This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 05/26/2023 at 01:03:27 (UTC).

STEVEN MATTEUCCI ET AL VS. RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/19/2022 STEVEN MATTEUCCI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3558

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MATTEUCCI, STEVEN AN INDIVIDUAL

ROES 1-25

Defendants

DOES 1-25

RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIXON, JORDAN K.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Coversheet (Cover Sheets)

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 210024151) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MATTEUCCI, STEVEN AN INDIVIDUAL ROES 1-25

Complaint (first appearance fee) (Case Initiation)

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210024151) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MATTEUCCI, STEVEN AN INDIVIDUAL ROES 1-25 AS TO DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO DOES 1-25 NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAY-24-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON FEB-17-2023 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-01-2023

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Issued Summons (Summons)

SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 210024151) TO PLAINTIFF MATTEUCCI, STEVEN AN INDIVIDUAL ROES 1-25

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAY-24-2023 CONTINUED TO JUL-26-2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar May-01-2023 Continued To Jul-26-23 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAY-24-2023 CONTINUED TO JUL-26-2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 210024151) TO PLAINTIFF MATTEUCCI, STEVEN AN INDIVIDUAL ROES 1-25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $435; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: H4822C21F002

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210024151) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MATTEUCCI, STEVEN AN INDIVIDUAL ROES 1-25 AS TO DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO DOES 1-25 NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAY-24-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON FEB-17-2023 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-01-2023; Fee: $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 210024151) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MATTEUCCI, STEVEN AN INDIVIDUAL ROES 1-25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less