This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 02/15/2020 at 13:36:35 (UTC).

SOJOURN PROPERTIES, INC. VS. CLAUDIA ISAAC ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 SOJOURN PROPERTIES, INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CLAUDIA ISAAC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARLES F. HAINES. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5764

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

CHARLES F. HAINES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOJOURN PROPERTIES, INC.

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 5 1334 VAN NESS AVE., NO.

San Francisco, CA 94109

ISAAC, CLAUDIA 1334 VAN NESS AVE., NO.

204

San Francisco, CA 94109

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRILLANT, DAVID J.

Attorney at BRILLANT LAW FIRM

2540 Camino Diablo, Suite 200

Walnut Creek, CA 94597

Defendant Attorney

MENDLE, ADRIENNE ROSE

Attorney at EVICTION DEFENSE COLLABORATIVE

1338 Mission Street, Fourth Fl

San Francisco, CA 94103

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SOJOURN PROPERTIES, INC. ALSO FILED BY DEFENDANT ISAAC, CLAUDIA

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF DEFENDANT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT ISAAC, CLAUDIA

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT / NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES; SEPARATE STATEMENT; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY DEFENDANT ISAAC, CLAUDIA HEARING SET FOR FEB-07-2020 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501

Notice of Time and Place of Trial and Settlement Hearing

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL AND SETTLEMENT HEARING HEARING SET FOR FEB-05-2020 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 501

REQUEST TO SET FOR TRIAL

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF SOJOURN PROPERTIES, INC. HEARING SET FOR FEB-10-2020 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 501

EXECUTION FOR MONEY/POSSESSION/SALE RETURN

RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, FULLY SATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT ISAAC, CLAUDIA

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF MENDLE, ADRIENNE ROSE ON DEC-16-2019 THROUGH DEC-18-2019 AND AGAIN DEC-23-19 THROUGH DEC-27-19 FILED BY DEFENDANT ISAAC, CLAUDIA

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: MENDLE, ADRIENNE ROSE SUBSTITUTED FOR PRO PER AS ATTORNEY FOR ISAAC, CLAUDIA

DEMAND FOR JURY

DEMAND FOR JURY AND MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY DEFENDANT ISAAC, CLAUDIA

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ISAAC, CLAUDIA

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING MTN TO VACATE DEFAULT AND JUDGMNT

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF CHRISTINE BOCCIA RE: LACK OF SERVICE OF PAPERS FILED BY PLAINTIFF SOJOURN PROPERTIES, INC.

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR STAY OF EXECUTION, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY DEFENDANT ISAAC, CLAUDIA

PROOF OF SERVICE OF (GENERIC)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER GRANTING ORDER SHORTENING TIME; NOTICE OF MOTION; MOTION, MEMO OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT; PROPOSED RESPONSE; PROPOSED ORDER FILED BY DEFENDANT ISAAC, CLAUDIA SERVED NOV-21-2019, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO PLAINTIFF SOJOURN PROPERTIES, INC.

ORDER

ORDER OF THE COURT FOR STAY OF EXECUTION

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR STAY OF EXECUTION

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR STAY OF EXECUTION FILED BY DEFENDANT ISAAC, CLAUDIA

MOTION (CIVIL GENERIC)

NOTICE OF MOTION, MOTION, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT ISAAC, CLAUDIA HEARING SET FOR DEC-03-2019 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON A MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketREMOVED FROM UD JURY CALENDAR SET FOR FEB-10-2020 - CASE SETTLED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketREAL PROPERTY/HOUSING MOTION 501, DEFENDANT CLAUDIA ISAAC MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT / NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS OFF CALENDAR. THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WAS WITHDRAWN BY THE MOVING PARTY. JUDGE: CHARLES F. HAINES; CLERK: J. MURPHY; NOT REPORTED. (501)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR FEB-07-2020 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 501

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SOJOURN PROPERTIES, INC. ALSO FILED BY DEFENDANT ISAAC, CLAUDIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketSETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD, THIS CASE SETTLED. THE PARTIES ENTER INTO A SIGNED AGREEMENT, WHICH WAS FILED. THE TRIAL DATE OF FEB. 10, 2020 IS VACATED. (501)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR FEB-05-2020 01:30 PM FOR DEPT 501

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DEFENDANT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT ISAAC, CLAUDIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • FinancialPayment : MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Payment Type : IFP ; Receipt Number : W1920130M001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT / NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES; SEPARATE STATEMENT; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY DEFENDANT ISAAC, CLAUDIA HEARING SET FOR FEB-07-2020 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501 (Fee:$IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL AND SETTLEMENT HEARING HEARING SET FOR FEB-05-2020 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 501

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketEXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT ISAAC, CLAUDIA (Fee:$25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE [$35.71 PER DAY] FILED BY PLAINTIFF SOJOURN PROPERTIES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 1169 C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF SOJOURN PROPERTIES, INC. RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT ISAAC, CLAUDIA THE RESTITUTION AND POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES: 1334 VAN NESS AVE., ROOM 204, SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94109, SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT (PER 12/3/19 ORDER VACATING JUDGMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS AS TO DEFENDANT ISAAC, CLAUDIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SOJOURN PROPERTIES, INC. SERVED SEP-23-2019, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT ISAAC, CLAUDIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketRECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT, CLERK'S JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SOJOURN PROPERTIES, INC. AS TO DEFENDANT ISAAC, CLAUDIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • FinancialPayment : FIRST FILING UD COMPLT 2,500-10,000; Amount : $240; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W0919919F032

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER - RESIDENTIAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SOJOURN PROPERTIES, INC. AS TO DEFENDANT ISAAC, CLAUDIA DOES 1 TO 5 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:$240.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******5764
Case Title:SOJOURN PROPERTIES, INC. VS. CLAUDIA ISAAC ET AL
Court Date:NOV-12-2019 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT/LEAVE TO DEFEND
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Motion Calendar for November 12, 2019 Line 5.DEFENDANT CLAUDIA ISAAC MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT/LEAVE TO DEFENDHEARING REQUIRED. =(CFH/501)


Case Number:*******5764
Case Title:SOJOURN PROPERTIES, INC. VS. CLAUDIA ISAAC ET AL
Court Date:DEC-03-2019 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion, Motion, Memorandum Of Points And Authorities And Declaration In Support Of Motion To Vacate Default And Judgment
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for December 03, 2019 line 5.DEFENDANT CLAUDIA ISAAC Notice Of Motion, Motion, Memorandum Of Points And Authorities And Declaration In Support Of Motion To Vacate Default And Judgmentis GRANTED, subject to opposition.=(501/REQ)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOJOURN PROPERTIES INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRILLIANT, DAVID J.