This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 04:49:51 (UTC).

SPARKART GROUP, INC. VS. 54 RECKLESS LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY et al

Case Summary

On 01/18/2013 SPARKART GROUP, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 54 RECKLESS LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8086

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPARKART GROUP, INC.

Defendants

54 RECKLESS LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE

54 RECKLESS LLC

Other

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

O'SULLIVAN, CIARAN

GROVER, MARGARET JEAN

Attorney at KRONICK, MOSKOVITZ, TIEDEMANN & GIRARD

1350 Treat Blvd, Ste 105

Walnut Creek, CA 94597

Defendant Attorney

BLAKELY, BRENT H.

Attorney at BLAKELY LAW GROUP

915 North Citrus Ave

Hollywood, CA 90038

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF SPARKART GROUP, INC.

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT , CONDITIONAL, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SPARKART GROUP, INC.

ORDER

ORDER AND STIPULATION PERMITTING DEFENDANT 54 RECKLESS LLC TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED ANSWER

ORDER

ORDER AND STIPULATION GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT 54 RECKLESS LLC

ORDER

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO FILE CROSS COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT 54 RECKLESS LLC

ORDER

ORDER RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT ATTACHMENT AFTER HEARING

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: GROVER, MARGARET JEAN SUBSTITUTED FOR O'SULLIVAN, CIARAN AS ATTORNEY FOR SPARKART GROUP, INC.

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR MAR-10-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUN-19-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SPARKART GROUP, INC. ALSO FILED BY DEFENDANT 54 RECKLESS LLC JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 4.0 DAYS

ANSWER

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT 54 RECKLESS LLC (Fee:450.00)

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF SPARKART GROUP, INC.

COMPLAINT

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SPARKART GROUP, INC. AS TO DEFENDANT 54 RECKLESS LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SPARKART GROUP, INC. AS TO DEFENDANT 54 RECKLESS LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-19-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-19-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-04-2013 (Fee:450.00)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2014
  • MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR MAR-10-2014 VACATED. DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED ON 10/15/13. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF SPARKART GROUP, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2013
  • WRIT RTN OF ATTACHMENT AFTER HEARING (RTN TO COURT WRIT OF ATTACHMENT) ISSUED TO LOAS ANGELES COUNTY ON 06/25/2013, UNSATISFIED. FILED BY PLAINTIFF SPARKART GROUP, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT , CONDITIONAL, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SPARKART GROUP, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER AND STIPULATION PERMITTING DEFENDANT 54 RECKLESS LLC TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER AND STIPULATION GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT 54 RECKLESS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2013
  • DISCOVERY 302, PLAINTIFF SPARKART GROUP, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IS TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. THE PARTIES HAVE STIPULATED TO THE DEPOSITION OF 54 RECKLESS LLC. IF THE TENTATIVE RULING IS NOT CONTESTED, THE COURT WILL SIGN THE STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER WITHOUT NEED FOR ANY APPEARANCES. JUDGE PRO TEM: JEFFREY R. WINDSOR; CLERK L. FONG; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (302/JPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2013
  • MINI MINUTES FOR AUG-08-2013 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2013
  • FEE FOR STIP AND ORDER FOR AMENDED ANSWER FILED BY PLAINTIFF SPARKART GROUP, INC. (Fee:20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; NOTICE TO PLTF; ADR PACKAGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF SPARKART GROUP, INC. SERVED JAN-23-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT 54 RECKLESS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY PLAINTIFF SPARKART GROUP, INC. (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF SPARKART GROUP, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF SPARKART GROUP, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND APPLICATION FOR HEARING FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SPARKART GROUP, INC. HEARING SET FOR MAY-14-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT 54 RECKLESS LLC (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF SPARKART GROUP, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SPARKART GROUP, INC. AS TO DEFENDANT 54 RECKLESS LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SPARKART GROUP, INC. AS TO DEFENDANT 54 RECKLESS LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-19-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-19-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-04-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******8086
Case Title:SPARKART GROUP, INC. VS. 54 RECKLESS LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY et al
Court Date:AUG-08-2013 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Deposition Of Deft And Request For Sanctions
Rulings:Set for hearing on Thursday, August 8, 2013, Line 4: Plaintiff SPARKART GROUP, INC.'S Motion To Compel Deposition Of Defendant And Request For SanctionsPro Tem Judge Jeffrey Windsor, a member of the California State Bar who meets all the requirements set forth in CRC 2.812 to serve as a temporary judge, has been assigned to hear this motion. Prior to the hearing all parties to the motion will be asked to sign a stipulation agreeing that the motion may be heard by the Pro Tem Judge. If all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the hearing will proceed before the Judge Pro Tem who will decide the motion with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. If a party appears by telephone, the stipulation may be signed via fax or consent to sign given by email. If not all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the Pro Tem Judge will hold a hearing on the motion and, based on the papers submitted by the parties and the hearing, issue a report in the nature of a recommendation to the Dept. 302 Judge, who will then decide the motion. If a party does not appear at the hearing, the party will be deemed to have stipulated that the motion will be decided by the Pro Tem Judge with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge.The Pro Tem Judge has issued the following tentative ruling: The motion is taken off calendar. The parties have stipulated to the deposition of 54 Reckless LLC. If the tentative ruling is not contested, the court will sign the stipulation and proposed order without need for any appearances. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to jeff@windsor-plc.com with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. If the tentative ruling is not contested, the parties are deemed to have stipulated to the Pro Tem hearing the motion and the Pro Tem will sign an order confirming the tentative ruling. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/JPT)


Case Number:*******8086
Case Title:SPARKART GROUP, INC. VS. 54 RECKLESS LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY et al
Court Date:JUN-20-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Application And Application For Hearing For Right To Attach Order For Issuance Of Writ Of Attachment
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Thursday, June 20, 2013, Line 19, PLAINTIFF SPARKART GROUP, INC.'S Application For Hearing For Right To Attach Order For Issuance Of Writ Of Attachment.HEARING REQUIRED. =(302/MJM)


Case Number:*******8086
Case Title:SPARKART GROUP, INC. VS. 54 RECKLESS LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY et al
Court Date:MAY-14-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Application And Application For Hearing For Right To Attach Order For Issuance Of Writ Of Attachment
Rulings:Set for hearing on Tuesday, May 14, 2013, Line 15, PLAINTIFF SPARKART GROUP, INC.'s Application For Right To Attach Order and Order For Issuance Of Writ Of Attachment.Continued on the court's own motion to June 12, 2013 to give opposing party the opportunity to comply with Local Rule 2.6B. The opposing party must deliver courtesy copies of the opposition papers to Department 302, with a cover letter stating the new hearing date, no later than May 14, 2013 at 4:00 pm. The Court has the motion and reply. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. =(302/MJM)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPARKART GROUP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where American Contractors Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLAKELY BRENT