This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 07/29/2021 at 01:19:48 (UTC).

TAELOR BOURGEOIS VS. LIZA NAVARRO ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/26/2017 TAELOR BOURGEOIS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LIZA NAVARRO. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SAMUEL K. FENG, GARRETT L. WONG, ETHAN P. SCHULMAN and TERI L. JACKSON. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9206

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

SAMUEL K. FENG

GARRETT L. WONG

ETHAN P. SCHULMAN

TERI L. JACKSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOURGEOIS, TAELOR

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE

NAVARRO, LIZA

WAG LABS, INC. DBA WAG!

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WOOD, CHRISTOPHER W

Attorney at DREYER, BABICH, BUCCOLA & CALLAHAM, LLP

20 Bicentenial Circle

Sacramento, CA 95826

Defendant Attorneys

RENN, KERRY A

One Embarcadero Center, Suite 500

San Francisco, CA 94111

PICKER, ESQ., JAMES R.

Attorney at PHILIP M. ANDERSEN & ASSOCIATES

6210 Stoneridge Mall Rd # 550

Pleasanton, CA 94588

JONES, NICOLE L.

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

333 Bush Street, Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 941042872

MELTON, DAVID A

Porter Scott, A Professional Corportaion

Sacramento, CA 95825

KLOBITZ, LAUREN J.

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

333 Bush St., Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 941042827

TRIMBLE, TRACY A

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

333 Bush Street, Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOURGEOIS, TAELOR AS TO DEFENDANT NAVARRO, LIZA WAG LABS, INC. DBA WAG! DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-25-2017 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-25-2017 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON OCT-02-2017

DOCUMENTARY EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DOCUMENTARY EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 63626671)

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS AND EVIDENCE IN SUPPOR

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 63626671) FILED BY DEFENDANT NAVARRO, LIZA

DECLARATION OF JAMES PICKER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMAR

DECLARATION OF JAMES PICKER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 63626671) FILED BY DEFENDANT NAVARRO, LIZA

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 63626671) FILED BY DEFENDANT NAVARRO, LIZA

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 63626671) FILED BY DEFENDANT NAVARRO, LIZA HEARING SET FOR OCT-10-2019 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 61182733) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOURGEOIS, TAELOR JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

Defendant Liza Navarros Answer to Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100019557) FILED BY DEFENDANT NAVARRO, LIZA

Answer to Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100021056) FILED BY DEFENDANT WAG LABS, INC. DBA WAG!

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 65860112)

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 65860112)

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100109184) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOURGEOIS, TAELOR

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100109184) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOURGEOIS, TAELOR

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 65616082) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOURGEOIS, TAELOR

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 65616082) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOURGEOIS, TAELOR

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR STIPULATED TRIAL CONTINUANCE

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR STIPULATED TRIAL CONTINUANCE

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100100680) AS TO DEFENDANT WAG LABS, INC. DBA WAG!

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100100680) AS TO DEFENDANT WAG LABS, INC. DBA WAG!

DECLARATION OF LARRY Q. PHAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR STIPULATED TRIAL CONTINUANCE (TRANSACTION ID # 65542638) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOURGEOIS, TAELOR

DECLARATION OF LARRY Q. PHAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR STIPULATED TRIAL CONTINUANCE (TRANSACTION ID # 65542638) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOURGEOIS, TAELOR

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR STIPULATED TRIAL CONTINUANCE (TRANSACTION ID # 65542638) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOURGEOIS, TAELOR

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR STIPULATED TRIAL CONTINUANCE (TRANSACTION ID # 65542638) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOURGEOIS, TAELOR

MOTION TO CONTINUE COURT TRIAL, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 65542638) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOURGEOIS, TAELOR HEARING SET FOR APR-21-2020 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 206

MOTION TO CONTINUE COURT TRIAL, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 65542638) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOURGEOIS, TAELOR HEARING SET FOR APR-21-2020 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 206

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT ON BEHALF OF WAG LABS, INC. DBA WAG! (TRANSACTION ID # 200008514) FILED BY DEFENDANT WAG LABS, INC. DBA WAG!

