This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/07/2016 at 14:24:43 (UTC).

SOFIA MAKHLIN VS. ANATOLIY MAKHLIN

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 SOFIA MAKHLIN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ANATOLIY MAKHLIN. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8715

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MAKHLIN, SOFIA

San Francisco, CA 94132

Respondent

MAKHLIN, ANATOLIY

San Francisco, CA 94127

Minors

MAKHLIN, DENIS

MAKHLIN, JESSICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

AEROV, IRINA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2013
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2013
  • JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE, MARITAL STATUS ENDS DEC-06-2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2013
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT CHECKLIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2013
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2013
  • STIPULATION AND MUTUAL WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2013
  • PRELIMINARY WAIVED DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE STATEMENT - NO SERVICE DATE FILED BY RESPONDENT MAKHLIN, ANATOLIY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2013
  • PRELIMINARY WAIVED DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE STATEMENT - NO SERVICE DATE FILED BY PETITIONER MAKHLIN, SOFIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2013
  • DEFAULT/JUDGMENT RECEIVED SUBMITTED BY: PRO PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2013
  • APPEARANCE, STIPULATION, AND WAIVERS FILED BY PETITIONER MAKHLIN, SOFIA (Fee:20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2013
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: PRO PER SUBSTITUTED FOR AEROV, IRINA AS ATTORNEY FOR MAKHLIN, ANATOLIY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY RESPONDENT MAKHLIN, ANATOLIY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • RESPONSE AND REQUEST FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED BY RESPONDENT MAKHLIN, ANATOLIY (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, SERVICE DATE: FEB-02-2013 FILED BY PETITIONER MAKHLIN, SOFIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • NOTICE OF NATURE AND AVAILABILITY OF ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION METHODS IN FAMILY LAW MATTERS FILED BY PETITIONER MAKHLIN, SOFIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED BY PETITIONER MAKHLIN, SOFIA AS TO RESPONDENT MAKHLIN, ANATOLIY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less