This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/15/2016 at 03:48:56 (UTC).

STEFAN SOBCZAK VS. SAKS & COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/10/2014 STEFAN SOBCZAK filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SAKS COMPANY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2167

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOBCZAK, STEFAN

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 200, INCLUSIVE

SAKS & COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SARRO, FRANK PAUL

Attorney at FRANK P. SARRO

2121 North California Blvd, Suite 290

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Defendant Attorneys

BEA, RENEE

Attorney at COLT SINGER BEA LLP

601 Montgomery Street, Ste 1950

San Francisco, CA 94111

COLT, DOUG

Attorney at COLT SINGER BEA LLP

255 Shoreline Drive, Ste 540

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

 

Court Documents

Exhibits A Through H to the Declaration of Walter C Pfeffer in Opposit

EXHIBITS A THROUGH H TO THE DECLARATION OF WALTER C PFEFFER IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 57527897) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAKS & COMPANY

Order Dismissing Case Pursuant to CRC 3.1385

CASE DISMISSED BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING NOV-03-2015 AT 10:30 AM PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER

Defendant Saks & Co.s Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 56785313) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAKS & COMPANY JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 4.0 DAYS

Declaration of Walter C Pfeffer in Opposition to Motion to File First

DECLARATION OF WALTER C PFEFFER IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 57527897) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAKS & COMPANY

Exhibits I Through R to the Declaration of Walter C Pfeffer in Opposit

EXHIBITS I THROUGH R TO THE DECLARATION OF WALTER C PFEFFER IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 57527897) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAKS & COMPANY

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR SEP-21-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON MAR-11-2015 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OFASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL (TRANSACTION ID # 57571795) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAKS & COMPANY

DEFENDANT SAKS AND COMPANYS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 56436057) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAKS & COMPANY (Fee:450.00)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING NOV-03-2015 AT 10:30 AM PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR NOV-03-2015 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR AUG-21-2015 HELD AND SETTLED. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON NOV-03-2015 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (8.0)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • DocketREMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR SEP-21-2015 - CASE SETTLED AT THE AUG-21-2015 MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 57611942) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAKS & COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 57611942) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAKS & COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR AUG-21-2015 AT 1:00 PM IN DEPT. 210 WITH CONFERENCE OFFICER RONALD BUSHNER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • DocketLAW AND MOTION 302, PLAINTIFF STEFAN SOBCZAK'S MOTION TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DENIED. PLAINTIFF DOES NOT PROVIDE A PLAUSIBLE EXPLANATION ABOUT WHY LEAVE TO AMEND WAS NOT SOUGHT EARLIER. PLAINTIFF'S CONTENTION THAT HE DID NOT LEARN ABOUT THE FACTS GIVING RISE TO THE PROPOSED CAUSES OF ACTION UNTIL HIS OWN DEPOSITION MAKES LITTLE SENSE. ADDITIONALLY, DEFENDANT SUBMITS EVIDENCE ESTABLISHING THAT, AT THE VERY LEAST, PLAINTIFF WAS AWARE OF THE FACTS IN DECEMBER 2014. (DECLARATION OF WALTER C. PFEFFER, EXS. Q-R.) DEFENDANT HAS ESTABLISHED THAT IT WILL BE UNDULY PREJUDICED BY THE DELAY, GIVEN THAT DISCOVERY HAS BEEN COMPLETED AND TRIAL IS SET TO COMMENCE IN APPROXIMATELY TWO MONTHS. FURTHER, PLAINTIFF'S MOTION DOES NOT COMPLY WITH THE RULES OF COURT. CRC 3.1324 SPECIFIES WHAT MUST BE INCLUDED IN A DECLARATION FILED IN SUPPORT OF A MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND. THE DECLARATION OF FRANK P. SARRO DOES NOT ADEQUATELY ADDRESS ANY OF THE REQUIREMENTS SET FORTH IN CRC 3.1324. JUDGE SUZANNE R. BOLANOS; CLERK FELICIA GREEN; DEPT. 302. (302/SRB)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR JUL-22-2015 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 56785313) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAKS & COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 56785313) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAKS & COMPANY JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 4.0 DAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • DocketJURY FEES DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF SOBCZAK, STEFAN (Fee:150.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFEE PAID ON PROPOSED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 56650631) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAKS & COMPANY (Fee:20.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 56436057) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAKS & COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 56436057) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAKS & COMPANY (Fee:450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SOBCZAK, STEFAN SERVED NOV-06-2014, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION ON DEFENDANT SAKS & COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SOBCZAK, STEFAN AS TO DEFENDANT SAKS & COMPANY DOES 1 TO 200, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-11-2015 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-09-2014 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-17-2015 (Fee:450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******2167
Case Title:STEFAN SOBCZAK VS. SAKS & COMPANY ET AL
Court Date:JUL-22-2015 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To File First Amended Complaint
Rulings:Set for hearing on Wednesday, July 22, 2015, Line 10, PLAINTIFF STEFAN SOBCZAK'S Motion To File First Amended Complaint.Denied. Plaintiff does not provide a plausible explanation about why leave to amend was not sought earlier. Plaintiff's contention that he did not learn about the facts giving rise to the proposed causes of action until his own deposition makes little sense. Additionally, Defendant submits evidence establishing that, at the very least, Plaintiff was aware of the facts in December 2014. (Declaration of Walter C. Pfeffer, Exs. Q-R.) Defendant has established that it will be unduly prejudiced by the delay, given that discovery has been completed and trial is set to commence in approximately two months. Further, Plaintiff's motion does not comply with the Rules of Court. CRC 3.1324 specifies what must be included in a declaration filed in support of a motion for leave to amend. The Declaration of Frank P. Sarro does not adequately address any of the requirements set forth in CRC 3.1324. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order with the name and address of the prevailing party's counsel or the prevailing party if pro per in the top left of the first page of proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing or email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/EG)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAKS & COMPANY LLC. A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLT, DOUG