)


Case Number:*******1398
Case Title:TARA GANANCE VS. CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER et al
Court Date:SEP-12-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion For Leave To File Second Amended Complaint For Damages For Professional Negligence & Medical Malpractice
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Thursday, September 12, 2013, Line 12, PLAINTIFFs TARA GANANCE and JUSTIN DAVIS' Motion For Leave To File Second Amended Complaint For Damages For Professional Negligence & Medical Malpractice.Hearing required. =(302/MJM)


Case Number:*******1398
Case Title:TARA GANANCE VS. CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER et al
Court Date:AUG-12-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion For Leave To File Second Amended Complaint For Damages For Professional Negligence & Medical Malpractice
Rulings:Matter on Calendar for Monday, August 12, 2013, Line 8, PLAINTIFF TARA GANANCE, JUSTIN DAVIS Notice Of Motion For Leave To File Second Amended Complaint For Damages For Professional Negligence & Medical MalpracticeThe motion is continued to September 12, 2013, on the court's motion. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests.


Case Number:*******1398
Case Title:TARA GANANCE VS. CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER et al
Court Date:MAY-01-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION TO STRIKE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Rulings:Set for hearing on Wednesday, May 1, 2013, Line 17, DEFENDANT STUART MANSFIELD, M.D.'s MOTION TO STRIKE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT.The motion to strike is granted without leave to amend in its entirety. Plaintiffs cannot recover general damages or loss of earnings damages. Turpin v. Sortini (1982) 31 Cal.3d 220, 237; Andalon v. Sup. Crt. (1984) 162 Cal.App.3d 600, 614. Plaintiff fails to highlight a basis for attorney's fees. The prayer for attorney's fees is improper because plaintiff failed to comply with CCP 425.13. The Court read and considered Plaintiff's Opposition to this motion, which was filed on April 22, 2013. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order with the name and address of the prevailing party's counsel or the prevailing party if pro per in the top left of the first page of proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing or email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/MJM)


Case Number:*******1398
Case Title:TARA GANANCE VS. CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER et al
Court Date:AUG-09-2012 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Thursday, August 9, 2012, Line 20, DEFENDANT SUTTER WEST BAY HOSPITALs' DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT.The demurrer is sustained with leave to amend. The first cause of action for general negligence cannot stand on these facts and should be subsumed within the second cause of action for medical malpractice. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested.=(302/EHG)



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ST.LUKE'S HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where SUTTER BAY HOSPITALS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OIUM, MARK EDWARD

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOODMAN, JAMES M