Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:50:18 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS. JORGE ARMANDO et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JORGE ARMANDO. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8482

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

ARMANDO, JORGE

CUSA FL, LLC

DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EVERSON, BETHANY L.

Attorney at WATKINS & LETOFSKY, LLP

4040 Macarthur Blvd Ste 240

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendant Attorney

GIBBONS, JAMES

Attorney at MANNING & MARDER, KASS, ELLROD, RAMIREZ, LLP

15Th Floor @ 801 Tower, 801 South Figueroa St

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-05-2013 CONTINUED TO DEC-04-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS REPORT RE BANKRUPTCY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS REGARDING BANKRUPTCY FILED BY DEFENDANT ARMANDO, JORGE CUSA FL, LLC

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMBILE INSURANCE COMPANY SERVED FEB-13-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT CUSA FL, LLC

COMPLAINT

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMBILE INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT ARMANDO, JORGE CUSA FL, LLC DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-05-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-21-2013 (Fee:370.00)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF DEC-04-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF DEC-04-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-05-2013 CONTINUED TO DEC-04-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS REPORT RE BANKRUPTCY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS REGARDING BANKRUPTCY FILED BY DEFENDANT ARMANDO, JORGE CUSA FL, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • DECLARATION RE; REASONABLE DILIGENCE FILED BY PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMBILE INSURANCE COMPANY SERVED FEB-13-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT CUSA FL, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMBILE INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT ARMANDO, JORGE CUSA FL, LLC DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-05-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-21-2013 (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less