This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 06/30/2023 at 10:07:19 (UTC).

SPINAKER INSURANCE COMPANY ET AL VS. PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 SPINAKER INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3349

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CANOPIUS MANAGING AGENTS LIMITED

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS OF LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBERS ARG0040190, ARG0040193, ARG0040196, ARG0040200, ARG0040203, ARG0040204, ARG0040205, ARG0045245, ARG0045243, ARG0033415, ARG0033416, ARG0045587, ARG0045244, ARG0053164, ARG0041120, A

HAMILTON MANAGING AGENCY LIMITED

SPINAKER INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE

PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NOMA, SALLY

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover sheet

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 68424858) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SPINAKER INSURANCE COMPANY HAMILTON MANAGING AGENCY LIMITED CANOPIUS MANAGING AGENTS LIMITED CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS OF LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBERS ARG0040190, ARG0040193, ARG0040196, ARG0040200, ARG0040203, ARG0040204, ARG0040205, ARG0045245, ARG0045243, ARG0033415, ARG0033416, ARG0045587, ARG0045244, ARG0053164, ARG0041120, ARG0045603, 992PLW-1877, 992PLW-1768 CASE DESIGNATED COMPLEX LITIGATION

Short Form Complaint in Subrogation (Subrogation Plaintiffs)

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 68424858) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SPINAKER INSURANCE COMPANY HAMILTON MANAGING AGENCY LIMITED CANOPIUS MANAGING AGENTS LIMITED CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS OF LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBERS ARG0040190, ARG0040193, ARG0040196, ARG0040200, ARG0040203, ARG0040204, ARG0040205, ARG0045245, ARG0045243, ARG0033415, ARG0033416, ARG0045587, ARG0045244, ARG0053164, ARG0041120, ARG0045603, 992PLW-1877, 992PLW-1768 AS TO DEFENDANT PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-26-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-23-2023 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-03-2023 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Summons

SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 68424858) TO PLAINTIFF SPINAKER INSURANCE COMPANY HAMILTON MANAGING AGENCY LIMITED CANOPIUS MANAGING AGENTS LIMITED CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS OF LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBERS ARG0040190, ARG0040193, ARG0040196, ARG0040200, ARG0040203, ARG0040204, ARG0040205, ARG0045245, ARG0045243, ARG0033415, ARG0033416, ARG0045587, ARG0045244, ARG0053164, ARG0041120, ARG0045603, 992PLW-1877, 992PLW-1768

Summons

SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 68659998) TO PLAINTIFF SPINAKER INSURANCE COMPANY HAMILTON MANAGING AGENCY LIMITED CANOPIUS MANAGING AGENTS LIMITED CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS OF LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBERS ARG0040190, ARG0040193, ARG0040196, ARG0040200, ARG0040203, ARG0040204, ARG0040205, ARG0045245, ARG0045243, ARG0033415, ARG0033416, ARG0045587, ARG0045244, ARG0053164, ARG0041120, ARG0045603, 992PLW-1877, 992PLW-1768

Order Denying Complex Designation For Failure to File Application Requ

ORDER DENYING COMPLEX DESIGNATION FOR FAILURE TO FILE APPLICATION REQUESTING DESIGNATION

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-26-2023 CONTINUED TO JUN-28-2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 69772622)

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-28-2023 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

 

Docket Entries

06/28/2023

HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Jun-05-2023 Off Calendar; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-28-2023 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2023

HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Apr-05-2023 Continued To Jun-28-23 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 69772622)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-26-2023 CONTINUED TO JUN-28-2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER DENYING COMPLEX DESIGNATION FOR FAILURE TO FILE APPLICATION REQUESTING DESIGNATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 68659998) TO PLAINTIFF SPINAKER INSURANCE COMPANY HAMILTON MANAGING AGENCY LIMITED CANOPIUS MANAGING AGENTS LIMITED CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS OF LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBERS ARG0040190, ARG0040193, ARG0040196, ARG0040200, ARG0040203, ARG0040204, ARG0040205, ARG0045245, ARG0045243, ARG0033415, ARG0033416, ARG0045587, ARG0045244, ARG0053164, ARG0041120, ARG0045603, 992PLW-1877, 992PLW-1768

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/09/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 68424858) TO PLAINTIFF SPINAKER INSURANCE COMPANY HAMILTON MANAGING AGENCY LIMITED CANOPIUS MANAGING AGENTS LIMITED CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS OF LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBERS ARG0040190, ARG0040193, ARG0040196, ARG0040200, ARG0040203, ARG0040204, ARG0040205, ARG0045245, ARG0045243, ARG0033415, ARG0033416, ARG0045587, ARG0045244, ARG0053164, ARG0041120, ARG0045603, 992PLW-1877, 992PLW-1768

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/09/2022

FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $1435; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: C7122C09F009

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketPERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 68424858) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SPINAKER INSURANCE COMPANY HAMILTON MANAGING AGENCY LIMITED CANOPIUS MANAGING AGENTS LIMITED CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS OF LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBERS ARG0040190, ARG0040193, ARG0040196, ARG0040200, ARG0040203, ARG0040204, ARG0040205, ARG0045245, ARG0045243, ARG0033415, ARG0033416, ARG0045587, ARG0045244, ARG0053164, ARG0041120, ARG0045603, 992PLW-1877, 992PLW-1768 AS TO DEFENDANT PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-26-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-23-2023 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-03-2023 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE; Fee: $1435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 68424858) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SPINAKER INSURANCE COMPANY HAMILTON MANAGING AGENCY LIMITED CANOPIUS MANAGING AGENTS LIMITED CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS OF LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBERS ARG0040190, ARG0040193, ARG0040196, ARG0040200, ARG0040203, ARG0040204, ARG0040205, ARG0045245, ARG0045243, ARG0033415, ARG0033416, ARG0045587, ARG0045244, ARG0053164, ARG0041120, ARG0045603, 992PLW-1877, 992PLW-1768 CASE DESIGNATED COMPLEX LITIGATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less