This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 07/12/2021 at 19:17:38 (UTC).

SOUMIA LAKTEBI VS. MARK SHEYMAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/14/2018 SOUMIA LAKTEBI filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against MARK SHEYMAN. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERI L. JACKSON, SAMUEL K. FENG, GARRETT L. WONG and ETHAN P. SCHULMAN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5003

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

TERI L. JACKSON

SAMUEL K. FENG

GARRETT L. WONG

ETHAN P. SCHULMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAKTEBI, SOUMIA

Claimant

STATE OF CALIFORNIA / CALIFORNIA VICTIM COMPENSATION BOARD

Defendants

KDF POST STREET LP

SHEYMAN, MARK

KDF COMMUNITIES-POST STREET LLC

DOES 1 TO 20

VPM MANAGEMENT

KDF COMMUNITIES LLC

DOES 1 THROUGH 20, INCLUSIVE

VPM MANAGEMENT, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SGANGA, MICHAEL W

Attorney at MICHAEL W. SGANGA

693 Veterans Blvd

Redwood City, CA 94063

ORGAN, LAWRENCE A.

Attorney at CALIFORNIA CIVIL RIGHTS LAW GROUP

332 San Anselmo Avenue

San Anselmo, CA 94960

Claimant Attorney

DELAINI, LARENDA R.

Attorney at STATE OF CALIFORNIA VICTIM COMPENSATION BOARD

P.O. Box 350

Sacramento, CA 95812

Defendant Attorneys

COUGHLIN, FRANK J

Attorney at RUZICKA, WALLACE, & COUGHLIN, LLP

4193 Flat Rock Rd.

Riverside, CA 92505

INFELISE, ROBERT D

Attorney at COX, CASTLE & NICOLSON LLP

50 California Street

San Francisco, CA 941114710

WERTH, STEVEN DOUGLAS

Attorney at ALLEN, GLAESSNER, HAZELWOOD & WERTH, LLP

180 Montgomery Street

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 200014974) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LAKTEBI, SOUMIA

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 200014974) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LAKTEBI, SOUMIA

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 200014974)

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 200014974)

ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL BASED ON THE PARTIES' JOINT STIPULATION

ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL BASED ON THE PARTIES' JOINT STIPULATION

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL (TRANSACTION ID # 200011506) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LAKTEBI, SOUMIA

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL (TRANSACTION ID # 200011506) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LAKTEBI, SOUMIA

DECLARATION OF JULIANNE STANFORD IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL BASED ON THE PARTIES JOINT STIPULATION (TRANSACTION ID # 200011506) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LAKTEBI, SOUMIA

DECLARATION OF JULIANNE STANFORD IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL BASED ON THE PARTIES JOINT STIPULATION (TRANSACTION ID # 200011506) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LAKTEBI, SOUMIA

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL BASED ON THE PARTIES JOINT STIPULATION (TRANSACTION ID # 200011506) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LAKTEBI, SOUMIA

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL BASED ON THE PARTIES JOINT STIPULATION (TRANSACTION ID # 200011506) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LAKTEBI, SOUMIA

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL BASED ON THE PARTIES JOINT STIPULATION (TRANSACTION ID # 200011506) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LAKTEBI, SOUMIA

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL BASED ON THE PARTIES JOINT STIPULATION (TRANSACTION ID # 200011506) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LAKTEBI, SOUMIA

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 200009342) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LAKTEBI, SOUMIA

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 200009342) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LAKTEBI, SOUMIA

JOINT CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 200009342) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LAKTEBI, SOUMIA

JOINT CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 200009342) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LAKTEBI, SOUMIA

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 100092639) FILED BY ATTORNEY COUGHLIN, FRANK J

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 100092639) FILED BY ATTORNEY COUGHLIN, FRANK J

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS, (TRANSACTION ID # 64427280): COUGHLIN, FRANK J ADDED AS ATTORNEY FOR KDF POST STREET LP

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS, (TRANSACTION ID # 64427280): COUGHLIN, FRANK J ADDED AS ATTORNEY FOR KDF POST STREET LP

