This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/03/2016 at 05:33:58 (UTC).

SUNSET SCAVENGER COMPANY et al VS. AROLDO PEREZ et al

Case Summary

On 01/15/2009 SUNSET SCAVENGER COMPANY filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against AROLDO PEREZ. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4108

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING COMPANY

SUNSET SCAVENGER COMPANY

Defendants

HERNANDEZ, VALERIO

PEREZ, AROLDO (AKA AROLDO MEJIA)

LOPEZ, NOE EBER MEJIA

MEJIA, CATALINO BAMACA

CORONADO, ANGEL

GONZALEZ, PABLO MEJIA (AKA PABLO TIMOTEO MEJIA)

GOMEZ, ROLANDO

BAMACA, HENRY SAUL YOC (AKA HENRY SAUL YOC)

DOES 1-100

PEREZ, PABLO MEJIA (AKA PABLO MEJIA AND PABLO PEREZ)

LOPEZ, CARLOS

GONZALEZ, JOEL

Other

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BAKER, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

Three Embarcadero Center, 7Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-4024

GOODMAN, WILLIAM MARK

Attorney at KASOWITZ, BENSON, TORRES & FRIEDMAN, LLP

101 California Street, Suite 2050

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JAN-22-2010 IS OFF CALENDAR JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

COURT JUDGMENT - GENERAL

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF SUNSET SCAVENGER COMPANY GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING COMPANY RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT PEREZ, AROLDO (AKA AROLDO MEJIA) PEREZ, PABLO MEJIA (AKA PABLO MEJIA AND PABLO PEREZ) GONZALEZ, PABLO MEJIA (AKA PABLO TIMOTEO MEJIA) LOPEZ, NOE EBER MEJIA GOMEZ, ROLANDO LOPEZ, CARLOS GONZALEZ, JOEL MEJIA, CATALINO BAMACA HERNANDEZ, VALERIO CORONADO, ANGEL BAMACA, HENRY SAUL YOC (AKA HENRY SAUL YOC) SEE SCANNED DOC

ORDER

ORDER WAIVING APPEARANCE OF WITNESS FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT PROVE-UP HEARING.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-21-2009 CONTINUED TO OCT-23-2009 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212, FOR PLAINTIFF TO OBTAIN DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

COMPLAINT

BUSINESS TORT, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUNSET SCAVENGER COMPANY GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT PEREZ, AROLDO (AKA AROLDO MEJIA) PEREZ, PABLO MEJIA (AKA PABLO MEJIA AND PABLO PEREZ) GONZALEZ, PABLO MEJIA (AKA PABLO TIMOTEO MEJIA) LOPEZ, NOE EBER MEJIA GOMEZ, ROLANDO LOPEZ, CARLOS GONZALEZ, JOEL MEJIA, CATALINO BAMACA HERNANDEZ, VALERIO CORONADO, ANGEL BAMACA, HENRY SAUL YOC (AKA HENRY SAUL YOC) DOES 1-100 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-19-2009 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-16-2009 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-04-2009 (Fee:365.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

ORDER

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUNSET SCAVENGER COMPANY GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING COMPANY SERVED JAN-20-2009, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT CORONADO, ANGEL

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUNSET SCAVENGER COMPANY GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING COMPANY SERVED JAN-20-2009, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT LOPEZ, CARLOS

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUNSET SCAVENGER COMPANY GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING COMPANY SERVED JAN-20-2009, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT MEJIA, CATALINO BAMACA

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUNSET SCAVENGER COMPANY GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING COMPANY SERVED JAN-20-2009, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT GOMEZ, ROLANDO

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUNSET SCAVENGER COMPANY GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING COMPANY SERVED JAN-20-2009, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT LOPEZ, NOE EBER MEJIA

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUNSET SCAVENGER COMPANY GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING COMPANY SERVED JAN-20-2009, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT PEREZ, AROLDO (AKA AROLDO MEJIA)

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUNSET SCAVENGER COMPANY GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING COMPANY SERVED JAN-20-2009, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT BAMACA, HENRY SAUL YOC (AKA HENRY SAUL YOC)

