This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/03/2016 at 21:31:54 (UTC).

SHU-LONG LEE et al VS. GEORGE CHEN et al

Case Summary

On 04/17/2009 SHU-LONG LEE filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against GEORGE CHEN. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7455

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHEN, LEE SHU LONG, AN INDIVIDUAL

LEE, SHU-LONG AKA SHU-LONG LEE CHEN

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CITIBANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, A NATIONAL BANK

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. AN ACQUIRER OF CERTAIN ASSETS AND LIABILITIES OF WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK FROM THE FDIC ACTING AS RECEIVER

CITIBANK, N.A.

DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE

CALIFORNIA RECONVEYANCE COMPANY

CHEN, GEORGE AKA CHIA CHIH CHEN, AN INDIVIDUAL,

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK A NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

CALIFORNIA RECONVEYANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK, A FEDERAL ASSOCIATION

Cross Defendants

ROES 1 TO 50

CHEN, GEORGE AKA CHIA CHIH CHEN, AN INDIVIDUAL,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LI, DEZHAN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DANIEL DEZHAM LI

2005 De La Cruz Blvd.,, Ste 292

Santa Clara, CA 95050

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MORSE, AMY L

Attorney at ADORNO, YOSS, ALVARADO & SMITH, APC

633 West 5Th Street, Ste 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

HANSE, T. MATTHEW

Attorney at ADORNO YOSS ALVARADO & SMITH

633 W. 5Th Street, Suite1100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

BARDELLINI, LEE PERRY

Attorney at BARDELLINI, STRAW & CAVIN, LLP

2000 Crow Canyon Place, Suite 330

San Ramon, CA 94583

WOLFE, STUART B.

Attorney at WOLFE & WYMAN LLP

2175 N California Blvd.,, Ste 645

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

SORICH, JOHN M.

Attorney at ALDORNO YOSS ALVARADO & SMITH, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

633 W. Fifth Street, Ste 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/JUDGMENT/LEAVE TO DEFEND

ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/JUDGMENT/LEAVE TO DEFEND PER STIPULATION (NO S.A.S.E., COPY IN DEPT. 301 OUT BOX) AS TO DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA RECONVEYANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DEFAULT OF JUL-02-2009 SET ASIDE AS TO ABOVE-NAMED PARTIES ONLY

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF SEP-17-2010 CONTINUED TO NOV-05-2010 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212, FOR DEFENDANT CITIBANK, N.A. TO FILE ORDER RE DEMURRER AND JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL THEREON. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF LEE, SHU-LONG AKA SHU-LONG LEE CHEN CHEN, LEE SHU LONG, AN INDIVIDUAL TAKE NOTHING FROM DEFENDANT CITIBANK, N.A. DEFENDANT TO RECOVER COSTS OF SUIT IN THIS ACTION. SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT, COST BILL $51,175.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT CHEN, GEORGE AKA CHIA CHIH CHEN, AN INDIVIDUAL,

DECLARATION

DECLARATION SHU-LONG LEE FILED RE: IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT (CCP 585(D) & CRC RULE 3.18000(A)(2) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEE, SHU-LONG AKA SHU-LONG LEE CHEN CHEN, LEE SHU LONG, AN INDIVIDUAL

MOTION (CIVIL GENERIC)

RE-NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PROVE UP HEARING FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEE, SHU-LONG AKA SHU-LONG LEE CHEN HEARING SET FOR AUG-29-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 514 (Fee:60.00)

TEXT JUDGMENT

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

Case Ordered Off Calendar

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF OCT-08-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT/DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. AN ACQUIRER OF CERTAIN ASSETS AND LIABILITIES OF WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK FROM THE FDIC ACTING AS RECEIVER

ORDER

ORDER OF COURT (AMENDED) VACATING THE JULY 16, 2010 ORDER

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUN-27-2011 CONTINUED TO AUG-08-2011 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO BRING CROSS COMPLAINT(S) AT ISSUE. THE JUN-27-2011 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

MINUTE ORDER RE:

MINUTE ORDER RE: DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS AND CROSS-COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT CHEN, GEORGE AKA CHIA CHIH CHEN, AN INDIVIDUAL,

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JAN-13-2012 CONTINUED TO FEB-24-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR CROSS COMPLAINANT(S) TO BRING CROSS COMPLAINT(S) AT ISSUE OR FILE DISMISSAL. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT OF CASE FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHEN, LEE SHU LONG, AN INDIVIDUAL

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEE, SHU-LONG AKA SHU-LONG LEE CHEN

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE

69 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF OCT-08-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT/DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL (CRC 3.1385) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEE, SHU-LONG AKA SHU-LONG LEE CHEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • UNCONTESTED CALENDAR OF AUG-29-2013, RE-NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PROVE UP HEARING GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER. PROCEEDINGS REPORTED BY: SONIA WONG, CSR#11288. (514)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • MINI MINUTES FOR AUG-29-2013 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF WITNESS (LRSF 6.5 C)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE NTC IN SUPPORT OF EXPARTE REQ. FOR WAIVER OF WITNESS FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEE, SHU-LONG AKA SHU-LONG LEE CHEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF SHU LONG LEE IN SUPPORT OF EXPARTE REQ. FOR WAIVER OF WITNESS FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEE, SHU-LONG AKA SHU-LONG LEE CHEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • EXPARTE REQ. FOR WAIVER OF WITNESS FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEE, SHU-LONG AKA SHU-LONG LEE CHEN (Fee:20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
117 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEE, SHU-LONG AKA SHU-LONG LEE CHEN ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 2.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO PLAINTIFF LEE, SHU-LONG AKA SHU-LONG LEE CHEN CHEN, LEE SHU LONG, AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEE, SHU-LONG AKA SHU-LONG LEE CHEN CHEN, LEE SHU LONG, AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT CHEN, GEORGE AKA CHIA CHIH CHEN, AN INDIVIDUAL, WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK, A FEDERAL ASSOCIATION CALIFORNIA RECONVEYANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE JPMORGAN CHASE BANK A NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2009
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MONETARY STATUS OF DEFT CALIFORNIA RECONVEYANCE COMAPNY IN RESPONSE TO VERFIED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA RECONVEYANCE COMPANY (Fee:365.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2009
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO DEFENDANT CHEN, GEORGE AKA CHIA CHIH CHEN, AN INDIVIDUAL, CALIFORNIA RECONVEYANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEE, SHU-LONG AKA SHU-LONG LEE CHEN SERVED MAY-28-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA RECONVEYANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEE, SHU-LONG AKA SHU-LONG LEE CHEN CHEN, LEE SHU LONG, AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED MAY-15-2009, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT CHEN, GEORGE AKA CHIA CHIH CHEN, AN INDIVIDUAL,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2009
  • NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEE, SHU-LONG AKA SHU-LONG LEE CHEN CHEN, LEE SHU LONG, AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT CHEN, GEORGE AKA CHIA CHIH CHEN, AN INDIVIDUAL, WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK, A FEDERAL ASSOCIATION CALIFORNIA RECONVEYANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEP-18-2009 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-16-2009 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-03-2009 (Fee:365.00)

    Read MoreRead Less