Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/07/2016 at 03:31:43 (UTC).

SUMITA RAY VS. 300 SPEAR REALTY VENTURE LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 04/12/2010 SUMITA RAY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 300 SPEAR REALTY VENTURE LLC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8533

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAY, SUMITA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

WANG, PING

FOUR STAR CLEANING AND RESTORATION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

300 SPEAR REALTY VENTURES, LLC (SUED AS 300 SPEAR STREET, LLC)

DOES 1 THRU 70, INCL.

300 SPEAR STREET LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

TISHMAN SPEYER PROPERTIES, LP A NEW YORK LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Cross Defendants

MOES 1 TO 20

300 SPEAR STREET LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ROES 1-20

TISHMAN SPEYER PROPERTIES, LP A NEW YORK LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

HAR-BRO OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERDING, TYLER PAUL

Attorney at BERDING & WEIL

2175 N. California Blvd., #500

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

HUNTER, III, DAVID E.

Attorney at VALERIAN, PATTERSON & STRATMAN

1650 Harbor Bay Parkway, Suite 100

Alameda, CA 94502

TAKAHASHI, IRENE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome Street, Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

SHANAGHER, DENIS FRANCIS

Attorney at LUCE FORWARD HAMILTON & SCRIPPS LLP

121 Spear Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF RAY, SUMITA AS TO DEFENDANT 300 SPEAR STREET LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY TISHMAN SPEYER PROPERTIES, LP A NEW YORK LIMITED PARTNERSHIP WANG, PING FOUR STAR CLEANING AND RESTORATION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 THRU 70, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEP-10-2010 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-11-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON AUG-26-2010 (Fee:370.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF RAY, SUMITA SERVED APR-30-2010, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT FOUR STAR CLEANING AND RESTORATION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF RAY, SUMITA SERVED APR-27-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT TISHMAN SPEYER PROPERTIES, LP A NEW YORK LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF RAY, SUMITA SERVED MAY-18-2010, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE JUN-07-2010 ON DEFENDANT 300 SPEAR STREET LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF RAY, SUMITA SERVED JUN-08-2010, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT WANG, PING

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT FOUR STAR CLEANING AND RESTORATION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Fee:370.00)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT TISHMAN SPEYER PROPERTIES, LP A NEW YORK LIMITED PARTNERSHIP 300 SPEAR REALTY VENTURES, LLC (SUED AS 300 SPEAR STREET, LLC) (Fee:740.00)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WANG, PING (Fee:370.00)

Continued Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF FEB-16-2012 CONTINUED TO MAY-17-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

NOTICE

NOTICE AND REQ FOR ADDL TIME TO COMPLETE SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF RAY, SUMITA

Continued Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAY-17-2012 CONTINUED TO SEP-18-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY ATTORNEY BERDING TYLER P

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

STATEMENT RE: OSC FILED BY PLAINTIFF RAY, SUMITA

Continued Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF SEP-18-2012 CONTINUED TO DEC-18-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

STATEMENT RE OSC FILED BY PLAINTIFF RAY, SUMITA

Continued Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF DEC-18-2012 CONTINUED TO JUN-25-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Dismissing Case Pursuant to CRC 3.1385

CASE DISMISSED BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING JUN-25-2013 AT 10:30 AM PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE DISMISSED BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING JUN-25-2013 AT 10:30 AM PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • MINI MINUTES FOR JUN-25-2013 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF DEC-18-2012 CONTINUED TO JUN-25-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT RE OSC FILED BY PLAINTIFF RAY, SUMITA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF SEP-18-2012 CONTINUED TO DEC-18-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT RE: OSC FILED BY PLAINTIFF RAY, SUMITA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY ATTORNEY BERDING TYLER P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAY-17-2012 CONTINUED TO SEP-18-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE AND REQ FOR ADDL TIME TO COMPLETE SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF RAY, SUMITA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF FEB-16-2012 CONTINUED TO MAY-17-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT WANG, PING AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT 300 SPEAR STREET LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY TISHMAN SPEYER PROPERTIES, LP A NEW YORK LIMITED PARTNERSHIP FOUR STAR CLEANING AND RESTORATION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ROES 1-20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WANG, PING (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT TISHMAN SPEYER PROPERTIES, LP A NEW YORK LIMITED PARTNERSHIP 300 SPEAR REALTY VENTURES, LLC (SUED AS 300 SPEAR STREET, LLC) (Fee:740.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT FOUR STAR CLEANING AND RESTORATION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF RAY, SUMITA SERVED JUN-08-2010, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT WANG, PING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF RAY, SUMITA SERVED MAY-18-2010, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE JUN-07-2010 ON DEFENDANT 300 SPEAR STREET LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF RAY, SUMITA SERVED APR-27-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT TISHMAN SPEYER PROPERTIES, LP A NEW YORK LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF RAY, SUMITA SERVED APR-30-2010, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT FOUR STAR CLEANING AND RESTORATION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF RAY, SUMITA AS TO DEFENDANT 300 SPEAR STREET LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY TISHMAN SPEYER PROPERTIES, LP A NEW YORK LIMITED PARTNERSHIP WANG, PING FOUR STAR CLEANING AND RESTORATION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 THRU 70, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEP-10-2010 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-11-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON AUG-26-2010 (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Berding, Tyler P.