This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 08/18/2019 at 10:50:21 (UTC).

SOPHIA ADILENE ACEVEDO SEVILLA VS. DIGNITY HEALTH ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/13/2018 a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice case was filed by SOPHIA ADILENE ACEVEDO SEVILLA against DIGNITY HEALTH in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4288

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

TERI L. JACKSON

ANGELA BRADSTREET

GARRETT L. WONG

ETHAN P. SCHULMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ACEVEDO SEVILLA, SOPHIA ADILENE BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM JOSE JESUS ACEVEDO SAAVEDRA

Defendants

ADAMS MD, DAVID ANTHONY

ATAI MD, SOLIMAN

BUYS MD, RICHARD

DOES 1 TO 100 INCLUSIVE

DIGNITY HEALTH DBA ST JOSEPH'S MEDICAL CENTER STOCKTON

MCDOWELL MD, JACOB

DIGNITY HEALTH

BUYS, M.D., RICHARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAELTZER, DOUGLAS S.

Attorney at WALKUP, MELODIA, KELLY & SCHOENBERGER; A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

650 California Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 941082615

Defendant Attorneys

GIARDINA, LAWRENCE S

Attorney at SCHUERING ZIMMERMAN & DOYLE, LLP

400 University Avenue

Sacramento, CA 95825

MARSH, BARRY CLEMENT

Attorney at HINSHAW, MARSH, STILL & HINSHAW, LLP

12901 Saratoga Avenue

Saratoga, CA 95070

ENOCHIAN, STEVEN R

Attorney at LOW MCKINLEY BALERIA & SALENKO, LLP

2300 Contra Costa Blvd., Suite 310

Pleasant Hill, CA 94523

LUCCHESE, DAVID ROSS

Attorney at GALLOWAY, LUCCHESE, EVERSON & PICCHI

2300 Contra Costa Blvd, Ste 350

Pleasant Hill, CA 945232398

PICCHI, JOSEPH S.

Attorney at GALLOWAY, LUCCHESE, EVERSON & PICCHI

2300 Contra Costa Blvd,, Suite 350

Pleasant Hill, CA 945232398

NELSON, JAMES MATTHEW

Attorney at DONNELLY NELSON DEPOLO MURRAY & EFREMSKY

201 North Civic Drive, Suite 239

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT DAVID ANTHONY ADAMS, M.D.S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORIT

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 63277375) FILED BY DEFENDANT ADAMS MD, DAVID ANTHONY

DECLARATION OF IAN A. SCHARG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT DAVID ANTHONY ADA

DECLARATION OF IAN A. SCHARG IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 63277375) FILED BY DEFENDANT ADAMS MD, DAVID ANTHONY

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT DAVID A

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 63277375) FILED BY DEFENDANT ADAMS MD, DAVID ANTHONY

DEFENDANT DAVID ANTHONY ADAMS, M.D.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR S

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 63277375) FILED BY DEFENDANT ADAMS MD, DAVID ANTHONY HEARING SET FOR AUG-12-2019 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302

APPENDIX OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT DAVID ANTHONY ADAMS, M.D.

APPENDIX OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 63277375) FILED BY DEFENDANT ADAMS MD, DAVID ANTHONY

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100041910) FILED BY DEFENDANT ATAI MD, SOLIMAN JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

Answer to Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100043418) FILED BY DEFENDANT ADAMS MD, DAVID ANTHONY

Notice of Continued Settlement Conference

SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR AUG-23-2019 CONTINUED TO AUG-30-2019 AT 9:30 AM IN 624 WITH HON. ANGELA BRADSTREET

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100047437) FILED BY DEFENDANT ATAI MD, SOLIMAN JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

Order Setting Judicial Settlement Conference

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR AUG-23-2019 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 624 WITH HON. ANGELA BRADSTREET

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT TO PLAINTIFF ACEVEDO SEVILLA, SOPHIA ADILENE BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM JOSE JESUS ACEVEDO SAAVEDRA

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100047759) FILED BY DEFENDANT BUYS, M.D., RICHARD JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 15.0 DAYS

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62435550) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ACEVEDO SEVILLA, SOPHIA ADILENE BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM JOSE JESUS ACEVEDO SAAVEDRA JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 12.0 DAYS

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100047240) FILED BY DEFENDANT ADAMS MD, DAVID ANTHONY JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 12.0 DAYS

DECLARATION OF STEVEN R. ENOCHIAN IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION T

DECLARATION OF STEVEN R. ENOCHIAN IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID # 100078144) FILED BY DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH DIGNITY HEALTH DBA ST JOSEPH'S MEDICAL CENTER STOCKTON

Answer to Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100040164) FILED BY DEFENDANT BUYS, M.D., RICHARD

Notice of Related Case

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 62149649) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ACEVEDO SEVILLA, SOPHIA ADILENE BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM JOSE JESUS ACEVEDO SAAVEDRA

ORDER

ORDER TO CONTINUE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2019
  • Payment : REQ OR STIP AND ORDER W/O HEARING; Amount : $20; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R8019723C001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Payment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Amount : $30; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R9219524R035

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Payment : MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Amount : $500; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B1419520M020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R8018906J001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R8018820J003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : B1418807J002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R4918731F004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R8018718J001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W2118718J005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R4918625F008

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 62055839), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ACEVEDO SEVILLA, SOPHIA ADILENE BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM JOSE JESUS ACEVEDO SAAVEDRA SERVED MAY-08-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT MCDOWELL MD, JACOB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100037965) FILED BY DEFENDANT ATAI MD, SOLIMAN (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 62036942), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ACEVEDO SEVILLA, SOPHIA ADILENE BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM JOSE JESUS ACEVEDO SAAVEDRA SERVED MAY-03-2018, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE MAY-04-2018 AS TO DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH DBA ST JOSEPH'S MEDICAL CENTER STOCKTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18115012), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ACEVEDO SEVILLA, SOPHIA ADILENE BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM JOSE JESUS ACEVEDO SAAVEDRA SERVED APR-17-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT ATAI MD, SOLIMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18114008), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ACEVEDO SEVILLA, SOPHIA ADILENE BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM JOSE JESUS ACEVEDO SAAVEDRA SERVED APR-12-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT TO PLAINTIFF ACEVEDO SEVILLA, SOPHIA ADILENE BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM JOSE JESUS ACEVEDO SAAVEDRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (JOSE JESUS ACEVEDO SAAVEDRA IS APPOINTED AS THE GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR SOPHIA ADILENE ACEVEDO SEVILLA.) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ACEVEDO SEVILLA, SOPHIA ADILENE BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM JOSE JESUS ACEVEDO SAAVEDRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • GUARDIAN AD LITEM $20 FILED BY PLAINTIFF ACEVEDO SEVILLA, SOPHIA ADILENE BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM JOSE JESUS ACEVEDO SAAVEDRA (Fee:$20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MALPRACTICE - MEDICAL/DENTAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ACEVEDO SEVILLA, SOPHIA ADILENE BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM JOSE JESUS ACEVEDO SAAVEDRA AS TO DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH DIGNITY HEALTH DBA ST JOSEPH'S MEDICAL CENTER STOCKTON BUYS MD, RICHARD ATAI MD, SOLIMAN ADAMS MD, DAVID ANTHONY MCDOWELL MD, JACOB DOES 1 TO 100 INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-18-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2018 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less