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT ON BEHALF OF WAG LABS, INC. DBA WAG! (TRANSACTION ID # 200008514) FILED BY DEFENDANT WAG LABS, INC. DBA WAG!

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): MASTER CALENDAR JURY Off Calendar Feb-10-2021 Vacated; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketMASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR MAR-01-2021 VACATED. DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED ON 8/19/20. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 65860112)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100109184) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOURGEOIS, TAELOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • HearingMatter(s): MASTER CALENDAR JURY Off Calendar Apr-21-2020 Continued To Mar-01-21 At 09:30 A.M. In Dept 206; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: GARRETT L. WONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 65616082) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOURGEOIS, TAELOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR STIPULATED TRIAL CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketMASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR MAY-26-2020 CONTINUED TO MASTER CALENDAR JURY ON MAR-01-2021 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketMASTER MOTION CALENDAR ON APR-21-2020 IN 206, PLAINIFF'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL IS GRANTED PER STIPULATION. THE CURRENT TRIAL DATE IS CONTINUED TO 3/1/2021 AT 9:30AM IN DEPT. 206. ALL PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES ARE ACCORDING TO THE NEW TRIAL DATE. ANY FURTHER CONTINUANCE OF THE TRIAL DATE WILL BE BY A REGULARLY NOTICED MOTION. ORDER SIGNED IN OPEN COURT. JUDGE: GARRETT L. WONG; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • HearingMatter(s): MOTION TO CONTINUE COURT TRIAL Off Calendar Apr-21-2020 Text Ruling; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: GARRETT L. WONG

    Read MoreRead Less
83 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 61182733) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOURGEOIS, TAELOR JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R1117818F007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100021056) FILED BY DEFENDANT WAG LABS, INC. DBA WAG! (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B1417725F007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100019557) FILED BY DEFENDANT NAVARRO, LIZA (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 60808602), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOURGEOIS, TAELOR SERVED JUN-23-2017, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE JUN-23-2017 AS TO DEFENDANT WAG LABS, INC. DBA WAG!

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 60808602), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOURGEOIS, TAELOR SERVED JUN-25-2017, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT NAVARRO, LIZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W0817526F009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOURGEOIS, TAELOR AS TO DEFENDANT NAVARRO, LIZA WAG LABS, INC. DBA WAG! DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-25-2017 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-25-2017 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON OCT-02-2017 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******9206
Case Title:TAELOR BOURGEOIS VS. LIZA NAVARRO ET AL
Court Date:OCT-10-2019 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Judgment
Rulings:Set for hearing on Thursday, October 10, 2019, Line 3,DEFENDANT LIZA NAVARRO's MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.Defendant Navarro's motion for summary judgment is denied. There is a triable issue of material fact regarding whether defendant knew or had reason to know of Mowgli's vicious propensities. (See Priebe v. Nelson (2006) 39 Cal.4th 1112, 1115-1116 ["If [defendant] knew or should have known of his dog's vicious propensities and failed to inform [plaintiff] of such facts, he could be found to have exposed [plaintiff kennel worker] to an unknown risk and thereby be held strictly liable at common law for her injuries. [Citations.] Under such circumstances, the defense of primary assumption of risk would not bar [plaintiff's] claim since she could not be found to have assumed a risk of which she was unaware."]; Plaintiff's Ex. 5 (Bhakri Depo., 20:8-24; 21:23-22:15; 24:10-12); Plaintiff's Ex. 7 (Grewal Depo., 18:8-19; 20:1-10); Wine Dec., 1-9.) Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. Counsel for plaintiffs is required to prepare a proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring it to the hearing or email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/EPS)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WAG LABS INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Trimble, Tracy A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David A. Melton

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RENN, KERRY A