Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:50:34 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO. VS. MICHAEL NGOC DUC NGUYEN et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS CO filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against MICHAEL NGOC DUC NGUYEN. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8486

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO.

Defendants

NGUYEN, MICHAEL NGOC DUC

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REESE, HARLAN M

Attorney at REESE LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

6725 Mesa Ridge Road, Ste. 240

San Diego, CA 92121

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO DEFENDANT NGUYEN, MICHAEL NGOC DUC

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-05-2013 CONTINUED TO OCT-09-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR PLAINTIFF TO OBTAIN DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF (GENERIC)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO. SERVED JUN-05-2013, MAIL ON DEFENDANT NGUYEN, MICHAEL NGOC DUC

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-09-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR - JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

DECLARATION

DECLARATION OF PARKER MARLETT IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 585 FILED BY PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO.

DECLARATION

DECLARATION RE: CASE SUMMARY FILED BY PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO.

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10

COMPLAINT

SUBROGATION/INSURANCE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO. AS TO DEFENDANT NGUYEN, MICHAEL NGOC DUC DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-05-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-21-2013 (Fee:225.00)

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $297.50 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT NGUYEN, MICHAEL NGOC DUC

COURT JUDGMENT - GENERAL

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO. RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT NGUYEN, MICHAEL NGOC DUC $8,896.14 PRINCIPAL, $111.15 INTEREST, $297.50 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $9,304.79, SEE SCANNED DOC

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO. SERVED FEB-11-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT NGUYEN, MICHAEL NGOC DUC

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 1.0 HOURS

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2013
  • COPYING FEES (2 PAGE, 1 CERTIFIED COPY) PAID BY PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO. (Fee:26.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • CERTIFY COPY OF JUDGMENT FACT RE UNSATISFIED JUDGMENT TO DMV FILED BY PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO. (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-09-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR - JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO. (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2013
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO. RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT NGUYEN, MICHAEL NGOC DUC $8,896.14 PRINCIPAL, $111.15 INTEREST, $297.50 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $9,304.79, SEE SCANNED DOC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF PARKER MARLETT IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 585 FILED BY PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: CASE SUMMARY FILED BY PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $297.50 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT NGUYEN, MICHAEL NGOC DUC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO. SERVED JUN-05-2013, MAIL ON DEFENDANT NGUYEN, MICHAEL NGOC DUC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2013
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT, COURT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO. AS TO DEFENDANT NGUYEN, MICHAEL NGOC DUC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-05-2013 CONTINUED TO OCT-09-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR PLAINTIFF TO OBTAIN DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 1.0 HOURS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO DEFENDANT NGUYEN, MICHAEL NGOC DUC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO. AS TO DEFENDANT NGUYEN, MICHAEL NGOC DUC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO. SERVED FEB-11-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT NGUYEN, MICHAEL NGOC DUC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBROGATION/INSURANCE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO. AS TO DEFENDANT NGUYEN, MICHAEL NGOC DUC DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-05-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-21-2013 (Fee:225.00)

    Read MoreRead Less