This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/03/2016 at 17:41:56 (UTC).

SIC-501 SECOND STREET LLC, VS. SUSAN CHONG et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 SIC-501 SECOND STREET LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against SUSAN CHONG. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4188

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIC-501 SECOND STREET LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

CHONG, HO YONG

San Francisco, CA 94107

CHONG, UN PONG

Norwalk, CA 90650

CHONG, SUSAN

San Francisco, CA 94107

DOES 1 TO 10, INCL.

San Francisco, CA 94107

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREEN, TRACY

Attorney at WENDEL ROSEN BLACK & DEAN

1111 Broadway, 24Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94604

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO SET FOR TRIAL

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR COURT TRIAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF SIC-501 SECOND STREET LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY HEARING SET FOR APR-08-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 501 ESTIMATED LENGTH OF TRIAL: 1.0 HOURS

MOTION (CIVIL GENERIC)

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE;, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY DEFENDANT CHONG, UN PONG HEARING SET FOR MAR-15-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501 (Fee:IFP)

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CHONG, SUSAN CHONG, HO YONG CHONG, UN PONG

OPPOSITION

OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY PLAINTIFF SIC-501 SECOND STREET LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

NOTICE

NOTICE OF STIP FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMNT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SIC-501 SECOND STREET LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT PER ORDER DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1 TO BE CHONG, UN PONG

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FILED BY PLAINTIFF SIC-501 SECOND STREET LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

COMPLAINT

UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMMERCIAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SIC-501 SECOND STREET LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT CHONG, SUSAN CHONG, HO YONG DOES 1 TO 10, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:385.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SIC-501 SECOND STREET LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SERVED FEB-04-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10, INCL.

OPPOSITION

OPPOSITION TO DEFT UN PONG CHONMG'S MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE FILED BY PLAINTIFF SIC-501 SECOND STREET LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SIC-501 SECOND STREET LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SERVED FEB-13-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT CHONG, UN PONG

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FILED BY PLAINTIFF SIC-501 SECOND STREET LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DOE 1 AMENDMENT TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT SUSAN CHONG AND HO YONG CHONG FILED BY PLAINTIFF SIC-501 SECOND STREET LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

OPPOSITION

OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER FILED BY PLAINTIFF SIC-501 SECOND STREET LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FILED BY PLAINTIFF SIC-501 SECOND STREET LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO FILE AN AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SIC-501 SECOND STREET LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Fee:60.00)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • REMOVED FROM DENIED FEE WAIVER PAID CALENDAR: DEFENDANT UN PONG CHONG'S FEE WAIVER WAS DENIED ON 3/27/13. APPLICANT NEEDS TO PAY COURT FEES OWED TO THE COURT BEFORE FILING ANY DOCUMENTS. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • REMOVED FROM UD COURT TRIAL CALENDAR SET FOR APR-08-2013 - CASE SETTLED. (501)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED BY PLAINTIFF SIC-501 SECOND STREET LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF STIP FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMNT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SIC-501 SECOND STREET LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • MASTER CALENDAR MOTION ON MAR-27-2013 IN DEPT. 206, HEARING ON APPLICANT/DEFENDANT UN CHONG'S WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS. NO APPEARANCE BY APPLICANT. THE COURT DENIED THE APPLICATION IN WHOLE. ORDER SIGNED, AND ENDORSED-FILED COPY MAILED TO APPLICANT. JUDGE: ERNEST GOLDSMITH; CLERK: E. BURA; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DENYING WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52 AS TO DEFENDANT CHONG, UN PONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR COURT TRIAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF SIC-501 SECOND STREET LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY HEARING SET FOR APR-08-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 501 ESTIMATED LENGTH OF TRIAL: 1.0 HOURS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER MOTION, 501, DEFENDANTS SUSAN CHONG AND HO CHONG'S MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT. COURT FINDS MOTION MAKES NO SENSE. MOTION IS DENIED. PREVAILING PARTY TO PREPARE ORDER. JUDGE RONALD EVANS QUIDACHAY, CLERK L. FONG, NOT REPORTED (D-501)

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY DEFENDANT CHONG, SUSAN ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY DEFENDANT CHONG, SUSAN CHONG, HO YONG HEARING SET FOR MAR-29-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501 (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FILED BY PLAINTIFF SIC-501 SECOND STREET LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FILED BY PLAINTIFF SIC-501 SECOND STREET LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO FILE AN AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SIC-501 SECOND STREET LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SIC-501 SECOND STREET LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SERVED FEB-04-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT CHONG, SUSAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SIC-501 SECOND STREET LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SERVED FEB-04-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT CHONG, HO YONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SIC-501 SECOND STREET LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SERVED FEB-04-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10, INCL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMMERCIAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SIC-501 SECOND STREET LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT CHONG, SUSAN CHONG, HO YONG DOES 1 TO 10, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:385.00)

    Read MoreRead Less