This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/07/2016 at 04:22:40 (UTC).

STEPHEN MASSEY VS. JAMES LODUCA

Case Summary

On 04/24/2012 STEPHEN MASSEY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JAMES LODUCA. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6923

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MASSEY, STEPHEN

Respondent

LODUCA, JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

EMLEY, DON B

240 Stockton Street, Suite 400

San Francisco, CA 94108-5306

Respondent Attorney

THORNDAL, PAUL W.

Attorney at WALD & THORNDAL, PC

88 Kearny St., Suite 1475

San Francisco, CA 94108

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2012
  • JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE, MARITAL STATUS ENDS OCT-31-2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2012
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT CHECKLIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2012
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2012
  • STIPULATION AND MUTUAL WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2012
  • PRELIMINARY DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE STATEMENT FILED BY RESPONDENT LODUCA, JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2012
  • PRELIMINARY DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE STATEMENT FILED BY PETITIONER MASSEY, STEPHEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2012
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT (FAMILY LAW) AS TO RESPONDENT LODUCA, JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS *NAR ATTACHED - SIGNED 4/30/12* FILED BY PETITIONER MASSEY, STEPHEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2012
  • DEFAULT/JUDGMENT RECEIVED FROM ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED BY PETITIONER MASSEY, STEPHEN AS TO RESPONDENT LODUCA, JAMES SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less