This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 07/29/2020 at 01:43:15 (UTC).

SPIELBAUER LAW OFFICE VS. RICHARD ANTOGNINI

Case Summary

On 07/28/2020 SPIELBAUER LAW OFFICE filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against RICHARD ANTOGNINI. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRETT L. WONG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5617

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

GARRETT L. WONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPIELBAUER LAW OFFICE A SOLE PROPRIETORSHIP

Defendant

ANTOGNINI, RICHARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SULLIVAN, KEVIN MICHAEL

1839 Ygnacio Valley Road #420

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SPIELBAUER LAW OFFICE A SOLE PROPRIETORSHIP AS TO DEFENDANT ANTOGNINI, RICHARD SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-30-2020 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON SEP-28-2020 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-07-2020

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2020
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: GARRETT L. WONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1320728F004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SPIELBAUER LAW OFFICE A SOLE PROPRIETORSHIP AS TO DEFENDANT ANTOGNINI, RICHARD SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-30-2020 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON SEP-28-2020 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-07-2020 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******5617
Case Title:SPIELBAUER LAW OFFICE VS. RICHARD ANTOGNINI
Court Date:FEB-28-2022 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion To Compel
Rulings:Matter on the Discovery Calendar for Monday, February 28, 2022, Line 3, PLAINTIFF SPIELBAUER LAW OFFICE's Motion To Compel.Continued to March 17, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. on the court's motion.Pursuant to the instructions on the department's court website (https: sfsuperiorcourt.org/divisions/civil/law-motion), parties are reminded if they have not done so already to please email electronic courtesy copies of their discovery motion papers to Discovery302@sftc.org. The subject line of the email should state the case name and number and the date of the continued hearing. =(302/JPT)


Case Number:*******5617
Case Title:SPIELBAUER LAW OFFICE VS. RICHARD ANTOGNINI
Court Date:MAR-17-2022 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion To Compel
Rulings:Matter on the Discovery Calendar for Thursday, March 17, 2022, Line 3, PLAINTIFF SPIELBAUER LAW OFFICE's Motion To Compel.Pro Tem Judge William Lynn, a member of the California State Bar who meets all the requirements set forth in CRC 2.812 to serve as a temporary judge, has been assigned to hear this motion. Prior to the hearing all parties to the motion will be asked to sign a stipulation agreeing that the motion may be heard by the Pro Tem Judge. If all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the hearing will proceed before the Judge Pro Tem who will decide the motion with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. If a party appears by telephone, the stipulation may be signed via fax or consent to sign given by email. If not all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the Pro Tem Judge will hold a hearing on the motion and, based on the papers submitted by the parties and the hearing, issue a report in the nature of a recommendation to the Dept. 302 Judge, who will then decide the motion. If a party does not appear at the hearing, the party will be deemed to have stipulated that the motion will be decided by the Pro Tem Judge with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. The Pro Tem Judge has issued the following tentative ruling:Motion is granted. Request for sanctions is granted in the amount of $1910.20 against Defendant Richard Antognini in the amount of $1,910.20. Unopposed. For the 9:00 a.m. Discovery calendar, all attorneys and parties are required to appear remotely. Hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link (DISCOVERY, DEPT 301 @ 9:00AM), or dial the corresponding phone number.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to williamclynn@gmail.com with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. If parties have arranged for a court reporter to appear, please include the following in your email: (1) ensure that they are California Certified Shorthand Reporters; (2) the reporter's full contact information [name, CSR number, personal work email, and phone number]. If the reporter is not a California Certified Shorthand Reporter, the transcript cannot be certified for use in California courts. If the tentative ruling is not contested, the parties are deemed to have stipulated to the Pro Tem hearing the motion and the Pro Tem will sign an order confirming the tentative ruling. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must e-mail it to the Judge Pro Tem. =(302/JPT)


Case Number:*******5617
Case Title:SPIELBAUER LAW OFFICE VS. RICHARD ANTOGNINI
Court Date:MAY-12-2022 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Motion To Compel The Production Of Docs
Rulings:Discovery Calendar for Thursday, May 12, 2022, Line 4, PLAINTIFF SPIELBAUER LAW OFFICE's Motion To Compel The Production Of Docs:Pro Tem Judge William Lynn, a member of the California State Bar who meets all the requirements set forth in CRC 2.812 to serve as a temporary judge, has been assigned to hear this motion. Prior to the hearing all parties to the motion will be asked to sign a stipulation agreeing that the motion may be heard by the Pro Tem Judge. If all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the hearing will proceed before the Judge Pro Tem who will decide the motion with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. If a party appears by telephone, the stipulation may be signed via fax or consent to sign given by email. If not all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the Pro Tem Judge will hold a hearing on the motion and, based on the papers submitted by the parties and the hearing, issue a report in the nature of a recommendation to the Dept. 302 Judge, who will then decide the motion. If a party does not appear at the hearing, the party will be deemed to have stipulated that the motion will be decided by the Pro Tem Judge with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. The Pro Tem Judge has issued the following tentative ruling:Parties to Appear. The parties are reminded that, as instructed on the department's court website(https: sfsuperiorcourt.org/divisions/civil/law-motion), parties are reminded to please submit electronic courtesy copies of their discovery motion papers as attachments to an email sent to Discovery302@sftc.org. The subject line of the email should state the case name and number and the date of the continued hearing. For the 9:00 a.m. Discovery calendar, all attorneys and parties are required to appear remotely. Hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link (DISCOVERY, DEPARTMENT 301 DAILY AT 9:00 A.M.), or dial the corresponding number and use the meeting ID, and password for Department 301. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to williamclynn@gmail.com with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. If parties have arranged for a court reporter to appear, please include the following in your email: the reporter's full contact information [name, CSR number, personal work email, and phone number]. If the reporter is not a California Certified Shorthand Reporter, the transcript cannot be certified for use in California courts. If the tentative ruling is not contested, the parties are deemed to have stipulated to the Pro Tem hearing the motion and the Pro Tem will sign an order confirming the tentative ruling. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must e-mail it to the Judge Pro Tem. =(302/JPT)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Spielbauer Law Office is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SULLIVAN, KEVIN M.