This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 08/05/2023 at 01:10:11 (UTC).

STEWART TITLE OF CALIFORNIA, INC., A CORPORATION VS. PAUL V. GILMORE ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/17/2023 STEWART TITLE OF CALIFORNIA, INC , A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against PAUL. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO, CHARLES F. HAINES and RICHARD B. ULMER. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4344

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

CHARLES F. HAINES

RICHARD B. ULMER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEWART TITLE OF CALIFORNIA, INC., A CORPORATION

Defendants and Cross Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 20, INCLUSIVE

WESTBAY COMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA COLDWELL BANKER COMMERICAL WESTBAY REAL ESTATE GROUP

GILMORE, PAUL V.

ROES 1 THROUGH 20, INCLUSIVE

Cross Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Defendants

WESTBAY COMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA COLDWELL BANKER COMMERICAL WESTBAY REAL ESTATE GROUP

GILMORE, PAUL V.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DREYFUSS, LAWRENCE J

Cross Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorney

TURSI, JOSEPH GERALD

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of Summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100199947) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT WESTBAY COMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA COLDWELL BANKER COMMERICAL WESTBAY REAL ESTATE GROUP SERVED APR-21-2023, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT GILMORE, PAUL V.

CROSS COMPLAINT

CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT GILMORE, PAUL V. AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT WESTBAY COMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA COLDWELL BANKER COMMERICAL WESTBAY REAL ESTATE GROUP DOES 1 THROUGH 20, INCLUSIVE

ANSWER

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT (OF WESTBAY COMMERICAL REAL ESTATE) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT GILMORE, PAUL V.

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT GILMORE, PAUL V.

WestBay Commercial Real Estate Group Cross-Complaint

CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100196582) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT WESTBAY COMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA COLDWELL BANKER COMMERICAL WESTBAY REAL ESTATE GROUP AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT GILMORE, PAUL V. ROES 1 THROUGH 20, INCLUSIVE

Verified Answer to Complaint In Interpleader

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100196582) FILED BY DEFENDANT WESTBAY COMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA COLDWELL BANKER COMMERICAL WESTBAY REAL ESTATE GROUP

Proof of Service of Summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100194243), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEWART TITLE OF CALIFORNIA, INC., A CORPORATION SERVED FEB-13-2023, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE FEB-01-2023 AS TO DEFENDANT GILMORE, PAUL V.

Proof of Service of Summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100192172), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEWART TITLE OF CALIFORNIA, INC., A CORPORATION SERVED FEB-24-2023, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE FEB-13-2023 AS TO DEFENDANT WESTBAY COMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA COLDWELL BANKER COMMERICAL WESTBAY REAL ESTATE GROUP

Complaint In Interpleader

OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100187964) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEWART TITLE OF CALIFORNIA, INC., A CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT GILMORE, PAUL WESTBAY COMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA COLDWELL BANKER COMMERICAL WESTBAY REAL ESTATE GROUP DOES 1 THROUGH 20, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-21-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-20-2023 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-30-2023

WESTBAY COMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE GROUPS ANSWER TO GILMORES VERIFIED FIRS

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT (OF PAUL V. GILMORE FILED ON JUNE 23, 2023) (TRANSACTION ID # 100207525) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT WESTBAY COMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA COLDWELL BANKER COMMERICAL WESTBAY REAL ESTATE GROUP

Notice of Time and Place of Trial AND Trial Order

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, COURT TRIAL SET FOR FEB-20-2024 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUL-26-2023 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Reply to Non-Opposition

REPLY TO NON-OPPOSITION TO ITS MOTION FOR DISCHARGE AND AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 100206096) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEWART TITLE OF CALIFORNIA, INC., A CORPORATION

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100205341) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEWART TITLE OF CALIFORNIA, INC., A CORPORATION

CMC Statement with POS (7.26.23)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100205244) FILED BY DEFENDANT WESTBAY COMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA COLDWELL BANKER COMMERICAL WESTBAY REAL ESTATE GROUP ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED ANSWER AND FIRST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT GILMORE, PAUL V.

CROSS COMPLAINT

1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT GILMORE, PAUL V. AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT WESTBAY COMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA COLDWELL BANKER COMMERICAL WESTBAY REAL ESTATE GROUP DOES 1 THROUGH 20, INCLUSIVE

ANSWER

AMENDED ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT (OF WESTBAY COMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE GROUP) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT GILMORE, PAUL V.

Notice of Motion and Motion for Discharge and Award of Attorneys Fees

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR DISCHARGE AND AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION (TRANSACTION ID # 100203798) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEWART TITLE OF CALIFORNIA, INC., A CORPORATION HEARING SET FOR JUL-20-2023 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2024
  • HearingMatter(s): MASTER CALENDAR COURT; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2023
  • DocketREAL PROPERTY/HOUSING MOTION 501, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR DISCHARGE AND AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS IS GRANTED AS REQUESTED. NO OPPOSITION FILED. JUDGE: CHARLES F. HAINES ; CLERK: L. YOUNG ; NOT REPORTED. (D501)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2023
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR AUG-03-2023 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 501

