Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/07/2016 at 14:24:47 (UTC).

SUMING CHEN VS. RAMIRO HERNANDEZ SOTO

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 SUMING CHEN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RAMIRO HERNANDEZ SOTO. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8716

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CHEN, SUMING

Sf, CA 94116

Respondent

SOTO, RAMIRO HERNANDEZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2013
  • JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE, MARITAL STATUS ENDS AUG-23-2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2013
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT CHECKLIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • CLERK REJECT LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • PRELIMINARY DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE STATEMENT FILED BY PETITIONER CHEN, SUMING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT (FAMILY LAW) AS TO RESPONDENT SOTO, RAMIRO HERNANDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, SERVICE DATE: FEB-04-2013, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE: FEB-22-2013 FILED BY PETITIONER CHEN, SUMING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2013
  • DEFAULT/JUDGMENT RECEIVED SUBMITTED BY: PRO PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • ORDER GRANTING WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52 AS TO PETITIONER CHEN, SUMING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • APPLICATION PENDING FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PETITIONER CHEN, SUMING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED BY PETITIONER CHEN, SUMING AS TO RESPONDENT SOTO, RAMIRO HERNANDEZ SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less