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 200001515) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LAKTEBI, SOUMIA

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 200001515) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LAKTEBI, SOUMIA

WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS FOR EMPLOYMENT AND MEDICAL RECORDS AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF 3,415 AGAINST DEFENDANT AND HIS COUNSEL (TRANSACTION ID # 200001515) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LAKTEBI, SOUMIA

WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS FOR EMPLOYMENT AND MEDICAL RECORDS AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF 3,415 AGAINST DEFENDANT AND HIS COUNSEL (TRANSACTION ID # 200001515) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LAKTEBI, SOUMIA

ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL BASED ON THE JOINT STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES (COPY IN D.206'S OUTBOX)

ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL BASED ON THE JOINT STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES (COPY IN D.206'S OUTBOX)

AMENDED JOINT STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 64304453) FILED BY DEFENDANT SHEYMAN, MARK

AMENDED JOINT STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 64304453) FILED BY DEFENDANT SHEYMAN, MARK

SECOND AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 64287978) FILED BY DEFENDANT SHEYMAN, MARK

SECOND AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 64287978) FILED BY DEFENDANT SHEYMAN, MARK

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 64287876) FILED BY DEFENDANT SHEYMAN, MARK

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 64287876) FILED BY DEFENDANT SHEYMAN, MARK

PROOF OF SERVICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL BASED ON THE JOINT STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION (TRANSACTION ID # 64287795) FILED BY DEFENDANT SHEYMAN, MARK

PROOF OF SERVICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL BASED ON THE JOINT STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION (TRANSACTION ID # 64287795) FILED BY DEFENDANT SHEYMAN, MARK

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): MASTER CALENDAR JURY; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 200014974) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LAKTEBI, SOUMIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 200014974)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • HearingMatter(s): MASTER CALENDAR JURY Off Calendar Jun-11-2020 Continued To Aug-02-21 At 09:30 A.M. In Dept 206; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: GARRETT L. WONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketMASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR AUG-03-2020 CONTINUED TO MASTER CALENDAR JURY ON AUG-02-2021 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206 PER STIPULATED EX PARTE ORDER FILED 06/11/20. ALL FURTHER CONTINUANCES MUST BE SOUGHT BY NOTICED MOTIONS ONLY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL BASED ON THE PARTIES' JOINT STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • FinancialPayment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W6620610M004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL (TRANSACTION ID # 200011506) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LAKTEBI, SOUMIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF JULIANNE STANFORD IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL BASED ON THE PARTIES JOINT STIPULATION (TRANSACTION ID # 200011506) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LAKTEBI, SOUMIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL BASED ON THE PARTIES JOINT STIPULATION (TRANSACTION ID # 200011506) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LAKTEBI, SOUMIA

    Read MoreRead Less
76 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100038420), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF LAKTEBI, SOUMIA SERVED OCT-01-2018, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE OCT-01-2018 AS TO DEFENDANT KDF POST STREET LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100038420), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF LAKTEBI, SOUMIA SERVED OCT-01-2018, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE OCT-01-2018 AS TO DEFENDANT KDF COMMUNITIES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100038420), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF LAKTEBI, SOUMIA SERVED OCT-08-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT SHEYMAN, MARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Sep-07-2018 Set For Order To Show Cause On Nov-06-18 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: TERI L. JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR NOV-06-2018 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE SEP-26-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Jul-26-2018 Continued To Sep-26-18 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: TERI L. JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-15-2018 CONTINUED TO SEP-26-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : Y0218314F004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL RIGHTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LAKTEBI, SOUMIA AS TO DEFENDANT SHEYMAN, MARK VPM MANAGEMENT KDF POST STREET LP DOES 1 TO 20 KDF COMMUNITIES-POST STREET LLC KDF COMMUNITIES LLC SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-15-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-14-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUL-23-2018 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KDF COMMUNITIES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where VPM MANAGEMENT, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DELAINI LARENDA RAI