Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/03/2016 at 11:57:45 (UTC).

SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC./OBAYASHI CORPO VS. DANNY'S CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INCORPORATED, A MINN et al

Case Summary

On 04/22/2005 SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC /OBAYASHI CORPO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DANNY'S CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INCORPORATED, A MINN. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0694

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2005

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Plaintiff

SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC./OBAYASHI CORPO RATION, A JOINT VENTURE

Defendants and Cross Defendants

FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, AN INDIANA CORPORATION

DANNY'S CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INCORPORATED, A MINN ESOTA CORPORATION

DOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE

DANNY'S CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INCORPORATED

WESTERN SURETY COMPANY, A SOUTH DAKOTA CORPORATION

NATIONAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD , A CONNECTICUT CORPORATION

AMERICAN HOME ASSURANCE COMPANY, A NEW YORK CORPORATION

XKT ENGINEERING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ROES 1 THOUGH 100, INCLUSIVE

THE GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT

ROES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DANNY'S CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INCORPORATED

SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC./OBAYASHI CORPO RATION, A JOINT VENTURE

XKT ENGINEERING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Other and Cross Defendant

THE GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant, Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Plaintiff Attorneys

HENNIGH, SCOTT E

Four Embarcadero Center, 17 Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

BROCKHAGE, STEVEN FRANCIS

BROTHERS, ROGER JOSEPH

Attorney at MCNAMARA,DODGE,NEY,BEATTY,SLATTERY & PFALZER LLP

1211 Newell Avenue, Post Office Box 5288

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

GRAHAM, MATTHEW FRANCIS

Attorney at WENDEL, ROSEN, BLACK & DEAN LLP

1111 Broadway,, 24Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

HURLBUT, STEPHEN B.

Attorney at AKERMAN SENTERFITT, PC

8100 Boone Blvd., Ste. 700

Vienna, VA 22182-2683

DAPPER, DAVID P

Attorney at AKERMAN SENTERFITT LLP

725 South Figueroa Street, 38Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5438

Other Attorney

CHU, JEFFREY M

Attorney at HANSON BRIDGETT MARCUS VLAHOS & RUDY, LLP

333 Market Street, 21St Fl

San Francisco, CA 94105-2173

 

Court Documents

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY STAY AND FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME.

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT XKT ENGINEERING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Fee:292.20)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF SERVICE

ADDED TO PROOF OF SERVICE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR HEARING SET FOR AUG-16-2005 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 212

ANSWER

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT XKT ENGINEERING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE - JOEL D. HEUSINGER (FOR DEFT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT/CROSS-DEFT DANNY'S CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INCORPORATED)

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY DANNY'S CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INCORPORATED AS TO GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY & TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT ONLY

ORDER RE: COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION - DENIED

ORDER RE: COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION - DENIED

COMPLAINT

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC./OBAYASHI CORPO RATION, A JOINT VENTURE AS TO DEFENDANT DANNY'S CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INCORPORATED, A MINN ESOTA CORPORATION XKT ENGINEERING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE

ORDER

ORDER --- STIPULATION TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND ORDER

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-28-2006 CONTINUED TO JUN-09-2006 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212,. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order for Single Assignment

SINGLE ASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE DIANE ELAN WICK FOR ALL PURPOSES. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR NOV-15-2006 AT 2:30 PM IN DEPT. 611. FEB-26-2007 MASTER CALENDAR JURY IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Reassigning Exempt Case

SINGLE ASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE ROBERT L. DONDERO FOR ALL PURPOSES. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR DEC-08-2006 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 206. NOV-15-2006 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICES SENT BY COURT.

STATUS CONF MINUTES FOR DEC-08-2006 1:30 PM

STATUS CONF MINUTES FOR DEC-08-2006 1:30 PM

MINUTES FOR AUG-31-2007 2:30 PM

MINUTES FOR AUG-31-2007 2:30 PM FOR DEPT 318

ORDER

ORDER

ORDER

ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL INSPECTION OF ACCPAC

Order to Show Cause RE Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

REMOVED FROM JURY TRIAL CALENDAR SET FOR NOV-19-2007 - CASE SETTLED. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 318 ON FEB-04-2008 AT 4:00 PM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385.