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUNSET SCAVENGER COMPANY GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING COMPANY SERVED JAN-20-2009, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT GONZALEZ, JOEL

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUNSET SCAVENGER COMPANY GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING COMPANY SERVED JAN-15-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT HERNANDEZ, VALERIO

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUNSET SCAVENGER COMPANY GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING COMPANY SERVED JAN-15-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT GONZALEZ, PABLO MEJIA (AKA PABLO TIMOTEO MEJIA)

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUNSET SCAVENGER COMPANY GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING COMPANY SERVED JAN-15-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT PEREZ, PABLO MEJIA (AKA PABLO MEJIA AND PABLO PEREZ)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (DEFAULT) FILED BY PLAINTIFF'S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JAN-22-2010 IS OFF CALENDAR JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2009
  • DocketMINI-MINUTES FOR DEC-10-2009 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 218

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2009
  • DocketUNCONTESTED CALENDAR OF DEC-10-2009, DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING. GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER. PROCEEDINGS REPORTED BY CARL SALCEIDO, CSR #2031.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF SUNSET SCAVENGER COMPANY GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING COMPANY RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT PEREZ, AROLDO (AKA AROLDO MEJIA) PEREZ, PABLO MEJIA (AKA PABLO MEJIA AND PABLO PEREZ) GONZALEZ, PABLO MEJIA (AKA PABLO TIMOTEO MEJIA) LOPEZ, NOE EBER MEJIA GOMEZ, ROLANDO LOPEZ, CARLOS GONZALEZ, JOEL MEJIA, CATALINO BAMACA HERNANDEZ, VALERIO CORONADO, ANGEL BAMACA, HENRY SAUL YOC (AKA HENRY SAUL YOC) SEE SCANNED DOC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2009
  • DocketPOS RE: ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUNSET SCAVENGER COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER WAIVING APPEARANCE OF WITNESS FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT PROVE-UP HEARING.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2009
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER WAITING FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUNSET SCAVENGER COMPANY GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-23-2009 CONTINUED TO JAN-22-2010 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2009
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUNSET SCAVENGER COMPANY GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUNSET SCAVENGER COMPANY GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING COMPANY SERVED JAN-20-2009, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT LOPEZ, NOE EBER MEJIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUNSET SCAVENGER COMPANY GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING COMPANY SERVED JAN-20-2009, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT GOMEZ, ROLANDO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUNSET SCAVENGER COMPANY GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING COMPANY SERVED JAN-20-2009, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT MEJIA, CATALINO BAMACA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUNSET SCAVENGER COMPANY GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING COMPANY SERVED JAN-20-2009, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT LOPEZ, CARLOS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUNSET SCAVENGER COMPANY GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING COMPANY SERVED JAN-20-2009, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT CORONADO, ANGEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2009
  • DocketADDED TO CALENDAR FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION PURSUANT TO EX PARTE ORDER FILED ON JAN. 15, 2009 HEARING SET FOR FEB-26-2009 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2009
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUNSET SCAVENGER COMPANY GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING COMPANY (Fee:40.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBUSINESS TORT, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUNSET SCAVENGER COMPANY GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT PEREZ, AROLDO (AKA AROLDO MEJIA) PEREZ, PABLO MEJIA (AKA PABLO MEJIA AND PABLO PEREZ) GONZALEZ, PABLO MEJIA (AKA PABLO TIMOTEO MEJIA) LOPEZ, NOE EBER MEJIA GOMEZ, ROLANDO LOPEZ, CARLOS GONZALEZ, JOEL MEJIA, CATALINO BAMACA HERNANDEZ, VALERIO CORONADO, ANGEL BAMACA, HENRY SAUL YOC (AKA HENRY SAUL YOC) DOES 1-100 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-19-2009 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-16-2009 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-04-2009 (Fee:365.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SUNSET SCAVENGER COMPANY A.K.A. RECOLOGY SUNSET SCAVENGER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where American Contractors Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Goodman, William M.