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): Notice Of Motion And Motion For Discharge And Award Of Attorneys Fees And Costs Off Calendar Aug-03-2023 Text Ruling MINI MINUTES: No appearances, tentative ruling adopted as follows: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DISCHARGE AND AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS is GRANTED as requested. No opposition filed. Judge: Charles F. Haines ; Clerk: L. Young ; Not Reported. (D501); Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 501; Judge Name: CHARLES F. HAINES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT (OF PAUL V. GILMORE FILED ON JUNE 23, 2023) (TRANSACTION ID # 100207525) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT WESTBAY COMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA COLDWELL BANKER COMMERICAL WESTBAY REAL ESTATE GROUP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Jul-13-2023 Set For Trial On Feb-20-24 At 09:30 A.M. In Dept 206; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • DocketLAW AND MOTION 302, RE: PLAINTIFFS STEWART TITLE OF CALIFORNIA, INC.'S, A CORPORATION, MOTION FOR DISCHARGE AND AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS. NO APPEARANCE WAS MADE BY ANY PARTY, COUNSEL, OR INTERESTED PERSON. THE COURT ADOPTS ITS TENTATIVE RULING AS FOLLOWS: TRANSFERRED TO BE HEARD IN DEPARTMENT 501 AT 9:30 A.M. ON AUGUST 3, 2023. THAT DEPARTMENT HANDLES ALL REAL PROPERTY CASES PER SF LOCAL RULE 8.10A1. COURTESY COPIES OF ALL PAPERS ARE TO BE DELIVERED TO THAT DEPARTMENT NO LATER THAN JULY 24, 2023. JUDGE: RICHARD B. ULMER JR. CLERK: ROBERT WOODS. NOT REPORTED. (302/RBU)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR JUL-20-2023 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): Notice Of Motion And Motion For Discharge And Award Of Attorneys Fees And Costs Off Calendar Jul-20-2023 Continued To Aug-03-23 At 09:30 A.M. In Dept 501 MINI MINUTES: RE: Plaintiffs STEWART TITLE OF CALIFORNIA, INC.'s, A CORPORATION, Motion for Discharge And Award Of Attorney's Fees And Costs. No appearance was made by any Party, Counsel, or Interested Person. The court adopts its tentative ruling as follows: Transferred to be heard in department 501 at 9:30 a.m. on August 3, 2023. That department handles all real property cases per SF Local Rule 8.10A1. Courtesy copies of all papers are to be delivered to that department no later than July 24, 2023. Judge: Richard B. Ulmer Jr. Clerk: Robert Woods. Not reported. (302\/RBU); Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 302; Judge Name: RICHARD B. ULMER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, COURT TRIAL SET FOR FEB-20-2024 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUL-26-2023 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100194243), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEWART TITLE OF CALIFORNIA, INC., A CORPORATION SERVED FEB-13-2023, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE FEB-01-2023 AS TO DEFENDANT GILMORE, PAUL V.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100192172), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEWART TITLE OF CALIFORNIA, INC., A CORPORATION SERVED FEB-24-2023, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE FEB-13-2023 AS TO DEFENDANT WESTBAY COMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA COLDWELL BANKER COMMERICAL WESTBAY REAL ESTATE GROUP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONCURRENT DEPOSIT OF FUNDS WITH COURT PER INTERPLEADER COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEWART TITLE OF CALIFORNIA, INC., A CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • FinancialPayment: OTHER TRUST DEPOSIT; Amount: $69550; Payment Type: CHECK; Receipt Number: W1523215D012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketDEPOSIT OF MONIES ON INTERPLEADER, TRAN # W1523215D012, TAG # 037194 DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF STEWART TITLE OF CALIFORNIA, INC., A CORPORATION; Fee: $69,550

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 100187964) TO PLAINTIFF STEWART TITLE OF CALIFORNIA, INC., A CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $435; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: H2523201F001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 100187964) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEWART TITLE OF CALIFORNIA, INC., A CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100187964) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEWART TITLE OF CALIFORNIA, INC., A CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT GILMORE, PAUL V. WESTBAY COMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA COLDWELL BANKER COMMERICAL WESTBAY REAL ESTATE GROUP DOES 1 THROUGH 20, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-21-2023; Fee: $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******4344
Case Title:STEWART TITLE OF CALIFORNIA, INC., A CORPORATION VS. PAUL V. GILMORE ET AL
Court Date:AUG-03-2023 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion For Discharge And Award Of Attorneys Fees And Costs
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for August 3, 2023 line 3.PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DISCHARGE AND AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTSis GRANTED as requested. No opposition filed. =(501/CFH)Parties may appear in-person, telephonically or via Zoom (Video - Webinar ID: 160 560 5023; Password: 172849; or Phone Dial in: (669) 254-5252; Webinar ID: 160 560 5023; Password: 172849). Parties who intend to appear at the hearing must give notice to opposing parties and the court promptly, but no later than 4:00 p.m. the court day before the hearing unless the tentative ruling has specified that a hearing is required. Notice of contesting a tentative ruling shall be provided by sending an email to the court to Department501ContestTR@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. A party may not argue at the hearing if the opposing party is not so notified and the opposing party does not appear.


Case Number:*******4344
Case Title:STEWART TITLE OF CALIFORNIA, INC., A CORPORATION VS. PAUL V. GILMORE ET AL
Court Date:JUL-20-2023 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion For Discharge And Award Of Attorneys Fees And Costs
Rulings:Matter on the Law & Motion calendar for Thursday, July 20, 2023, Line 9,PLAINTIFF STEWART TITLE OF CALIFORNIA, INC.'s Notice Of Motion And Motion For Discharge And Award Of Attorneys Fees And Costs.Transferred to be heard in department 501 at 9:30 a.m. on August 3, 2023. That department handles all real property cases per SF Local Rule 8.10A1. Courtesy copies of all papers are to be delivered to that department no later than July 24, 2023.=(302/RBU)