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY XKT ENGINEERING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2008
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF FEB-04-2008 IN DEPT. 318 IS OFF CALENDAR CASE SETTLED IN ITS ENTIRETY PURSUANT TO THE CORRESPONDENCE BY PLTF'S COUNSEL AND DISMISSAL FILED ON 1/29/08.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY XKT ENGINEERING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • REMOVED FROM JURY TRIAL CALENDAR SET FOR NOV-19-2007 - CASE SETTLED. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 318 ON FEB-04-2008 AT 4:00 PM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2007
  • STATUS CONFERENCE HEARD: JURY TRIAL SET FOR NOV-19-2007 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 318 FOR MOTIONS IN LIMINE HEARING. JUDGE: R. DONDERO, CLERK: S. HUSENY, REPORTER: J. BRYCE #3321 (318)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FOR NOV-09-2007 10:00 AM FOR DEPT 318

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2007
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - TRIAL COURTS, ADVANCED FROM NOV-09-2007 TO CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - TRIAL COURTS AT NOV-09-2007 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 318.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2007
  • SHIMMICK / OBAYASHI JOINT VENTURE'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS IN LIMINE FILED BY PLAINTIFF SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC./OBAYASHI CORPO RATION, A JOINT VENTURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2007
  • POS; CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO XKT'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE; DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC./OBAYASHI CORPO RATION, A JOINT VENTURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2007
  • CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO XKT'S MOTION IN LIMINE FILED BY PLAINTIFF SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC./OBAYASHI CORPO RATION, A JOINT VENTURE

    Read MoreRead Less
203 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2005
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE TO PLT./ CASE MANAGEMENT CONF.; JUDICIAL MEDIATION PILOT PROGRAM INF. PACKET; EX PARTE MOTION FOR TEMP. STAY AND FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR MOTION FOR PERMANENT STAY; DEC. OF STEVEN F. BROCKHAGE IN SUPPORT; DEC. OF CHRIS FASSARI IN SUPPORT; (PROPOSED) ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY STAY AND FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FILED BY PLAINTIFF SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC./OBAYASHI CORPO RATION, A JOINT VENTURE SERVED APR-27-2005, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION ON DEFENDANT XKT ENGINEERING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2005
  • SUMMONS RETURNED FILED BY PLAINTIFF SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC./OBAYASHI CORPO RATION, A JOINT VENTURE ON DEFENDANT DANNY'S CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INCORPORATED, A MINN ESOTA CORPORATION XKT ENGINEERING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2005
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING EX-PARTE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY STAY AND FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FILED BY PLAINTIFF SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC./OBAYASHI CORPO RATION, A JOINT VENTURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2005
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PERMANENT STAY FILED BY PLAINTIFF SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC./OBAYASHI CORPO RATION, A JOINT VENTURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2005
  • MOTION FOR PERMANENT STAY, PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC./OBAYASHI CORPO RATION, A JOINT VENTURE HEARING SET FOR MAY-25-2005 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:36.30)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY STAY AND FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2005
  • ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR PLAINTIFF SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC./OBAYASHI CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR A PERMANENT STAY HEARING SET FOR MAY-25-2005 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2005
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON MOTION FOR PERMANENT STAY, DECLARATION , PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC./OBAYASHI CORPO RATION, A JOINT VENTURE (Fee:36.30)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC./OBAYASHI CORPO RATION, A JOINT VENTURE AS TO DEFENDANT DANNY'S CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INCORPORATED, A MINN ESOTA CORPORATION XKT ENGINEERING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEP-23-2005 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-21-2005 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-08-2005 (Fee:845.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN HOME ASSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD is a litigant

Latest cases where Western Surety Company is a litigant